Clark v. Hayes
Plaintiff: Joe Clark
Defendant: Rosemary Hayes
Case Number: 4:2019cv04182
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe Clark. Rosemary Hayes waiver sent on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/19/2020. (VH, ilcd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Rosemary Hayes on 11/20/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 11/20/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 11/20/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. #3 . Pursuant to a review of the Complaint, the Court finds that Plaintiff alleges Defendant Hayes used excessive force and retaliated against Plaintiff when she intentionally applied restraints in a painful manner on September 12, 2017 and forced Plaintiff to stay in the restraints for approximately five hours. The claim is stated against the Defendant in her individual capacity only. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Joe Clark is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/24/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05987.
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois at Springfield the electronic record. (ph, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois at Springfield for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summonses unless the transferee court so directs. The case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/11/2019. Mailed notice (ph, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Joe Clark dated 8/30/2019. (sxb, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joe Clark (Exhibit) (sxb, ) Modified on 9/24/2019 (SAG, ilcd).
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Joe Clark (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9/3/2019)(sxb, ) Modified on 9/24/2019 (SAG, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?