Johnson v. Nicklaus
Plaintiff: Tracy Eugene Johnson
Defendant: Service List and Sonja Nicklaus
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2020cv04152
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Aaron M Williams on behalf of Sonja Nicklaus (Williams, Aaron)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/16/20. Respondent shall, within 60 days, file an answer or other responsive pleading. Petitioner is granted 21 days from the filing of Respondent's answer or other responsive pleading to submit a reply. See written Order. (Respondent's answer due by 9/14/20.) (TC, ilcd)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-50215. .
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Springfield Division the electronic record. (ph, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is transferred forthwith to the Central District of Illinois for preliminary consideration pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. The Clerk shall effectuate the transfer forthwith and shall terminate the pending motions on this docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on July 10, 2020. Mailed notice (ph, )
July 10, 2020 ***Civil Case Transferred. (jlj, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus by Tracy Eugene Johnson against Sonja Nicklaus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Nicklaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service List
Represented By: Prisoner Correspondence 10 - Internal Use Only
Represented By: Chief of Criminal Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja Nicklaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?