Peters v. Simpson Trucking & Excavating, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Peters
Defendant: Tiffany Licata, Simpson Trucking & Excavating, Inc. and Steven J Simpson
Case Number: 4:2019cv04243
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/27/2020. The Court adopts the parties' Joint Discovery Plan #8 . Completion of all discovery due by 12/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2021. Proposed pretrial order deadline of 4/13/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, 4/20/2021 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for Monday, 6/21/2021 at 9:00 AM BOTH HEARINGS in U.S. Courthouse, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801 before Judge Sara Darrow. The Rule 16 conference set in this matter is VACATED. The Court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are expected to review Judge Hawley's Standing Order. The Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. Parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. Counsel/Parties are reminded of the importance of appearing for hearings scheduled via telephone. Failure to appear will result in in-person appearances for all further proceedings.(JRK, ilcd)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Ronald Peters. (Carlson, Heather)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/14/2020 at 10:15 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 2/11/2020. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/8/2020. (WG, ilcd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Peter Joseph Wenker on behalf of All Defendants (Wenker, Peter)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Peters. Steven J Simpson served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Carlson, Heather)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Peters. Simpson Trucking & Excavating, Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Carlson, Heather)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Peters. Tiffany Licata served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Carlson, Heather)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued and returned to counsel to effect service. (ED, ilcd)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Peters (Filing fee $ 400 - receipt #44626003716 ). (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 summons simpson trucking, #4 summons licata, #5 summons s. simpson, #6 receipt)(ED, ilcd) Modified on 12/5/2019 to reflect receipt number (RL, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Simpson Trucking & Excavating, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Licata
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J Simpson
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Peters
Represented By: Heather L Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?