Payney et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Harley Payney and Nichole Payney
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc and C R Bard Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv04070
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Sara Darrow
2 Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
3 Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/1/2020. Pursuant to Joint Stipulation of Dismissal #13 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated.(DS, ilcd)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal /JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Elster, Jason)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/16/2020. The Court directs the parties to file a joint proposed scheduling order within 14 days. (Other Deadline set for 4/30/2020.) (DS, ilcd)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley : Pursuant to the reassignment of this case, the Status Conference set 4/16/20 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. Entered on 4/16/20. (WG, ilcd)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce for all further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 4/15/2020. (MC, ilcd)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley granting #11 unopposed Motion to record withdrawal following remand. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated as counsel in this case. Entered on 4/14/20. (WG, ilcd)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Baier, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Richard North, Jr. to be replaced by Lori G. Cohen, Jason B. Elster and Michael T. Baier, [Unopposed] by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Responses due by 4/27/2020 (Baier, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Thomas Baier on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Baier, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason B Elster on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Elster, Jason)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone from Peoria before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 1-888-684-8852 and use access code 2500359. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. Entered on 4/8/20. (WG, ilcd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03827. .
March 25, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Central District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Harley Payney, Nichole Payney. Document entered in wrong case. All documents must be filed in lead case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Alyson Kassan on behalf of Harley Payney, Nichole Payney. (Kassan, Randi)
November 3, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3827-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP)
November 3, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13574588 filed by Nichole Payney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payney et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Represented By: Jason B Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Represented By: Jason B Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Payney
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Charles T Paglialunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Payney
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Charles T Paglialunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?