Marshall et al v. Liberty Health Care Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Billy A Speagle, Tony Ainley and Tommy Marshall
Defendant: . Perez, Shan Jumper, Gregg Scott and Liberty Health Care Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04175
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received as to Billy Speagle on 9/29/2020, in the amount of $ 16.67; receipt number 24626009587 (JMB, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing re Filing Fee by Plaintiff Billy A Speagle . (DS, ilcd) Modified on 9/29/2020 to include plaintiff's name (KM, ilcd).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/27/2020. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Billy A Speagle is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $33.33. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $16.67, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE, ilcd)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/27/2020. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Tony Ainley is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $15.63. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $7.82, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Billy A Speagle. (KE, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Billy A Speagle.(KE, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Tony Ainley. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 8/27/2020 to correct Plaintiff's name. (KE, ilcd).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tony Ainley. Responses due by 9/8/2020. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 8/26/2020 to correct which plaintiff (DS, ilcd).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/17/2020. Plaintiffs have not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $400 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiffs an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiffs must either pay the $400 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. (KE, ilcd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tony Ainley, Billy A Speagle, Tommy Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Scanning Page)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall et al v. Liberty Health Care Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Jumper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Health Care Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy A Speagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ainley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?