Snider v. Heartland Beef, Inc.
Petitioner: Tiffanie Snider
Respondent: Heartland Beef, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04026
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07386. .
February 12, 2020 Filing 27 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois the electronic record.(jjr, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 1/29/2020. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Transfer (Dckt. No. #19 ) is granted in part and denied in part. This case is hereby transferred to the Central District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY by Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. to motion to transfer case #19 Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Wolfe, Matthew)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/18/2019 before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Order Number: 37379. Court Reporter Contact Information: Amy Spee, amyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2020. (Spee, Amy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Tiffanie Snider re response in opposition to motion, #22 (Dravillas, Alexios)
January 8, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Tiffanie Sniderin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. to transfer case Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer #19 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex J. Dravillas, #2 Declaration of Tiffanie Snider)(Dravillas, Alexios)
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Motion hearing held on December 18, 2019. The Court will defer briefing on the Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dckt. No. #17 ). The Court sets the following agreed briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to transfer (Dckt. No. #19 ): Plaintiff's response is due on January 8, 2020 and Defendant's reply is due by January 22, 2020. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. Wolfe for presentment of motion to transfer case #19 , motion to dismiss #17 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 12/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wolfe, Matthew)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. to transfer case Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wolfe, Matthew)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Heartland Beef, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #17 Heartland Beef, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Wolfe, Matthew)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. to dismiss Heartland Beef, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiffanie Snider by Aaron M Zigler (Zigler, Aaron)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Dckt. No. #13 ) is hereby granted. The Court extends the deadline for defendant to respond to the complaint to December 9, 2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. Wolfe for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 11/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. for extension of time (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiffanie Snider by Alexios James Dravillas (Dravillas, Alexios)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiffanie Snider by James Dominick Larry (Larry, James)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiffanie Snider by Ashley C Keller (Keller, Ashley)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiffanie Snider by Travis D. Lenkner (Lenkner, Travis)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. by Brian Scott Jones (Jones, Brian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all parties of record. (kp, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. by Gary M. Miller (Miller, Gary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Heartland Beef, Inc. (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heartland Beef, Inc. by Matthew C. Wolfe (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019CH11517) filed by Heartland Beef, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16419621. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Pleadings), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration), #3 Exhibit C (Notice of Filing))(Wolfe, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snider v. Heartland Beef, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heartland Beef, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Gary M. Miller
Represented By: Brian Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tiffanie Snider
Represented By: Alexios James Dravillas
Represented By: James Dominick Larry
Represented By: Ashley C Keller
Represented By: Aaron M Zigler
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?