Anderson v. Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility
Plaintiff: Michael L Anderson
Defendant: Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility
Case Number: 4:2020cv04201
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT entered. (KE, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/13/2020. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #4 is DENIED. Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, and therefore, allowing Plaintiff to file his proposed amended complaint would be futile. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is DENIED. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE based upon Plaintiff's failure to file a complaint upon which relief can be granted. Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). If Plaintiff wishes to appeal this judgment, he must file a notice of appeal with this Court within thirty (30) days of the entry of judgment. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). If Plaintiff wishes to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, his motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis must identify the issues that he will present on appeal to assist the Court in determining whether the appeal is taken in good faith. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Michael L Anderson. (KM, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael L Anderson. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (KM, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael L Anderson. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Rushville Cover Sheets) (KM, ilcd)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/30/2020. Michael Anderson has sent a document to the Court using a form entitled "Attempt to Resolve" that is utilized by civil detainees at the Illinois Department of Human Services Treatment and Detention Facility in Rushville, Illinois. Therein, Anderson claims that he is being discriminated against based upon his religion. However, Anderson does not identify the person or persons, by proper name, who are allegedly discriminating against him. In order to avoid any statute of limitations problems, the Court has opened a new case on Anderson's behalf and has considered his correspondence as constituting the document necessary to do so. If Anderson wants to continue with this lawsuit, however, he must either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Anderson may not proceed with this lawsuit unless he either pays the filing fee or obtains leave of the Court to proceed in forma pauperis. Anderson should also consider filing a complaint on the forms provided by the Clerk of the Court should he desire to proceed with this case, and he must specifically identify the person or persons who are discriminating against him as the Defendant(s) in this case. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send the forms necessary to petition the Court to proceed in forma pauperis and the forms necessary to file a Complaint under 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 to Anderson. Anderson should either file these completed forms under the above referenced case number or pay the filing fee within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. If the Court does not receive these completed forms or the filing fee within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, the Court will interpret Anderson's silence as expressing his desire not to file a lawsuit, and the Court will close this case without taking any further action on the matter. (KE, ilcd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael L Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Page)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?