Mehner v. Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Teresa Mehner
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv04209
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Teresa Mehner as to US Attorney General. (RES, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of SSA served on 10/13/2020, answer due 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(ED, ilcd)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/5/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915. The Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis was submitted under penalty of perjury and sufficiently demonstrates that the Plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee in this action. It is ordered that the Clerk issue summons, and the United States Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, summons, and this Text Order upon the Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. (WG, ilcd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Teresa Mehner. Responses due by 10/16/2020. (KB, ilcd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA, filed by Teresa Mehner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses)(DePree, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehner v. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Mehner
Represented By: Michael DePree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: US ATTY-ROCK ISLAND SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?