Penton v. Haq et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Penton
Defendant: Yasir Haq, . Tinwalla, Paula Lodge, Shan Jumper, Karen Smith, Michelle Shultz, . Leftridge and Greg Donathan
Case Number: 4:2023cv04212
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/24/24. Plaintiff's motion for status on his request for request counsel #19 is DENIED to the extent that he is renewing his motion for counsel. The Court does not possess the authority to require an attorney to accept pro bono appointments on civil cases such as this. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 653 (7th Cir. 2007). The most that the Court may do is to ask for volunteer counsel. Jackson v. County of McLean, 953 F.2d 1070, 1071 (7th Cir. 1992). In deciding whether to recruit counsel for a plaintiff, a district court is to determine: (1) has the indigent plaintiff made a reasonable attempt to obtain counsel or been effectively precluded from doing so; and if so, (2) given the difficulty of the case, does the plaintiff appear competent to litigate it himself? Pruitt, 503 F.3d at 65455 (citing Farmer v. Haas, 990 F.2d 319, 32122 (7th Cir. 1993)). Here, Plaintiff has not demonstrated that he has made any attempt whatsoever to obtain counsel on his own. Plaintiff states that he is unable to attempt to find counsel on his own, but this requirement is mandatory before a court will attempt to recruit counsel for a pro se litigant. Thomas v. Wardell, 951 F.3d 854, 859 (7th Cir. 2020); Eagan v. Dempsey, 987 F.3d 667, 682 (7th Cir. 2021). Furthermore, Plaintiff has offered no reason why he is incapable of litigating this case himself; he simply asks for counsel based upon the alleged difficulty of the case and his lack of knowledge of the law. However, Defendants have not yet filed an answer to Plaintiffs Complaint, and the Court has not yet entered a Scheduling Order. Therefore, there is nothing currently for Plaintiff to do, and there is no reason to expend the very limited resource of recruited counsel in this case at this stage of the litigation. After Defendants files their Answer, the Court will enter a Scheduling Order that should assist Plaintiff in litigating this case. (ANW)
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION Requesting Status of Motion to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jordan Penton. Responses due by 2/6/2024 (AEM)
January 18, 2024 Filing 18 Remark: Letter requesting copies sent on this date. Docket Sheet attached. (AEM)
January 18, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Penton.. Leftridge waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (KE)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Penton. Greg Donathan waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Yasir Haq waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Shan Jumper waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Paula Lodge waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Karen Smith waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver Jumper, #2 Executed Waiver Haq, #3 Executed Waiver Smith, #4 Executed Waiver Donathan)(KE)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Yasir Haq, Tinwalla, Paula Lodge, Shan Jumper, Karen Smith, Michelle Schultz, Leftridge, Greg Donathan on 1/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Smith Waiver, #2 Shultz Waiver, #3 Lodge Waiver, #4 Leftridge Waiver, #5 Jumper Waiver, #6 Haq Waiver, #7 Donathan Waiver)(KE)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/16/2024. See written order. (KE)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/16/2024. Pursuant to its review, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Complaint states a medical claim in violation of his Fourteenth Amendment Due Process claim against Defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendants pursuant to the Court's standard procedures. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 GRANTED. See written order. (KE)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 Letter from Jordan Penton requesting a copy of case - included two stamped, self-addressed envelopes. (TC)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 Additional letter from plaintiff Jordan Penton requesting copies. (BMG)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from plaintiff Jordan Penton requesting copies. (BMG)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from plaintiff Jordan Penton requesting copies. (BMG)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Jordan Penton (KE)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/30/2023. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $402 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Jordan Penton is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $83.33. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $41.67, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/30/23. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #5 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives that review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (ANW)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust Fund Ledger due by 12/13/2023. (KE)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff (KE)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jordan Penton. Responses due by 12/13/2023 (KE)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Jordan Penton (KE)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jordan Penton. Responses due by 12/13/2023 (KE)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jordan Penton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penton v. Haq et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasir Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Tinwalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Jumper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Leftridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Donathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?