Caldwell v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Caldwell
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi S.A., AVENTIS PHARMA S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc and Sanofi-Aventis US Inc
Case Number: 4:2023cv04186
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: The Court adopts the Discovery Plan #16 . Court adopts all deadlines as proposed including the following: Discovery due by 1/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2025. Proposed pretrial order to be filed by 5/27/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 7/14/2025 at 9:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom before Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are expected to review Judge Hawley's Standing Order that was revised on 4/7/2022. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. Parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. Counsel/Parties are reminded of the importance of appearing for hearings scheduled via telephone. Failure to appear will result in in-person appearances for all further proceedings. Entered: 12/19/2023. (WG)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Northrip, William)
November 17, 2023 Filing 15 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [11/17/2023 09:30:05 AM]. File Size [ 2682 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:33 ]. (admin).
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 Supplemental 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Northrip, William)
November 17, 2023 Remark: The 11/17/2023 docket entry was returned as an undeliverable email address as to Ryan L Thompson. Attorney Ryan L Thompson email account disabled. (LN)
November 17, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via telephone by Attorneys Tracy Turner and Paige Boldt for the Plaintiff and Attorney William Northrip for Defendants for Status Conference held on 11/17/2023. Discussion held regarding the status of the case. Parties to confer regarding discovery and dispositive motions and file a proposed discovery plan by 12/18/2023. (Tape #PRC: 9:30 a.m.) (FDS)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Northrip, William)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Northrip, William)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to this case being newly transferred to the CDIL, a Status Conference is set for 11/17/2023 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling (551) 285-1373 and enter the Meeting ID: 16009516536 when prompted to do so. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/27/23. (WG)
October 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tracy L Turner on behalf of Valerie Caldwell (Turner, Tracy)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-08044. .
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Central District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC. 16511)(my)
October 26, 2023 Remark: Attorneys Mikal Watts and Paige Boldt are not admitted to practice in this district. Each have been sent the appropriate information to become admitted in the CDIL. (JJK)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
September 7, 2017 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Summons Returned Executed. Summons Returned Executed should not be filed into any docket, master or member case, pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 3 in the Master Case. (tm)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
September 6, 2017 Filing 4 **STICKEN** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sanofi US Services Inc. served on 9/5/2017, answer due 9/26/2017. (Thompson, Ryan) Modified on 9/7/2017 (tm).
August 22, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(tm)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6317253) filed by Valerie Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Ryan L. Thompson added to party Valerie Caldwell(pty:pla).(Thompson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US Inc
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Caldwell
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: Tracy L Turner
Represented By: Paige Nicole Boldt
Represented By: Ryan L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?