Sanchez v. Greene et al
Plaintiff: Arthur M Sanchez
Defendant: . Allen, . Carlson, . Greene and . Vanderburg
Case Number: 4:2019cv04216
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 12/2/2019, in the amount of $ 112.07; receipt number 24626009129 (KE, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/30/2019 granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $52.07. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Arthur M Sanchez. (KE, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/24/2019. Plaintiff has filed a complaint #1 and a petition to proceed in forma pauperis #3 that are incomplete in that only half of every page appears. The Court directs Plaintiff to resubmit his complaint and petition within fourteen days of the entry of this order. The Court also directs Plaintiff to submit a copy of his trust fund account that shows his financial activity for the previous six months. Failure to comply with the Court's order will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice.(KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Arthur M Sanchez. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (KE, ilcd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/25/2019) (KE, ilcd).
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Arthur M Sanchez.(KE, ilcd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/25/2019) (KE, ilcd).
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arthur M Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/25/2019) (KE, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Greene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Vanderburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur M Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?