Hydron v. Donathan et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Hydron
Defendant: Greg Donathan, Erin Posey, Sandra Ham, J B Pritzker, Kwame Raoul, . Strode, . Maze, . Wireball, . Wear, Ashley Gregory and Grace Hou
Case Number: 4:2024cv04002
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/27/2024. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration #12 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for counsel #13 is DENIED because this case is closed, and therefore, there is nothing for recruited counsel to do. See written order. (KE)
February 26, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kyle Hydron. Responses due by 3/11/2024 (FDS)
February 26, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order by Plaintiff Kyle Hydron. Responses due by 3/11/2024 (FDS)
February 12, 2024 Filing 11 JUDGMENT entered. (KE)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/12/2024. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because it fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A; Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). This case is closed, and all pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter a judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. If he wishes to appeal this dismissal, Plaintiff must file a notice of appeal with this Court within thirty (30) days of the entry of judgment. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a). A motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis should set forth the issues that Plaintiff plans to present on appeal. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1)(C). If he chooses to appeal, Plaintiff will be liable for the $605.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. See written order. (KE)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/26/2024. Plaintiff's motion to waive filing fee #9 is DENIED. Plaintiff asserts that he does not have the funds necessary to pay the reduced filing fee assessed by the Court in this case and that he has no means to obtain any funds due to his detention. However, Plaintiff's statements are belied by the deposits made into his trust account. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion is denied. (KE)
January 25, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Request Reduced Fee be Waived by Plaintiff Kyle Hydron. Responses due by 2/8/2024 (AEM)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/16/24. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED.2. Plaintiff is given twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to file a proposed amended complaint.3. If Plaintiff fails to file a proposed amended complaint by this deadline, the Court will dismiss this case. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (ANW)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/9/24. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #7 is DENIED. As the Court previously explained to Plaintiff in the Court's January 5, 2024 Order, the Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives that review that the Court will conduct in the near future (ANW)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kyle Hydron. Responses due by 1/22/2024 (AEM)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/5/24. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #4 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives that review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (ANW)
January 3, 2024 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Kyle Hydron (KE)
January 3, 2024 Filing 5 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust Fund Ledgers due by 1/17/2024. (KE)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kyle Hydron. Responses due by 1/17/2024 (KE)
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kyle Hydron. Responses due by 1/17/2024 (KE)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 1/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kyle Hydron. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Page)(KE)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/3/2024. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $405 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Kyle Hydron is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $15.83. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $7.92, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hydron v. Donathan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hydron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Donathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Ham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Strode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Maze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Wireball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Wear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?