Sullivan v. Bygrave et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Sullivan
Defendant: Natalia Bygrave, . Hawk, . Baldwin and Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2024cv04004
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/23/2024. Plaintiff files a Motion to Strike Amended Complaint #8 stating that he filed a duplicative copy of his Complaint because he did not know if the Court received it. The Court docketed the duplicative copy as an Amended Complaint and reset the merit review deadline. Plaintiff now asks the Court to strike his Amended Complaint and to conduct a merit review of his initial Complaint. #8 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to STRIKE the Amended Complaint #7 and RESET the merit review deadline for 2/5/2024. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #9 is MOOT, as it is duplicative of the previously filed motion.(ANW)
January 22, 2024 Filing 10 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Anthony Sullivan. (BMG)
January 22, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Sullivan. Responses due by 2/5/2024. (BMG)
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #7 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Sullivan. Responses due by 2/5/2024. (BMG)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $405 filing fee).Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Anthony Sullivan is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/22/2024. (SAG)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 STRICKEN pursuant to 1/23/24 Text Order - AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Sullivan.(ANW) Modified on 1/23/2024 to strike (ANW).
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/17/2024. Plaintiff filed a Complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 on January 5, 2024. Prior to merit review, Plaintiff now files an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #4 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file his Amended Complaint and reset the merit review deadline 30 days out.(ANW)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Anthony Sullivan (SAG)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Sullivan. Responses due by 1/30/2024 (SAG)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $405 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Anthony Sullivan is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/16/2024. (SAG)
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Sullivan. Responses due by 1/22/2024 (SAG)
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 Remark: IFP form attached pursuant to Text Order 1/5/2024 (SAG)
January 5, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(ANW)
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Sullivan.(ANW)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/5/24. TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $405 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiff must either pay the $405 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice.(ANW) Modified on 1/8/2024 to correct filing fee amount (SAG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Bygrave et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalia Bygrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?