Bakalik v. Drug Cartel et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bakalik
Defendant: Drug Cartel, ISIS-Hamas-Boko Haram-Others Unnamed, Sex Traffickers - Sex Offenders, Xi Jinping, . Maduro, Vladimir Putin and Black Lives Matters Organization
Case Number: 4:2024cv04044
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Remark: Clerk's Office received this date, a journal entitled "Moving Beyond and Past This" from Ken Bakalik. Journal is held conventionally in Clerk's Office file. (TK)
April 25, 2024 Filing 43 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. (BMG)
April 25, 2024 Filing 42 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. (BMG)
April 25, 2024 Filing 41 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. (BMG)
April 25, 2024 Filing 40 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. (BMG)
April 25, 2024 Filing 39 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. (BMG)
April 25, 2024 Filing 38 Remark: Clerk's Office received this date a journal entitled "I Just Don't Know" from plaintiff Ken Bakalik. Journal is held conventionally in Clerk's Office file. (TK)
April 24, 2024 Filing 37 Letter from Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik (FDS)
April 22, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION to Incorporate Documents by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 5/6/2024. (BMG)
April 19, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION to Speak by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 5/3/2024. (BMG)
April 18, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION for Further Claims by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 5/2/2024. (BMG)
April 17, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION of Plaintiff's Intentions by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 5/1/2024.(BMG)
April 9, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION to Explain Request Slips by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/23/2024. (BMG)
April 9, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION for Further Explanation by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/23/2024. (BMG)
April 3, 2024 Filing 30 Letter from Ken Bakalik (TK)
April 1, 2024 Filing 29 Additional MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/15/2024. (BMG)
March 27, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Plead Guilty by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/10/2024 (DW)
March 27, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION For This Honorable Court to Order Rushville Treatment Facility to Mail Plaintiffs Property to Pacific Garden Mission by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/10/2024 (DW)
March 27, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for This Honorable Court to Order Independent Blood Test and Urine Test by Independent Entity by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/10/2024 (DW)
March 27, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Ask Court to Order Investigation by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/10/2024 (DW)
March 27, 2024 Filing 24 Exhibit re #1 Complaint by Kenneth Bakalik. (DW)
March 26, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/9/2024.(BMG)
March 21, 2024 Filing 22 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik regarding filing fee. (BMG)
March 21, 2024 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 3/21/2024, in the amount of $15.00; receipt number 200001117. (DS)
March 20, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 4/3/2024. (BMG)
March 15, 2024 Filing 20 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. (BMG)
March 14, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/28/2024. (BMG)
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Rest Assured by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/28/2024. (BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 17 +++ SEALED EXHIBITS.. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5)(SAG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 16 Letter from plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik regarding electronic filing. (BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Media Coverage by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/20/2024.(BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION Regarding Merit by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/20/2024.(BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/20/2024.(BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 12 Additional MOTION of Merit by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/20/2024. (BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION of Merit by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/20/2024. (BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/20/2024. (BMG)
March 6, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing conventional exhibit. Plaintiff submits a handwritten journal. Journal is held conventionally in the Clerk's Office file. (TK)
March 6, 2024 Set Deadline: Miscellaneous Deadline 4/4/2024 (SAG)
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Kenneth Bakalik (KE)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 3/19/2024. (KE)
March 5, 2024 TEXT ORDER entered by Senior District Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/5/2024. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $405 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $4.17. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $2.08, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE)
March 4, 2024 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Kenneth Bakalik. (BMG)
March 4, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/18/2024.(BMG)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik regarding online access. (BMG)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Merit Review by Plaintiff Kenneth Bakalik. Responses due by 3/18/2024. (BMG)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(ANW)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Bakalik.(ANW)
February 28, 2024 TEXT ORDER Entered by Senior District Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/28/24. Plaintiff has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $405 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiff must either pay the $405 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice.(ANW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakalik v. Drug Cartel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bakalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Cartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISIS-Hamas-Boko Haram-Others Unnamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sex Traffickers - Sex Offenders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xi Jinping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Maduro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir Putin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matters Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?