Kennedy v. Villarreal
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Kennedy
Defendant: Dora Villarreal
Case Number: 4:2020cv04217
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #6 , #7 Merit Review Order and Judgment. (ED, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/17/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Any amendment to the Complaint would be futile. This case is therefore terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot. The clerk is directed to enter a judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. 2. This dismissal shall count as one of the plaintiff's three allotted "strikes" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g). The Clerk of the Court is directed to record Plaintiff's strike in the three-strike log. 3. Plaintiff must still pay the full docketing fee of $350 even though his case has been dismissed. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall continue to make monthly payments to the Clerk of Court, as directed in the Court's prior order. 4. Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel #5 is denied. Plaintiff did not show that he made a reasonable attempt to obtain counsel on his own. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). 5. If Plaintiff wishes to appeal this dismissal, he must file a notice of appeal with this Court within 30 days of the entry of judgment. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a). A motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis should set forth the issues Plaintiff plans to present on appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1)(C). If Plaintiff does choose to appeal, he will be liable for the $505.00 appellate filing fee irrespective of the outcome of the appeal. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/17/2020) (SAG, ilcd).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $24.67. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. Plaintiff is ultimately responsible for ensuring that the initial partial filing fee and required monthly payments are made. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/15/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Robert Lee Kennedy (SAG, ilcd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Robert Lee Kennedy. Responses due by 10/27/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Robert Lee Kennedy.(SAG, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dora Villarreal, filed by Robert Lee Kennedy.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?