Aldeman v. Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Antoinette Aldeman
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv04205
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antoinette Aldeman. Commissioner of SSA served on 10/28/2020, answer due 2/25/2021. (ANW, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CSS-Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. CSS-Social Security Administration served on 9/28/2020, answer due 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(ED, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/28/2020 GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915. The Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis was submitted under penalty of perjury and sufficiently demonstrates that the Plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee in this action. It is ordered that the Clerk issue summons, and the United States Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, summons, and this Text Order upon the Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. (WG, ilcd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Antoinette Aldeman. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (DePree, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA, filed by Antoinette Aldeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses)(DePree, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: It appears the Plaintiff's counsel in this case inadvertently filed a Complaint #1 and Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 pertaining to an individual different from the Plaintiff identified in the caption of this case. The Complaint and Application to Proceed IFP are therefore STRICKEN. Counsel must inform the Court in writing if counsel did not intend to open this case, or must correct the errors in filing, by 10/2/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/25/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 9/25/2020 BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JONATHAN E. HAWLEY: MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Antoinette Aldeman. Responses due by 10/8/2020 (DePree, Michael) Modified on 9/25/2020 to strike document as incorrect document was attached (KB, ilcd).
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 9/25/2020 BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JONATHAN E. HAWLEY: COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA, filed by Antoinette Aldeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses)(DePree, Michael) Modified on 9/25/2020 to strike document due to incorrect document attached (KB, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldeman v. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: US ATTY-ROCK ISLAND SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Aldeman
Represented By: Michael DePree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?