Deere & Company v. Crawford et al
Plaintiff: Deere & Company
Defendant: Seth Crawford and Adrian Crawford
Case Number: 4:2019cv04178
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of Service. (Allen, Victor)
January 30, 2020 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Deere & Company. (Allen, Victor)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on December 3, 2019. The #49 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to the #43 motion to dismiss is now due January 30, 2020. (AK, ilcd)
December 3, 2019 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaff, Martha)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on October 30, 2019. The #48 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to the #43 motion to dismiss is now due December 5, 2019. (AK, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 11/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaff, Martha)
October 22, 2019 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford. (KB, ilcd)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on October 22, 2019. Defendants' unopposed #46 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief In Support is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the [46-2] Supplemental Brief on the docket. (AK, ilcd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Proposed Supplemental Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Mathis, Benton)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on October 18, 2019. The unopposed #45 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to the #43 motion to dismiss is now due November 7, 2019. (AK, ilcd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaff, Martha)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on October 17, 2019. The #26 and #36 motions to seal are GRANTED. The documents the parties sought to file under seal contain or discuss trade secrets, or at least information "whose economic value depends on its secrecy." See Baxter Int'l, Inc. v. Abbott Labs., 297 F.3d 544, 547 (7th Cir. 2002). The #39 motion to strike is DENIED for reasons stated on the record at the October 10, 2019 hearing. (AK, ilcd)
October 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2019, before Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jennifer E. Johnson,. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Rumbaugh and Mr. Mathis. IMPORTANT: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Motion of Requested Redactions shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this motion will be restricted to the Court and the attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Motion are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public, without redaction, 90 days from the date initially filed. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the Clerk's Office public terminal or contact the Court Reporter for purchase. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2020. (KB, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sara Darrow on Thursday 10/10/2019. Parties present in open court by Attorneys Rumbaugh, Shaff, Heaton, Mathis, Jr. and Boron. Arguments held. Court denies #4 Motion for TRO. (Court Reporter JJ.) (ED, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathis, Benton)
October 10, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #41 Affidavit by Victor J Allen on behalf of Deere & Company (Allen, Victor)
October 10, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT re #32 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Matthew J. Stippich by Deere & Company. (Allen, Victor)
October 8, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Service. (Mathis, Benton)
October 8, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Strike #32 Affidavit, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Exhibit 4-16 by Defendants Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike)(Mathis, Benton)
October 8, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Adrian Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of A. Crawford, #2 Exhibit Declaration of N. Broom)(Mathis, Benton)
October 8, 2019 Filing 37 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Mathis, Benton)
October 8, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Seal by Defendants Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mathis, Benton)
October 8, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Seth Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of Hearing in Deere v. Hansotia, #2 Exhibit News article, 1, #3 Exhibit News article, 2, #4 Exhibit News article, 3, #5 Exhibit Dep. Transcript of S. Crawford, #6 Exhibit Declaration of S. Crawford, #7 Exhibit Declaration of N. Broom, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Hari Peruri, #9 Exhibit 6/11/19 Correspondence, #10 Exhibit Declaration of B. Arnold, #11 Exhibit Declaration of A. Hackfort, #12 Exhibit Declaration of C. Gasparin, #13 Exhibit Declaration of J. Rahiya, #14 Exhibit Declaration of D. Goebel)(Mathis, Benton)
October 8, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Justin J Boron on behalf of All Defendants (Boron, Justin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deere & Company (Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Matthew J. Stippich by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 31 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Attachment 1, #3 Exhibit Attachment 2, #4 Exhibit Attachment 3, #5 Exhibit Attachment 4, #6 Exhibit Attachment 5, #7 Exhibit Attachment 6, #8 Exhibit Attachment 7, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C)(Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1 of 3), #2 Exhibit A (2 of 3), #3 Exhibit A (3 of 3), #4 Exhibit B)(Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (2 of 2))(Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 10/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Victor)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on October 4, 2019. Local Rule 5.10(A)(2) provides that "[a] party who has a legal basis for filing a document under seal without prior court order must electronically file a motion for leave to file under seal." "The document in question... must be electronically filed contemporaneously using the separate docket event 'Sealed Document.'" CDIL-LR 5.10(A)(2). The Clerk is directed to STRIKE the #25 Motion to File Under Seal for noncompliance with the Local Rules. Plaintiff is directed to refile the #25 motion. (AK, ilcd)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED 10/4/2019 ENTERED BY CHIEF JUDGE SARA DARROW: MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 10/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Victor) Modified on 10/9/2019 to strike document (KB, ilcd).
October 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sara Darrow on Tuesday 10/1/2019. Parties present via telephone in open court are Attorneys Allen, Rumbaugh, Heaton, Mathis, Freesmeier, and Menendez for Status Conference. Discussion held. Oral motion by Plaintiff to hold 10/10/2019 hearing in camera. Court takes under advisement. Plaintiff to file additional documents as discussed on the record by 10/4/2019. Defense to file Response by 10/8/2019. (Court Reporter JJ.) (ED, ilcd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Hillary Lynn Freesmeier on behalf of Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford (Freesmeier, Hillary)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kenneth Gary Menendez on behalf of Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford (Menendez, Kenneth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Rodger A Heaton on behalf of Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford (Heaton, Rodger)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on September 25, 2019. The #20 joint motion for a status conference is GRANTED. This case is set for a telephone status conference on Tuesday October 1, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will place the call. (AK, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deere & Company re #20 Joint MOTION for Hearing with the Court (Allen, Victor)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Hearing with the Court by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting The Parties' Joint Motion for a Status Conference with the Court)(Allen, Victor)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on September 24, 2019. Defendants' unopposed #19 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Any response to the #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is due by October 7, 2019. (AK, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford. Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathis, Benton)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 the Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/24/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Stipulated Motion for Protective Order #8 is granted. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/24/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on September 23, 2019. The #16 motion to continue is GRANTED. The hearing on the #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled for Thursday October 10, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (AK, ilcd)
September 22, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Continue 10/4/19 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathis, Benton)
September 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Benton J Mathis, Jr on behalf of Adrian Crawford, Seth Crawford (Mathis, Benton)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #8 MOTION for Protective Order [Stipulated], #9 Certificate of Service/Counsel Amended Certificate of Service to replace DKT No. 9 re: Motion for Protective Order by Victor J Allen on behalf of Deere & Company (Allen, Victor)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #11 MOTION to Seal , #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Victor J Allen on behalf of Deere & Company (Allen, Victor)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Seal filed by Plaintiff Deere & Company. (Allen, Victor)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Allen, Victor)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #5 Brief by Victor J Allen on behalf of Deere & Company (Allen, Victor)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #8 MOTION for Protective Order [Stipulated] by Victor J Allen on behalf of Deere & Company (Allen, Victor)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Protective Order [Stipulated] by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Allen, Victor)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 the parties' Motion, entitled Stipulation to Waive Service of Summons and to Extend the Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. That Stipulation provides that the Plaintiff and Defendants have consented to Defendants' waiver of service of summons. The Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/15/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/20/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on September 20, 2019. Hearing on the #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is set for Friday October 4, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse for the Southern District of Iowa located at 131 E. 4th Street Davenport, IA 52801. Plaintiff is directed to provide Defendants and their counsel with a copy of this Order and the #4 motion. If desired, Defendants may file a written response to the #4 motion by October 2, 2019. (AK, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION entitled Stipulation to Waive Service of Summons and to Extend the Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 consent)(ED, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Martha L Shaff on behalf of Deere & Company (Shaff, Martha)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Deere & Company. (Rumbaugh, Eric)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Deere & Company. Responses due by 10/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David Gilmore, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of David Gilmore, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of David Gilmore, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Terry Goerdt, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Terry Goerdt, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Terry Goerdt, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Terry Goerdt, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Jason Beneke, #10 Affidavit Declaration of Dennis Bode, #11 Affidavit Declaration of Wendy Davies-Popelka, #12 Affidavit Declaration of John Yattoni, #13 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Larson, #14 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Blades, #15 Affidavit Declaration of Angela Johanningmeier, #16 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Stippich with Exhibit A attached, #17 Affidavit Declaration of Eric H. Rumbaugh, #18 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric H. Rumbaugh)(Rumbaugh, Eric)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Seth Crawford and Adrian Crawford, (Attachments: #1 A. Crawford)(KB, ilcd)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Deere & Company. (Rumbaugh, Eric)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3191221.), filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons as to Seth Crawford, #3 Exhibit Summons as to Adrian Crawford, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint)(Rumbaugh, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deere & Company v. Crawford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deere & Company
Represented By: Eric H Rumbaugh
Represented By: Martha L Shaff
Represented By: Victor J Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Crawford
Represented By: Justin J Boron
Represented By: Kenneth Gary Menendez
Represented By: Hillary Lynn Freesmeier
Represented By: Benton J Mathis, Jr
Represented By: Rodger A Heaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Crawford
Represented By: Justin J Boron
Represented By: Kenneth Gary Menendez
Represented By: Hillary Lynn Freesmeier
Represented By: Benton J Mathis, Jr
Represented By: Rodger A Heaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?