Ameritech Ben Plan, et al v. Foster-Hall, et al
Plaintiff: Indiana Bell Telephone Company, Ameritech Pension Plan, New Media Enterprises, Inc., Ameritech Development Corporation, OH Ameritech Advanced Data Services of Ohio, Inc., IN Ameritech Advanced Data Services of Indiana, Inc., Ameritech Telecommunications Services Company, Ameritech Advanced Data Services of Illinois, Inc., Ameritech Health Connections, Inc., Ameritech Communications, Inc., Ameritech Publishing, Inc., Michigan Bell Telephone Company, MI Ameritech Advanced Data Services of Michigan, Inc., Ameritech International, Inc., Ameritech Credit Corporation, Ameritech Management Pension Plan, Ameritech Information Systems, Inc., Ameritech Corporation, WI Ameritech Advanced Data Services of Wisconsin, Inc., Ameritech Services, Inc., Ameritech Interactive Media Services, Inc., Ameritech Long Distance Industry Services, Inc., Wisconsin Bell Telephone Company, Ameritech New Zealand Limited, Ameritech Benefit Plan Committee, Ameritech Mobile Communications, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company, The and IL Bell Telephone Co
Defendant: Local 188 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Phyllis Barnes, Betty Bober, Carol Amato, Margaret Perrill, Debby Flynn Adomaitis, Evelyn Dallos, Linda Croddy, Virginia Jones, Communications Workers of America, Janet Appleton, Brenda Smitherman-Muir, Local 383 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 336 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Debra J Anderson, Annette Foster-Hall, Sara Sue Adkins, Christine Berger, Patricia Elick, Vicki Andrews, Ruth Johnson, Diana Beattie, Shirley Connell, Janet Champer, Lesle Gardner, Mary Jo Avery, Anne Marie Allen, Local 165 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Polly Niemeier, Local 399 International Brotherhoon of Electrical Workers, Sandra Ballard, Diane Richard, H Carleen Leach, Leanne Grover, Wilbur Haynes, Brenda Gibson, Frances Timmerman, Dolores Harmacinski, Sharon Parrish, Francie Wingo, Helen Kloess and Kathryn Kreger
Intervenor Plaintiff: Marsha D Johnson, Loyce J Newton, Brenda Gildersleeve, Judy Spires, Deborah Chapman Sharif, Joan C Forcier, Gloria McKnight, Shirley Rebecca Shirley Rebecca Erickson Ross, Yvonne Robinson, Louise M Hafey, Anne K Kershner, Phyllis Jackson, Karen K Cousino, Cheryl M Johnson, Jacqueline McClain, Carolyn Miles, Elrena Jones, Erma Pugh, Barbara J Nicholas, Nancy MacArthur, Donna L Stepnoski, Lillian L Fritze, Barbara K Blanchard, Beatrice Custer, Shirley A Mervosh, Teresa Halter, Joanne Arnold, Pearl Dinwieddie, Sue E Seevers, Donna Brown, Nancy J Bellotta, Gloria J Edgar, Chirstina Jane Dalie, Irene Smith, Susan I Dattilo, Karen G Belden, Dianne Marie Rieves, Patricia L McGarth, Karen Schmidt, Mary McCreary, Sharon L Tynan, Janice F Shaw, Clara K Stephens, Joyce A Delgadillo, Margaret Kilson, Debra L Gramza, Susan Page, Mildred Hardnick, Cecilia M Gnadr, Carmen Banaszynski, Cynthia M Dawson, Mirta Iris Gonzales, Patricia Archambeau, Elizabeth Tyson, Sally A Kates, Linda Anderson, Yvonia Davis, Dianna L Bosley, Nancy J Dodson, Barbara Lee, Mariah Washington, Linda F Jackson, Diane Y Fox, Janice B Bush, Geraldine R King, Marsha Bruce, Nancy Price, Rinda R Ford, Judith Anter, Margaret E Johnson, Sandra L Johrendt, Jacqueline A Fergerson, Diane Sieloff, Clara G Clark, Deborah L Hess, Sharon D Gonder-Harris-Fluker, Barbara E Beck, Sharon L Marion, Peggy A Hampton, Mayme Isom, Rose Devitt, Mary A Brown, C Lynne Pryor, Blanca E Lamp, Ruth E Etter, Shirley Barron, Barbara L Kolby, Georgia A LaPlante, Linda M Goan, Janet Edwards, Mary L Fritz, Patricia A Fry, Gertrude Bennett, Diane DeMaagd, Helen A Jones, Susan Hamman-Wichert, Paticia A McPherson, Donna M Goetsch-Schaller, Celia D Simuel-Arnold, Jane K Herncjar, Willa Prewitt-Brown, Margaret A Sanchez, Vicki A Kaiser, Deneen Armstrong, Christine M Leasure-McCarrich, Alexandra J Holloman, Sandra Ming, Joan Jones-Buckles, Arlis Giles, Nicola Remson, Pamela A Murphy, Shirley Bolden, Sally Bunyan, Sharon L Cooper, Roberta Barrick, Betty L Hardin, Connie Holdaway, Violet Schreiner, M Brown-Royston, Bonnie Davidson, Diana L Storts, Genevieve Green, Diane M Murphy, Janice Anderson, Linda Bilbrey, Agnes Means, Janet R Longcore, Vera Brown, Mary Jane Flier-Ewing, Ernestine H Evans, Beverly A Lemmens, Rosemary A Halloran, Rebecca Reese, Maria B Goujon-Borton, Margaret M Ludwig, Pamela A Steger, Shirley Anne Norris, JoAnne Rokosky, Nathalia Brooks, Bonnie K Krachie, Diana S Buck, Dorothy J Bell, Jane M Cook, Olivia Underwood, Patricia A Hawes, Judith L Robinson-Hansen, Charol L Shiffman, Beverly A Richey, Linda L Daugherty, Christine M Russell, Donna E Roof, Karen J Easley, Brenda F Dishner, Maria R Victor, Diane L Thompson, Ella M Lindee, Krystyna Bush, Vicki Market, Glenna M Campbell, Judith L Brown, Carolyn L Hatwood, Alma J Morris, Rosalind F Toyer, Kathleen A Schneider, Karen Harrington, Carol Ann Dmytryka, Kathy Ammons, Christine L Smith, Patricia E Jordan, Linda Lou Barnhart, Patricia A Dempsey, Charlotte Gates, Sue Becker, Johanne M Lowden, Nancy A Johnson, Lynn McNeil, Catherine Ellingboe, Fredia Pekarek, RaenAnne Bodbyl, Marjorie F Lindsay, Paula P Shepherd, Pamela M Hayes, Myra Howell, Gloria J Lotz, Dian Steeg, Patricia E Doherty, Jacqueline Taylor, Deborah Reed, Darlene Kathryn Ferris, Ruth A Evanoff, Michelle D Butts, Nancy K Nowicki, Marie A Koldash, Nini Lewis, Vicky L Vaughn, Nancy Powers, Sheron Gogoe, Patricia Pickett-Mickey, Patrice Rigden, Patricia L Luhrs, Renetta Currie, Lana R Mans, Catherine A Hovanic, Lenice Canty, Andrea T Hunter, Margaret Beck, Margaret J Ruminski, Pamela E Driscoll, Daria S Good-Birmingham, Carla J Grubb, Clare A Harner, Josephine Addis, Debra K Dziad, Linda I Birkey-Peterson, Linda Susan Tackla, Wanda Pulfer, Shirley A Jamar, Marjorie A Becker, Barbara J Hill, Suzan A Schober, Beverly D Moore, Carol Pizzino, Judith E Valko, Marsha A Love, Sally Patton, Linda Vistein, Carol S DeMarcus, Janice A Craig, Leslie Springman, Dorothy A Hawthorne, Pamela E Jones-Jochum, Willie Jean Coleman, Karen J Humble, Janetta Thompson, Rhonda Samuels, Linda K Gesen, Patricia A Stocker, Maxine K Collier, Peggy S Sams, Ann M Kammerer, Janet K Binger, Herta G Maichl, Zrothea L Donnie, Marlene George, Sandra L Endres, Betty J Mullins, Maxine L Godwin, Linda J Michalowski, Theresa M Szilagyi, Jacqueline F Marshall, Kathryn A Begley, Linda L Boshu, Randi Sue Stewart-Reiner, Barbara A Dale Collins, Margariette Stephens, Judith K Hepner, Diana Kay Conner, Betty J Horton, Denise Smith, Deanna L Stein, De'Ann Rauwerda, Annie B Draper, Lucy Reed, Sherry E Sidner, Ida Paul, Gloria J Olson, Arletha Holloway, Sharon Saults, Gayle Kippen, Mable L Huffman, Glenda S Brunson, Donna M Swain, Mary Marques, Johnnie M Smith, Charlene D Fluker, Betty J Urquhart, Diana MacArthur, Constance M Gilbert, Joanne M Garland, Patricia A Smith, Carol Jean Marsh, Carol Ann Addington, Ravella A Hartman, Willie Pruitt, Doris M Tubbs, M. Dawn Nietubicz, Velma Fleming, Donna Currie, Sharon L Walsh, Jeanette Gawkowski, Ruth E Krupp, Linda M Clark, Jane A Harris, Frances Nicholas, Catherine A Miner, Inez M Hensley, Martha Jones, Julie A Hess, Nellie Roper Brogdon, Alethea Hall, Linda Kent, Patricia Clinkscales, Delores M Hartung, Constance M Killings, Blanche Sewell, Betty Griffin, Virginia A Larson, Patricia Medlin, Lois A Brull, Edith M Shannon, Mary Asciutto, Jeanette Andre, Cynthia M Nicolai, Barbara K Cochran, Dorothy Kazmir, Karen D Deeger, Marveta Simmons, Linda Park, Carrie L Owens, Kathy Ditzel, Virginia K Hamman-Fisher, Karen Pandolfo, Linda F Coates, Georgeanne McKeever, Mattie Crimbley, Debra Adams, Barbara V Diderrich, Arlene Mary Kaiser, Joanne Rebecca Stansfield, Nancy M Clemens, Janet S Miller, Cheryl D Mager, Barbara J Burris, Brenda R Smith, Carol LaPorte, Cathy LeVan, Karen Shearer, Sharon Slatt, Peggy L Cobb, Delores J Oliver, Linda K Guthrie, Karen L Kennedy, Janie E Elliott, Diane R Jones, Annette Colvin, Barbara Aurino, Charlene Rae Baas, Donna R Pavey, Mary Kay Stocker, Shirley Lovins Hartle, Mary Caster, Victoria Y Carr, Patricia Adams, Patricia DeRose, Janice Perugini, Melody Maurer, Vivian Peterson, Mary Jean MacNealy, Denise J Thomas, Johnnie P Moultrie, Janet E Sagert, Harriet S Campbell, Janet Ingles, Vickie D Warren, Rose June Harvey, Brenda Canty, Karen Buckner, Donna Moneypenny, Debra M Gollick, Kay Janssen, Sherry D Vondeling, Bridget M Lemonta, Anne L Urbanski, Maria A Sluiter, Shirley Mcfall, Virginia Steinko, Sharon Louise Tisevich, Connie Barnes, Barbara A Flood, Carol S Stemos-Winders, Sandra O Foster, Constance D Smith, Rosemary Redding-Lott, Amy L Vassallo, Veronica A Ruch, Sherline Sparks, Patti Stewart, Carolyn Henry, Madiline Austin, Frances Reeves, Louise E Richardson, Glenna Ilinsman, Bernadette Davis, Dinah L Janney, Linda J Coolidge, Margaret E Burgess Henderson, Jane Beverly, Betsy Bates, Janice Marie Taylor, Gail Plants, Kathleen Grow, Carolyn Dingle, Margaret A Rudolph, Linda Sielaff, Catherine S Harkins, Linda D Jefferson, Blance Pirtle, Deborah C Lund, Pamela A Glover-Johnson-Brown, Lillie R Dunn, Jane M Corliss, Nancy Hayworth, Sharon Elaine Arnold, Rita Anne Hutson, Sharon Polden, Linda Lee Keena, Gail Beck, Jannie M Scott-Harris, Patricia Dimavicius, Ardyce P Daugherty, Julia R Harris, Kathy Klopfenstein, Paula Britton-Dozier, Brenda Allen, Cynthia Preston, Diane E Stewart, Harriett J Christian, Jane VanHelden, Phyllis D Courter, Nancy Hagan, Kathryn L Hanson, Beatrice S Varga, Beverly Joe Maxwell, Patricia Tarpley, Antonino M Bloomfield, Wanda M Klepper, Patricia Peterson, Kathleen Stevens, Pamela A Mills, Regina B Holland, Joyce Burns, Gertrude E Longmire, Karen S Ellis, Carol A Forystek, Alma M Ringer, Paula J Smigul, Deborah S Everse, Mildred L Ward, LaBertha James, Patricia Goltz, Bernice Garmon, Rita C Appleby Darrow, Sonja M Hughes, Cheryl Pline, Madeline L Cummings, Karla F Dickerson, Vanessa D Stewart, Susan M George, Mary Ann Enright, Patricia A Brown, Dallas E Keys, Victoria A Higginbotham, Charlestein Carter, Peggy Berger, Marsha Elkins, Ella R Brown, Charlotte A Macon, Virginia E Ogg, Noreen Machin, Roxanne Reyes Livingston, Michelle D Hane, Maryanne Roberts, Margaret M Dill, Mary Pendergast, Patricia A Cook, Madeline Giordano, Susan Cook, Clara L Boyd, Janice A Smith, JoAnn B Carter, Rita Appleby-Darrow, Judith Porter, Barbara S McCord, Carol A Burton, DeVonne Tucker, Jerry Pope, Christine A Chartrand, Rosalla A Goodfellow, Sally A Brogden, Dianne M Dalton, Alecia Y Martin, Vicky L Larson, Genever Franchi, Catherine S Grooms, Cynthia Ann Nuttall, Marlene Elam, Cozette Barrett, Sharon M Blake, Joan Fowler, Eileen Ruth Keller, Martha J Varney, Charlene Boyd, Crystal J Roberts, Therese Cheetham, Carol Brewer, Marilyn Jordan, Katheryn Fineout-Lightfoot, Teletha Turner, Kathleen M Emch, Pamela M Borucki-Kopena, Minnie Pearl Taylor, Avonia Lee, Valerie J Nicholas, Kaye Y Klokis, Andrea Love, Shelia A Craft, Sandra Crowe-Mullens, Mary Clarke, Lynn M Isaacson, Barbara W Stodghill, Henrietta Y Knox, Kathryn Bierbaum, Mary A Murphy, Cynthia Schweda, Kathleen S Ward, Patricia M Chrystan, Jule A Smith, Sandra L Schmidt, Doria K Newlin, Chris Moore, Renee Moore-Demyers, Cheryl Pope-Scherer, Katrina D Coleman, Elizabeth A Jones, Judith D Vaught, Jean Dennison, Deborah C Wallace, Judith Hindall, Judith A Jayla, Cynthia N Riley-Johnson-Davis, Brenda L Boston, Jane E Slezak, Jacqueline Reichman, Sandra M Littleton, Nancy J Devonshire, Jannie M Thornton, Mary L Lamorand, Brenda L Rouchion, Elizabeth J Klem, Mary R Skamiera, Sonya E LeQuia, Pamela S Halbig, Sandra R Burkows-Mackert, Carolyn S Tate, Mary E Curley, Nancy Park, Elizabeth A Buehl, Nina J Salata, Sherrie L Fellows, Sandra Evans, Darlene Stanislowski, Glenda Sharpley, Marjory K Marshall, Kathleen Barrett, Christine Thomas, JoAnn Fields, Bonita L Schwab, Debra C Sexton, Anna Rankin, Doris A Griffin, Juanita Brooks, Emma A Dye, Sharon Field, Beverly Suber, Dorothy J Heald, Melba J Nix, Patricia Pasinski, Joan E Rose, Mary Jo Fazulak, Margaret A Rushman, Jacquelyn M Johnston, Linda Fedewa, Marie B Cemborski-Seifert, Linda K Drewnowski, Carol Hamilton, Linda S Erdmann, Cheryl L Nuber, Sharon D Robinson, Catherine M Jandeveer, Mary Inkinen, Mary M Gonyer, Janice G Covell, Patricia H Wallace, Marjorie Saykally, Linda C Hernandez, Suzanne M Roach, Linda Dickeson, Dale Pritchard, Susan Clark, Sandra Ball, Mary J Sank-Williams-Newton, Joanna Lynn Thurston, Bonell L Frierson, Philistine Henning, Darline Artino, Marsha Curless, Dianne M Osgood, Nancy Pringh, Susan C Skurski, Shelia M Logan, Sandra Santy, Kay M Smiskey, Cathy Mason, Anna M Holloway, Darlene Scozzafave, Carol A Chovanec, Sharon L Jenks, Patricia A Burnett-Watts, Judith Sullivan, Carmen Alicea, Carol Markray, Cora Coulter, Shirley Hoffman, Diane M Burnett-Roy, Martha Ramsden, Katherine DeSpear, Joann N Burke-Foster, Victoria Restainer, Charron Cox, Debbie A Odeuvald, Beverly B Hodges, Sharon M Gibons, Patricia Ann Kastelic, Carole E Lewis-Tucker, Judy P Giddens, Jean C Quinn, Theresa A Ryan, Darlene M Foster, Mary Steiner, Catherine J Janick, Linda Smith, Vonnie S Jankowiak, Cynthia J Beach, Fredda L Coles, Patricia Loewengruber-Gunther, Linda A Rowan, Joy R Roberts, Lois Lyon, Linda M Cain-Neavor, Rose M Schneider, Harriet L Spencer-Spates, Cheryl Lee Bass, Arlene Sorensen, Pamela J Brunsfield, Linda R Butts, Julie A Exner, Beulah G Mumford, Bernice Dauthard, Linda Kmiec, Beverly Robinson, Lavon Jeffries, Delores Jordan, Jane A Fleury, Theresa Osowski, Mary Lou Phillips, Jane M Tankovich, Roxanna R Forton, Loretta G Johnson, Shirley A Johnson, Joann E Spears, Shirley M Denton, Mary Barto, Elaine Lata, Anita L Heaton-Wirkula, Mary J Hildreth, Sandra L Moon, Penny Harris, Lorena A Gerba, Seriata Johnson, Pearl H Overbey, Phyllis M Riffle, Lottie L Thompson, Judith A Dalton, Loraine Clements, Debra K Sadler, Patricia Lewis, Mae C Howard, Donna K Huges, Elizabeth Kurtzakowski, Connie R Dwyer, Linda A Niendorf, Deborah J Geer, Constance Kosick, Mary Trepka, JoAnn M Felty, Elizabeth Ballard, Edie Jackson, Elizabeth L Manhardt, Nathalie C Donell, Mary L Kohls-Ruehr, Uneta P Stegehuis, Marri Y Smith, Margaret K Sabisch, Diane B Fisher, Judy I Ely, Patricia Bowman, Sally Groot, Martha Kuglen, Mary L Livingston, Marie A Goodson, Carol LaCourse, Betty Pope, Cristine L Gaulke, Linda M Boogaard, Margaret Gause, Nadine Hassell, Della Robbins, Jacqueline Pierson, Darice E Spight, Georgia C Venzon-Little, Annette M Blanchard, Ller Priest, Patricia reed, Magdalene Benton, Virginia Sherrill, Sandra L Fenton, Annabelle Gilkerson, Norma J Clemons, Carol Carpenter, Patricia L Hill, Joyce A Holmes, Catherine L Braden, Barbara R Moore, Deborah Baker, Judith R Setter, Sharon LaFontaine, Debra A Schuette-Reimer, Paget Adair, Jill Jorgenson, Diana B Dowd-Arata, Roberta Lyne Ley, Marcia J Galambos, Gloria Van Acken-Grohn, Linda Y Early, Juanna E Maxwell, Orita Ruth Erhard, Grace J Klaas, Irma J Douglas, Marcia Matney, Paulette C Rhoades, Joyce M Franceski, Jane Repke, Rosalie A Holtrop, Louise M Mercer, Linda Chellevold, Jean L Lindley, Susan M Spangler, Linda D Lubin, Donelda M Hawkins, Rosanka Kleiser, Jerlyn A Carney, Christina Green, Velmateen Leonard, Angel J Humphrey, Carla L Cammarn-Carpenter, Kathleen Banasiak, Evlyn M King-Williams, Marionette McDowell, Zenora Patrick, Alice M Campbell, Gloria Justice, Bonnie K Meyer, Barbara J Deuparo, Renae R Severson, Cathy Pauli, Catherine Tarver, Karen Ward, Gloria L Hough, Christine A Triplett, Sharon Elayne Brown, Evelyn F Norris, Carol M Kelsch, Jacqueline A Curtis, Anna Simail, Deborah A Gillespie, Jacqueline Kendall, Kathryn L Strauss, Karen Anderson, Diana L Hartshorn-Saaler, Elaine K Hughes, Reynell O McClain, Patricia A Best, Linda Kostuck, Sharon W Ghighi, Debbie Darlas, Kristi Darling, Bonnie M Hammond, Grace Trzakowski, Connie L Shields, Lois Nash, Jane Brzezinski, Elizabeth J Laycock, Theresa Frederick, Karen Palmitieri, Catherine S Engen, Bessie Thompson, Donna L Rice, Kathy Edstrom, Jaye N Hicks, Diane Parker, Patricia L Carpenter, Alicia Wager, Carmen Marie Fernandez, Rebecca K Veverka, Robin Shadduck, Elizabeth J Lorence, Maxine L Wallace, Lenora J James, Rozelle M Henderson, Sandra K Hines, Laurie L Morse, Suzan Keplar and Sandra K Mulhall
Case Number: 1:1997cv01441
Filed: March 3, 1997
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Suzanne B Conlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2000. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2000 Filing 149 LETTER from the 7th Circuit returning the record on appeal no. 98-3096, 98-3101, 98-3102 consisting of: Three volumes of pleadings, four loose pleadings, and eleven volumes of exhibits. (fce) Modified on 10/12/2000
September 12, 2000 Filing 148 OPINION from the 7th Circuit: Argued 02/09/99; Decided 07/13/99, (98-3096, 98-3101, 98-3102). (dmkf)
September 12, 2000 Filing 147 CERTIFIED COPY of order dated 07/13/00 from the 7th Circuit: Affirming the decisions of the District Court [131-1], [129-1], [126-1] (98-3096, 98-3101 and 98-3102). (dmkf)
September 12, 2000 Filing 146 LETTER from the 7th Circuit: Retaining record on appeal no. 98-3096, 98-3101, 98-3102 consisting of: Three volumes of pleadings, five volumes of loose pleadings and eleven volumes of exhibits. (dmkf)
September 1, 2000 Filing 145 CERTIFIED copy of Order dated 8/31/00 from the 7th Circuit. ( 98-3096, 98-3101 & 98-3102); On consideration of the petition for rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc filed by counsel for the plaintiffs-appellees/defendants-appellees on 7/27/00, all members of the original panel have voted to deny the petition for rehearing. No judge in regular service requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc. Accordingly, the petition for rehearing is hereby denied. (yap)
December 22, 1998 Filing 144 COPY OF JOINT 12N STATEMENT by Class and Communications Workers of America ("CWA") in response to plaintiffs' 12M statement of material facts as to which there is no genuine issue [113-1] (1 vol.) (ar)
December 22, 1998 Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER of 12/22/98 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Defendants' motion to certify attached copy of document R. 113, defendant's joint 12N statment, as a duplication original and to supplement record is granted [141-1] [141-2]. Mailed notice (ar)
December 22, 1998 Filing 142 STIPULATION that attached document R. 113, defendant's joint 12N statement, may be substituted in Applegate record as a duplication original [141-1] [141-2] (ar)
December 22, 1998 Filing 141 MOTION by defendants to certify attached copy of document R. 113, defendant's joint 12N statment, as a duplication original and to supplement record (ar)
September 2, 1998 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal no. 98-3096,98-3101,98-3102 consisting of three volumes of pleadings with eleven volumes of exhibits and five loose pleadings sent up under separate certificate. Mailed to all counsel. (pmp)
August 31, 1998 Filing 140 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Michael B Erp. (vmj)
August 28, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER from the 7th Circuit (98-3096, 98-3102 and 98-3101) dated 8/27/98 consolidating the appeals. (vmj)
August 24, 1998 Filing 137 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by plaintiff. (vmj)
August 24, 1998 Filing 136 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal USCA 98-3102. (vmj)
August 24, 1998 Filing 135 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal USCA 98-3101. (vmj)
August 24, 1998 Filing 134 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal USCA 98-3096. (vmj)
August 19, 1998 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE of interest by Commc Worker Amer. (vmj)
August 19, 1998 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on appeal . Mailed notice to all counsel. (las)
August 18, 1998 Filing 132 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Annette Foster-Hall et al., regarding appeal [131-1] . (las)
August 18, 1998 Filing 131 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Annette Foster-Hall et al., from judgment entered [125-1], from Scheduling order terminating case [124-1], from motion minute order [124-2], from order [123-1] ( $105.00 Paid) (las)
August 18, 1998 Filing 130 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Bernadette Bernabei regarding appeal [129-1] . (las)
August 18, 1998 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Bernadette Bernabei from Scheduling order terminating case [124-1], from motion minute order [124-2], from order [123-1] ( 105.00 Paid) (las)
August 18, 1998 Filing 128 JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT by defendant Communications Workers of America,AFL-Cio regarding appeal [126-1] . (las) Modified on 08/19/1998
August 18, 1998 Filing 127 DOCKETING STATEMENT by defendant Communications Workers of America,AFL-CIO regarding appeal [126-1] . (las)
August 18, 1998 Filing 126 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Communications Workers of America,AFL-CIO from judgment entered [125-1], from Scheduling order terminating case [124-1], from motion minute order [124-2], from order [123-1];Notice of Filing ( Paid) (las)
July 20, 1998 Filing 125 ENTERED JUDGMENT. (vmj)
July 20, 1998 Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER of 7/20/98 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: Defendants' motions for summary judgment [92-1] and [95-1] are denied. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted [105-1]. In 97 C 1441, judgment is entered in favor of plaintiffs Ameritech Benefit Plan Committee, et al. and against defendants Annette Foster-Hall, et al. In 97 C 2209, judgment is entered in favor of defendants Ameritech Corporation, et al. and against plaintiff Bernadette Bernabei. Enter memorandum opinion and order. terminating case Mailed notice (vmj)
July 20, 1998 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER. (vmj)
March 11, 1998 Filing 122 ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS, Volume 2 by plaintiffs'. (vmj)
March 11, 1998 Filing 121 RESPONSE by plaintiffs' to defendants' joint 12N statement. (vmj)
March 11, 1998 Filing 120 REPLY memorandum by plaintiff in further support of their motion for summary judgment [105-1]; Notice of filing. (vmj)
March 4, 1998 Filing 119 EXHIBITS by Joint class and Commc Worker Amer's memorandum of law in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. (vmj)
March 4, 1998 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM of law by Joint Class and Commc Worker Amer in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [105-1]. (vmj)
March 4, 1998 Filing 117 ADOPTION by Bernadette Bernabei of the arguments set forth in the joint class and CWA memorandum of law in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. (vmj)
March 4, 1998 Filing 116 ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS by plaintiffs'. (vmj)
March 4, 1998 Filing 115 RESPONSE by plaintiffs' to defendants' joint statement of material facts. (vmj)
March 4, 1998 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE by plaintiffs' to defendants' motions for summary judgment [95-1], [92-1]; Notice of filing. (vmj)
March 4, 1998 Filing 113 JOINT 12N statement in response to plaintiffs' 12M statement of material facts as to which there is no genuine issue by defendants'. (vmj)
February 24, 1998 Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER of 2/24/98 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: Defendants' motion for leave to file memoranda in excess of 15 pages is granted [111-1]. Defendants' single response shall not exceed 40 pages. Motion for extension of time to file reply brief is denied. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a memorandum in excess of 15 pages is granted [110-1]. Plaintiffs' single response shall not exceed 40 pages. Mailed notice (vmj)
February 19, 1998 Filing 111 MOTION by defendants' for leave to file memoranda in excess of 15 pages and to reset date for filing reply briefs ; Notice of motion. (vmj)
February 18, 1998 Filing 110 MOTION by plaintiffs' for leave to file a memorandum in excess of 15 pages in response to the cross motions for summary judgment ; Notice of motion. (vmj)
February 13, 1998 Filing 107 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiffs by Mary Ellen Signorille and L. Steve Platt (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER of 2/12/98 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Motion of American Association of Retired Persons for leave to file memorandum amicus curiae in support of defendant Foster-Hall's motion for summary judgment is granted. [108-1] Mailed notice (hp)
February 12, 1998 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of motion for summary judgment [105-1] (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 105 MOTION by plaintiffs for summary judgment (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (fce) Modified on 02/19/1998
February 12, 1998 Filing 104 JOINT EXHIBITS (3 vols: 104-1 through 104-3) (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 103 EXHIBITS by plaintiffs (3 vols: 103-1 through 103-3) (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 102 12M Statement of material facts as to which there is no genuine issue by plaintiffs (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 101 ADOPTION by Bernadette Bernabei of the arguments set forth in the class memorandum of law (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 100 MOTION of American Association of Retired Persons for leave to file memorandum Amicus Curiae in support of defendant Foster-Hall's motion for summary judgment ; Notice of motion. (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 99 AGREED JOINT STIPULATION of facts; Notice of filing (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 98 JOINT Statement of material facts as to which there is no genuine issue by defendant class and CWA (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 97 EXHIBITS by defendant class Annette Foster-Hall memorandum of law in support of its motion for summary judgment as to liability (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM by defendant class Annette Foster-Hall in support of their motion for summary judgment as to liability [95-1] (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 95 MOTION by defendant class Annette Foster-Hall for summary judgment as to liability (fce) Modified on 02/13/1998
February 12, 1998 Filing 94 EXHIBITS by defendant counter-claimant Commc Worker Amer in support of motino for summary judgment as to liability (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM of law by defendant counter-claimant Commc Worker Amer in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability [92-1] (fce)
February 12, 1998 Filing 92 MOTION by defendant counter-claimant Commc Worker Amer for summary judgment as to liability (fce)
February 11, 1998 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM Amicus Curiae of the American Association Retired Persons in support of defendant Fosterr-Hall's motion for summary judgment. (vmj)
February 9, 1998 Filing 108 MOTION by American Association of Retired Persons for leave to file memorandum amicus curiae in support of defendant Foster-Hall's motion for summary judgment (Attachment); Notice of motion (hp)
February 9, 1998 Filing 90 APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Mary Ellen Signorille for AARP; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon. (vmj)
February 9, 1998 Filing 88 AMENDED consolidated answer to aswwer their amended affirmative deenses by Ameritech; Notice of filing. (vmj)
February 3, 1998 Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER of 2/3/98 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: Agreed joint motion to amend the pleadings is granted [87-1]. All previously set dates stand. Mailed notice (vmj)
January 29, 1998 Filing 87 AGREED JOINT MOTION to amend the pleadings (Attachments); Notice of motion. (vmj)
January 22, 1998 Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER of 1/22/98 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: The agreed joint motion for leave to file a memorandum in excess of fifteen pages is granted [84-1]. The briefs are not to exceed 40 pages. Mailed notice (vmj)
January 22, 1998 Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER of 1/22/98 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: The unopposed motion to reset date for filing cross-summary judgment motion is granted [83-1]. The court notes that this is the third final extension. Absolutely no further extensions will be permitted. Cross-summary judgment motions with supporting memoranda to be filed by 2/12/98. Cross-responses to be filed by 3/4/98. Cross replies to be filed by 3/11/98. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (vmj)
January 16, 1998 Filing 84 AGREED JOINT MOTION for leave to file a memorandum in excess of fifteen pages in support of their cross motions for summary judgment (Attachments); Notice of motion. (vmj)
January 16, 1998 Filing 83 UNOPPOSED MOTION by defendants to reset date for filing cross-summary judgment motions ; Notice of motion. (vmj)
November 25, 1997 Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER of 11/25/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Unopposed motion of class to extend discovery [81-1] and to reset date for filing cross summary judgment motion is granted. [81-2] Discovery cut-off reset to 01/05/98. Filing of dispositive motions with supporting memoranda reset to 01/29/98. Cross responses to be filed by 01/20/98. Cross replies to be filed by 02/27/98. Ruling by mail. Second final extension. Mailed notice (hp)
November 20, 1997 Filing 81 UNOPPOSED MOTION by class defendants for thirty day extension of discovery and to file cross motions for summary judgment ; Notice of motion. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (hp)
October 16, 1997 Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER of 10/16/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Joint motion to continue date for submission of cross motions for summary judgment [79-1], and to set date for status hearing is granted [79-2]. Discovery cut-off set for 12/01/97. Cross motion for summary judgment with supporting memoranda to be filed by 12/29/97. Cross-responses to be filed by 01/20/97. Cross-replies, if any, by 01/27/98. Ruling by mail. Final extension. Mailed notice (dmkf)
October 10, 1997 Filing 79 JOINT AGREED MOTION by plaintiffs to continue date for submission of cross motions for summary judgment , and to set date for status hearing (Exhibits); Notice of motion. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
September 25, 1997 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER of 9/25/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: Agreed motion to enter parties' stipulated protective order is granted. Enter stipulated protective order. Mailed notice (dmkf)
September 25, 1997 Filing 76 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE and ORDER (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
September 15, 1997 Filing 78 AGREED MOTION by plaintiffs to enter parties' stipulated protective order ; Notice of motion. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
August 28, 1997 Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER of 8/28/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: Agreed joint motion to dismiss count three of class defendants' counterclaim is granted [74-1]. Order count three of class defendants' counterclaim dismissed without prejudice. Agreed joint motion for class certification [32-1] previously filed on 06/30/97 is granted. Mailed notice (dmkf)
August 25, 1997 Filing 74 AGREED JOINT MOTION by plaintiffs defendants to dismiss count three of class defendants' counterclaim ; Notice of motion ; Notice of motion. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 9, 1997 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER of 7/9/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Filed agreed joint motion to continue the date for filing of cross-motions for summary judgment to 10/29/97 is granted [35-1]. Cross-motions responses to be filed by 11/19/97. Cross-replies, if any, by 11/26/97. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (dmkf)
July 3, 1997 Filing 35 AGREED JOINT MOTION by plaintiffs to continue for 90 days the date for filing of cross-motions for summary judgment (Attachments); Notice of motion. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 73 WAIVER of service of summons as to unknown Douglas M Morehart sent on 3/20/97; Notice of filing. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf) Modified on 07/28/1997
July 2, 1997 Filing 72 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Michael B Erp sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 71 COPY OF WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Sara Sue Adkins sent on 4/1/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 70 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Debby K Flynn sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 69 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Anne Marie Allen sent on 4/12/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 68 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Carol Amato sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 67 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Debra J Anderson sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 66 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Vicki Andrews sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 65 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Janet Appleton sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 64 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 63 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Sandra Ballard sent on 3/28/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 62 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Phyllis Barnes sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 61 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Diana Beattie sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 60 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Christine Berger sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 59 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Betty Bober sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 58 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Shirley Connell sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 57 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Linda Croddy sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 56 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Evelyn Dallos sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 55 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Patricia Elick sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 54 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Lesle Gardner sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 53 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Brenda Gibson sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 52 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Leanne Grover sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 51 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Annette Foster-Hall sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 50 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Dolores Harmacinski sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 49 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Wilbur Haynes sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 48 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Ruth Johnson sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 47 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Virginia Jones sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 46 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Helen Kloess sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 45 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Kathryn Kreger sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 44 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant H Carleen Leach sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 43 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Polly Niemeier sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 42 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Sharon Parrish sent on 3/20/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 41 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Margaret Perrill sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 40 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Diane Richard sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 39 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Brenda Smitherman-Muir sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 38 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Frances Timmerman sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
July 2, 1997 Filing 37 WAIVER of service of summons as to defendant Francie Wingo sent on 3/11/97 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
June 30, 1997 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of agreed joint motion for class certification [32-1] (Attachment); Notice of filing. (dmkf)
June 30, 1997 Filing 32 AGREED JOINT MOTION by plaintiff for class certification (dmkf)
June 27, 1997 Filing 34 CONSOLIDATED ANSWER TO ALL COUNTERCLAIMS and defendants' (Ameritech Corporation, et al. answer to the complaint of Bernadette Bernabei [23-2], [19-2], [12-2] by plaintiffs/counter-defendants; Notice of filing. (dmkf)
June 11, 1997 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER of 6/11/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon: Agreed motion of individual defendants to intervene [24-1] is withdrawn. Agreed amended motion to intervene certain class members [30-1] is granted. Mailed notice (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf)
June 11, 1997 Filing 30 AGREED AMENDED MOTION by defendant to intervene certain class members (Attachment). (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (dmkf) Modified on 06/17/1997
June 5, 1997 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER of 6/5/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Agreed motion of individual defendants to file consolidated answer and counterclaim instanter is granted [28-1]. Telephoned notice (fce)
June 5, 1997 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER of 6/5/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Filed agreed motion of individual defendants to intervene [24-1]. The agreed motion is continued to 06/11/97 at 9:00 a.m. Telephoned notice (dmkf)
June 5, 1997 Filing 23 ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIM by defendants Annette Foster-Hall, Brenda Gibson, Helen Kloess, H Carleen Leach, Sharon Parrish, Frances Timmerman, Phyllis Barnes, Betty Bober, Janet Champer, Linda Croddy, Patricia Elick, Lesle Gardner, Dolores Harmacinski, Polly Niemeier, Debby Flynn Adomaitis, Anne Marie Allen, Carol Amato, Vicki Andrews, Evelyn Dallos, Leanne Grover, Ruth Johnson, Virginia Jones, Francie Wingo, Sara Sue Adkins, Debra J Anderson, Janet Appleton, Sandra Ballard, Kathryn Kreger, Margaret Perrill, Diane Richard, Brenda Smitherman-Muir, Mary Jo Avery, Diana Beattie, Christine Berger, Shirley Connell, Commc Worker Amer, Local 165 IBEW, Local 188 IBEW, Local 336 IBEW, Local 383 IBEW, Local 399 IBEW against plaintiffs (dmkf)
June 4, 1997 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER of 6/4/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Ameritech Benefit Plan's motion to file consolidated answer to all counterclaims and Bernabei complaint on or before 6/27/97 is granted [26-1]. Telephoned and mailed notice (fce)
June 2, 1997 Filing 28 AGREED MOTION by defendants to file consolidated answer and counterclaim instanter ; Notice of motion (fce)
June 2, 1997 Filing 24 AGREED MOTION by defendants to intervene certain class members ; Notice of motion. (dmkf)
June 2, 1997 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Annette Foster-Hall, defendants Brenda Gibson, Helen Kloess, Carleen Leach, Sharon Parrish, Frances Timmerman, Phyllis Barnes, Betty Bober, Linda Croddy, Patricia Elick, Lesle Gardner, Dolores Harmacinski, Polly Niemeier, Carol Amato, Vicki Andrews, Evelyn Dallos, Leanne Grover, Francie Wingo, Sara Sue Adkins, Debra J Anderson, Janet Appleton, Diane Richard, Brenda Smitherman-Muir, Diana Beattie, Christine Berger, Shirley Connell by Michael B. Erp, Douglas M Morehart (Attachment). (dmkf)
May 29, 1997 Filing 26 MOTION by plaintiffs Ameritech Ben Plan, et al., case No. 97 CV 1441 and defendants Ameritech Corp, et al., case No. 97 CV 2209 to file consolidated answer to all counterclaims and Bernabei complaint ; Notice of motion (fce)
May 20, 1997 Filing 19 ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIMS by defendant Communications Workers America, AFL-CIO against plaintiff Ameritech Corporation; Notice of filing. (dmkf)
May 15, 1997 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER of 5/15/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Agreed motion of plaintiffs for reassignment based on relatedness and for consolidation [17-1] is granted. The court finds that Bernabei v. Ameritech, 97 C 2209 is related to 97 C 1441 and requests that the executeve committee transfer 97 C 2209 for consolidation with 97 C 1441. Mailed notice (dmkf)
May 15, 1997 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER of 5/15/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : The agreed motion to reset date for filing of consolidated answer and counter-claims [15-1] is granted. Individual defendants and class to file consolidated answer and counter-claims by 05/30/97. Mailed notice (dmkf)
May 15, 1997 Filing 14 ANSWER to complaint by International Brotherhoodl of Electrical Workers, Local 165 IBEW, Local 188 IBEW, Local 336 IBEW, Local 383 IBEW, Local 399 IBEW (mak)
May 15, 1997 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Local 165 IBEW, Local 188 IBEW, Local 336 IBEW, Local 383 IBEW, Local 399 IBEW by Gilbert A. Cornfield (mak)
May 12, 1997 Filing 17 MOTION by plaintiff for reassignment based on relatedness and for consolidation (Exhibits); Notice of motion. (dmkf)
May 12, 1997 Filing 12 ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Commc Worker Amer against plantiffs; Notice of filing. (mak)
May 9, 1997 Filing 15 AGREED MOTION by defendants and class to reset date for filing of consolidated answer and counter-claims ; Notice of motion. (dmkf)
May 8, 1997 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER of 5/8/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Agreed joint motion to appoint Michael D. Erp as lead counsel and Douglas Morehart as additional counsel for defendant class and approve the agreement of plaintiff Ameritech Corporation to pay reasonable fees and costs of said counsel subject to the terms set forth in the motion [20-1] is granted. Mailed notice (fce)
May 5, 1997 Filing 20 AGREED JOINT MOTION by plaintiffs and defendants Mary Jo Avery, Ruth Johnson, Virginia Jones and Kathryn Kreger to appoint counsel for defendant class ; Notice of motion (fce)
April 24, 1997 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER of 4/24/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Granting agreed motion to withdraw Despres, Schwartz & Geoghegan to withdraw as counsel [9-1] attorney Sarah Vanderwicken for Kathryn Kreger, attorney Thomas Howard Geoghegan for Kathryn Kreger. Mailed notice (mak)
April 24, 1997 Filing 9 AGREED MOTION to withdraw Despres, Schwartz & Geoghegan to withdraw as counsel ; Notice of motion. (mak) Modified on 05/05/1997
April 10, 1997 Filing 7 APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Mary K. O'Melveny for defendant Commc Worker Amer ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon (fce)
April 8, 1997 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER of 4/8/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Status hearing held. Consolidated answer to the complaint to be filed by 05/15/97. Parties to comply with FRCP 26(a)(1) by 06/13/97. Class certification motion with supporting memoranda to be filed by 06/30/97. Cross motions for summary judgment on the issue of liability with supporting memoranda to be filed by 07/31/97. Cross responses to be field by 08/20/97. Cross replies, if any, by 08/27/97. Ruling by mail. Discovery is stayed on the issue of damages pending disposition of summary judgment. Mailed notice (mak)
April 7, 1997 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marisel Ayabarreno Hernandez, Joseph M. Burns for Communications Workers of America (mak)
April 4, 1997 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Ruth Johnson, Virginia Jones, Mary Jo Avery by Michael B. Erp (mak)
April 3, 1997 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Kathryn Kreger by Douglas M. Morehart, Thomas Howard Geoghegan, Sarah Vanderwicken (mak)
April 3, 1997 Filing 5 APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Douglas M. Morehart; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon (mak) Modified on 04/18/1997
March 17, 1997 SCHEDULE set on 3/17/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Status hearing set for 3/26/97 is reset to 9:00 a.m. 4/8/97 . Mailed notice (smm)
March 11, 1997 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER of 3/11/97 by Hon. Suzanne B. Conlon : Status hearing set to 9:00 a.m. 3/26/97 . At the status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: 1. Possiblity of settlement in the case; 2. If no possiblity of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the court's action herein and to forward a copy of the court's procedure guildeline to defendant(s). Mailed notice (mak)
March 3, 1997 Text not available.
March 3, 1997 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of Shannon Michelle Moritz, Eric S. Dreiband, Jeri Anne Lindahl-Garcia, James D. Holzhauer as attorney(s) for plaintiffs ( no summons(es) issued.) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (fce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameritech Ben Plan, et al v. Foster-Hall, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marsha D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Loyce J Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brenda Gildersleeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Judy Spires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Deborah Chapman Sharif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joan C Forcier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gloria McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shirley Rebecca Shirley Rebecca Erickson Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Yvonne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Louise M Hafey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Anne K Kershner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Phyllis Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karen K Cousino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cheryl M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jacqueline McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carolyn Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Elrena Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Erma Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara J Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nancy MacArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Donna L Stepnoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lillian L Fritze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara K Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Beatrice Custer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shirley A Mervosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Teresa Halter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joanne Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pearl Dinwieddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sue E Seevers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Donna Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nancy J Bellotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gloria J Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Chirstina Jane Dalie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Irene Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Susan I Dattilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karen G Belden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dianne Marie Rieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia L McGarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karen Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sharon L Tynan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janice F Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Clara K Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joyce A Delgadillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margaret Kilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Debra L Gramza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Susan Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mildred Hardnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cecilia M Gnadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carmen Banaszynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cynthia M Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mirta Iris Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia Archambeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Elizabeth Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sally A Kates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Yvonia Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dianna L Bosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nancy J Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mariah Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda F Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diane Y Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janice B Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Geraldine R King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marsha Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nancy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rinda R Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Judith Anter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margaret E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sandra L Johrendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jacqueline A Fergerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diane Sieloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Clara G Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Deborah L Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sharon D Gonder-Harris-Fluker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara E Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sharon L Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Peggy A Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mayme Isom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rose Devitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: C Lynne Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Blanca E Lamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ruth E Etter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shirley Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara L Kolby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Georgia A LaPlante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda M Goan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janet Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary L Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia A Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gertrude Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diane DeMaagd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Helen A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Susan Hamman-Wichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Paticia A McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Donna M Goetsch-Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Celia D Simuel-Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jane K Herncjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Willa Prewitt-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margaret A Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Vicki A Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Deneen Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christine M Leasure-McCarrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alexandra J Holloman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sandra Ming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joan Jones-Buckles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Arlis Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nicola Remson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pamela A Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shirley Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sally Bunyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sharon L Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Roberta Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Betty L Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Connie Holdaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Violet Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: M Brown-Royston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Bonnie Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diana L Storts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Genevieve Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diane M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janice Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda Bilbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Agnes Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janet R Longcore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Vera Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary Jane Flier-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ernestine H Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Beverly A Lemmens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rosemary A Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rebecca Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maria B Goujon-Borton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margaret M Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pamela A Steger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shirley Anne Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: JoAnne Rokosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nathalia Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Bonnie K Krachie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diana S Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dorothy J Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jane M Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Olivia Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia A Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Judith L Robinson-Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Charol L Shiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Beverly A Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda L Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christine M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Donna E Roof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karen J Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brenda F Dishner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maria R Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diane L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ella M Lindee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Krystyna Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Vicki Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Glenna M Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Judith L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carolyn L Hatwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alma J Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rosalind F Toyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kathleen A Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karen Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carol Ann Dmytryka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kathy Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christine L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia E Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda Lou Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia A Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Charlotte Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sue Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Johanne M Lowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nancy A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lynn McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Catherine Ellingboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Fredia Pekarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: RaenAnne Bodbyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marjorie F Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Paula P Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pamela M Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Myra Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gloria J Lotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dian Steeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia E Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jacqueline Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Deborah Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Darlene Kathryn Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ruth A Evanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michelle D Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nancy K Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marie A Koldash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nini Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Vicky L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nancy Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sheron Gogoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia Pickett-Mickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patrice Rigden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia L Luhrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Renetta Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lana R Mans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Catherine A Hovanic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lenice Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Andrea T Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margaret Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margaret J Ruminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pamela E Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Daria S Good-Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carla J Grubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Clare A Harner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Josephine Addis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Debra K Dziad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda I Birkey-Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda Susan Tackla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Wanda Pulfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shirley A Jamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marjorie A Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara J Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Suzan A Schober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Beverly D Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carol Pizzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Judith E Valko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marsha A Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sally Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda Vistein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carol S DeMarcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janice A Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Leslie Springman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dorothy A Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pamela E Jones-Jochum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Willie Jean Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karen J Humble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janetta Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rhonda Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda K Gesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia A Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maxine K Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Peggy S Sams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ann M Kammerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janet K Binger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Herta G Maichl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Zrothea L Donnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marlene George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sandra L Endres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Betty J Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maxine L Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda J Michalowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Theresa M Szilagyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jacqueline F Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kathryn A Begley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda L Boshu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Randi Sue Stewart-Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara A Dale Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margariette Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Judith K Hepner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diana Kay Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Betty J Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Denise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Deanna L Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: De'Ann Rauwerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Annie B Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lucy Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sherry E Sidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ida Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gloria J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Arletha Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sharon Saults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gayle Kippen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mable L Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Glenda S Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Donna M Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Johnnie M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Charlene D Fluker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Betty J Urquhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Diana MacArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Constance M Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joanne M Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carol Jean Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carol Ann Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ravella A Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Willie Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Doris M Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: M. Dawn Nietubicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Velma Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Donna Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sharon L Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeanette Gawkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ruth E Krupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jane A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Frances Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Catherine A Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Inez M Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Martha Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Julie A Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nellie Roper Brogdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alethea Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia Clinkscales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Delores M Hartung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Constance M Killings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Blanche Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Betty Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Virginia A Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patricia Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lois A Brull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Edith M Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary Asciutto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeanette Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cynthia M Nicolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Barbara K Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dorothy Kazmir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]