Pegues et al v. Liberty Health Care Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Walter Pegues, Kenneth Seidler and Jamal Sharifpour
Defendant: . Perez, Shan Jumper, Gregg Scott and Liberty Health Care Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04178
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's 10/1/20 Text order by Walter Pegues. (ED, ilcd)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/5/2020. Plaintiff Sharifpour filed a Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis #10 . His petition and his trust fund ledgers #11 disclose a balance of $5,777.34. Plaintiff's Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis #10 is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee in full within 21 days of this Order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of his claims without prejudice.(SAG, ilcd)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/1/2020. Plaintiff Pegues' Motion for Extension of Time #12 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file any motion seeking waiver or reduction of the initial partial filing fee by October 14, 2020.(SAG, ilcd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Court's 9/11/2020 Text Order regarding filing fee by Plaintiff Walter Pegues. Responses due by 10/14/2020. (KB, ilcd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jamal Sharifpour (KB, ilcd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jamal Sharifpour.(KB, ilcd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Kenneth Seidler is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/11/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Walter Pegues is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $219.88. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $109.94, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/3/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Kenneth Seidler. (ED, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth Seidler. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (ED, ilcd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Walter Pegues. (ED, ilcd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Walter Pegues. Responses due by 9/15/2020. (ED, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/18/2020. Plaintiff, Jamal Sharifpour has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $400 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiff, Jamal Sharifpour, must either pay the $400 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice.(SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/18/2020. Plaintiff, Kenneth Seidler has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $400 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiff, Kenneth Seidler, must either pay the $400 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice(SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/18/2020. Plaintiff, Walter Pegues has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $400 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiff, Walter Pegues, must either pay the $400 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice(SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamal Sharifpour, Kenneth Seidler, Walter Pegues.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pegues et al v. Liberty Health Care Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Jumper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Health Care Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Pegues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Sharifpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?