Swanson v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: John Swanson
Defendant: Eric Kunkel and Gregg Scott
Case Number: 4:2019cv04183
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eric Kunkel and Gregg Scott; waivers sent on 10/30/2019, answers due 12/30/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Gregg Scott, Eric Kunkel on 10/30/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/30/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/30/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the Court finds that the plaintiff states First Amendment claims for denial of visitation with his mother and retaliation against the named defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) Modified on 10/30/2019 to correct typographical error (SAG, ilcd).
October 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held 10/24/2019 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance of the plaintiff by telephone. Merit Review Hearing held. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written Order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 10:27 AM.) (DS, ilcd)
October 21, 2019 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 10/21/2019, in the amount of $ 7.09; receipt number 44626003677 (RL, ilcd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 TELEPHONE WRIT issued to Rushville TDF for hearing set 10/24/19 at 10:20 a.m. (SAG, ilcd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/8/2019. An IFP review hearing is set for 10/24/2019 at 10:20 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this IFP review hearing.(SAG, ilcd)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION of Status of Filing Fees by Plaintiff John Swanson. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (MAS, ilcd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/25/2019. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff John Swanson is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $14.17. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $7.09, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (Miscellaneous Deadline 10/25/2019) (SAG, ilcd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (SAG, ilcd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 3/25/19 through 9/25/19. Emailed to Rushville TDF. (SAG, ilcd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Swanson. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Swanson.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?