Moore v. IDOC Staff
Plaintiff: Rodney Moore
Defendant: IDOC Staff
Case Number: 4:2019cv04219
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/11/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) The Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A. 2) If Plaintiff believes he can articulate a violation of his constitutional rights, he may file a proposed amended complaint in compliance with this order within 21 days or on or before January 3, 2020. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to allege a constitutional violation, his case will be dismissed with prejudice. 3) Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied with leave to renew after Plaintiff clarifies his claim. #6 . 4) The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide Plaintiff with a complaint form and reset the internal merit review deadline within 30 days of this order. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (Attachments: #1 blank Complaint form)(SAG, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $5.02. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/30/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Rodney Moore. (RK, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Rodney Moore. Responses due by 11/8/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court mailed conventionally to Illinois River CC Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 4/25/19 through 10/25/19. (SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Rodney Moore (SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Rodney Moore.(SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IDOC Staff, filed by Rodney Moore.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. IDOC Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?