Powers v. Arroyo et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Defendant: Kimberly Weitl and John Arroyo
Case Number: 4:2019cv04189
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Review Complaint by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 11/5/2019 (TK, ilcd)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/17/2019. On 9/30/2019 Plaintiff filed a complaint and petition to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") #3 . Plaintiff had previously filed a series of IFP petitions in other cases which were denied due to his "long-standing history of dissipating funds prior to filing suit, and then claiming poverty and requesting a waiver of the partial filing fee." Powers v. Scott, No. 19-4093 (C.D.Ill. Aug. 7, 2019); Powers v. Caraway, No. 19-4117 (C.D.Ill Aug. 6, 2019); Powers v. Hou, No. 19-4119 (C.D.Ill. Aug. 7, 2019); Powers v. Wilcoxen, No. 19-4090. On 7/22/19, the Court in Powers v. Wilcoxen, ordered that Plaintiff disclose all outstanding filing fees in any subsequent lawsuit. Plaintiff's complaint here was filed several months later and violates that court order as it does not disclose the numerous filing fees which he owes. Furthermore, on October 15, 2019, the Seventh Circuit entered an order under Support Sys. Int'l, Inc. V. Mack, 45 F.3d 185, finding that Plaintiff had "forfeited the privilege of proceeding in forma pauperis in any new or pending case or appeal until he has paid, in full, all outstanding fees and costs for all of his lawsuits." Powers v. Wilcoxen, No. 19-2478 (7th Cir. Oct. 15, 2019). Accordingly, #3 is DENIED. Plaintiff will have 21 days in which to pay the $400 filing fee. The failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. All pending motions are rendered MOOT with leave to reassert after payment of the filing fee.(SAG, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Status by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (JRK, ilcd)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (SAG, ilcd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 3/30/19 through 9/30/19. Emailed to Rushville TDF. (SAG, ilcd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Powers.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Arroyo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Weitl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?