Felts v. Lochard et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Felts
Defendant: Hughes Lochard, Brooke McNeely, Debbie Fuqua, Reene Vanzanit, Jennifer Blaesing and David Marcowitz
Case Number: 4:2020cv04197
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeremy Felts. Jennifer Blaesing waiver sent on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (KE, ilcd)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/12/2020. Plaintiff's motion for leave to waive the initial, partial filing fee #17 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's trust fund ledger reveals that, presently, he does not have the funds necessary to pay the initial, partial filing fee imposed by the Court. Plaintiff has represented to the Court that he does not have the prospects of paying the initial, partial filing fee in the near future. Accordingly, the Court will waive the initial, partial filing fee imposed by the Court on October 9, 2020, and Plaintiff may proceed with this case without paying this fee at this time. However, Plaintiff should understand that, upon filing this case, he became responsible for paying the filing fee, and therefore, he remains ultimately responsible to pay the entire filing fee if and when he is financially able to do so. (KE, ilcd)
November 6, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to waive filing fee filed by Defendants Debbie Fuqua, David Marcowitz. (Jennetten, Peter)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to waive filing fee by Plaintiff Jeremy Felts. Responses due by 11/19/2020 (JMB, ilcd)
November 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: David Marcowitz answer due 12/14/2020. (KE, ilcd)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER of Service of Summons by David Marcowitz. (Jennetten, Peter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Betsy Ann Wirth on behalf of Debbie Fuqua, David Marcowitz (Wirth, Betsy)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Debbie Fuqua, David Marcowitz. (Jennetten, Peter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 Designation of Lead Counsel by Peter R Jennetten on behalf of Debbie Fuqua, David Marcowitz. (Jennetten, Peter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Debbie Fuqua, David Marcowitz. (Jennetten, Peter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Peter R Jennetten on behalf of Debbie Fuqua, David Marcowitz (Jennetten, Peter)
October 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Prisoner Prepayment due by 11/16/2020 (KE, ilcd)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeremy Felts. Debbie Fuqua waiver sent on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (KE, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Jennifer Blaesing, Debbie Fuqua, Hughes Lochard, David Marcowitz, Brooke McNeely, Renea Vanzanit on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver McNeely, #2 Waiver Marcowitz, #3 Waiver Lochard, #4 Waiver Fuqua, #5 Waiver Blaesing)(KE, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/13/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER e5ntered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/13/2020. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Complaint states a medical claim in violation of his Due Process rights protected by the Fourteenth Amendment. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Clerk is directed to attempt service on all named Defendants pursuant to the Court's standard procedures. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #5 GRANTED. Finally, Plaintiff reminded of his obligation to pay the initial, partial filing fee of $10.00 that the Court imposed in this case. If Plaintiff fails to pay this fee timely, the Court will dismiss this case. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/9/2020. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Jeremy Felts is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $20.00. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $10.00, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE, ilcd)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Jeremy Felts. (KE, ilcd)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeremy Felts. Responses due by 10/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Remark: IFP Form to Plaintiff pursuant to text order entered 9/21/20. (KE, ilcd)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/21/2020. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is DENIED with leave to re-file. Plaintiff has moved for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. Although Plaintiff has used the Court's IFP form in making his request, he has not submitted the entire form. Instead, Plaintiff has only provided the first page of the form. Moreover, Plaintiff has not submitted his trust fund ledgers from the Rushville facility, which is necessary for the Court to determine if he qualifies to proceed IFP. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed IFP is denied with leave to re-file. The Court of the Court is directed to provide the complete IFP form to Plaintiff. If Plaintiff desires to proceed IFP in this case, he should complete and file the entire IFP form. Plaintiff should also file his account ledgers from the Rushville facility when he files the completed, entire IFP form. Plaintiff should take these actions within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, or the Court will consider dismissing this case for failure to pay the filing fee and for failure to comply with the Court's Order. (KE, ilcd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeremy Felts. Responses due by 10/2/2020 (KE, ilcd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeremy Felts. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Page)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felts v. Lochard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Lochard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Fuqua
Represented By: Peter R Jennetten
Represented By: Betsy Ann Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reene Vanzanit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Blaesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marcowitz
Represented By: Peter R Jennetten
Represented By: Betsy Ann Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?