Strunk v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Darold S Strunk
Defendant: East Moline Police Department and Ryan Clark
Case Number: 4:2020cv04189
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Ryan Clark on 10/26/2020. (KE, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/26/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/26/2020. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff states a Fourth Amendment claim for excessive force incident to Plaintiff's arrest. This case proceeds solely on the claims identified in this paragraph. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Plaintiff's motion for the Court to appoint counsel is denied #4 , with leave to renew after Plaintiff demonstrates that he has made reasonable efforts to find counsel on his own. The East Moline Police Department is dismissed and terminated as a Defendant. The clerk is directed to enter the standard order granting Plaintiff's in forma pauperis petition and assessing an initial partial filing fee, if not already done, and to attempt service on Defendants pursuant to the standard procedures. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Darold S Strunk regarding Trust Fund Ledgers. (MJC, ilcd)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 9/16/2020 granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b) (4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE, ilcd)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Darold S Strunk (JMB, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Darold S Strunk. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (KE, ilcd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Darold S Strunk.(KE, ilcd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darold S Strunk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strunk v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Moline Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darold S Strunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?