Brown v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Brown
Defendant: Shan Jumper, Eric Kunkel and Gregg Scott
Case Number: 4:2020cv04159
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 9/1/2020, in the amount of $ 5.39; receipt number 24626009517 (JMB, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Brown. Gregg Scott waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (KE, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Gregg Scott on 7/27/2020. (KE, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/27/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/27/2020. Plaintiff has alleged enough facts to proceed with a First Amendment claim against Defendants Scott in his individual and official capacities. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Court directs the Clerk to terminate Shan Jumper and Eric Kunkel as Defendants. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court directs the Clerk to enter the standard qualified protective order under the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Court directs the Clerk to attempt service on Defendant under the standard procedures. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/27/2020. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Eugene Brown is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $10.78. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $5.39, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE, ilcd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Eugene Brown. (DS, ilcd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Eugene Brown. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Cover Sheet)(DS, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/16/2020. Plaintiff has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $400 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. (KE, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eugene Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Scanning Page)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Jumper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?