Gills v. Jeffreys et al
Petitioner: Jaryan Gills
Respondent: Rob Jeffreys and W Rankin
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2020cv04187
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/14/2020. Petitioner's Petition #1 is an emergency petition for release from state custody due to unconstitutional conditions of confinement, namely the COVID-19 pandemic. He does not challenge the underlying conviction for which he is incarcerated. See Petition #1 , at pp. 8-9. Respondent is directed to file a response to Petitioner's Petition #1 by November 4, 2020. (JMB, ilcd)
September 15, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 9/15/20, in the amount of $5.00; receipt number 24626009546. (TC, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/2/20. On August 26, 2020, Petitioner, Jaryan Gills, submitted a Petition Under 28 U.S.C. section 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody #1 to this court. Petitioner has not paid the $5.00 filing fee and has not filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT Petitioner is allowed thirty (30) days to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with the required trust fund ledger showing the past six months trust fund account activity attached. (Miscellaneous Deadline set 10/2/2020.) (KM, ilcd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Jaryan Gills. Responses due by 9/9/2020. (ED, ilcd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jaryan Gills. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(ED, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gills v. Jeffreys et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaryan Gills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?