George S May Intl, et al v. Xcentric Ventures, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: George S. May International Company
Defendant: Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson, ABC Companies, John Does and Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2004cv06018
Filed: September 15, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 12/12/2006; Before the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED) (td, )
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: The parties have filed a Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii). The Stipulation to Dismiss is entered. The court dismisses this case with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mb, )
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 251 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lazar, Bart)
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Status hearing set for 2/1/07 is stricken. All matters relating to the referral of this case having been resolved, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Judge Michael T. Mason no longer referred to the case. (kef, )
January 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Counsel have advised the court that this matter has settled. All pending deadlines, filing dates, and briefing schedule are stayed until further order of court. The case remains set for a status hearing on Februarly 8, 2007 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Status hearing set for 2/28/07 is stricken and reset to 2/1/07 at 9:00 a.m. Briefing on plaintiffs' motion to compel 241 is stayed pending settlement discussions. (kef, )
January 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.:Motion hearing held on 1/12/2007. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay 239 is due by 1/19/2007. Plaintiff's reply is due by 1/26/2007. Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 222 is extended to and until 2/16/2007. Defendants' reply is due by 3/2/2007.Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Filing by George S. May International Company regarding Exhibit D to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. (mb, )
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SUPPLEMENTAL Response to Plaintiff George S. May Company's Interrogatories to Defendants. (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff George S. May International Company by Daniel Frank Lanciloti (Lanciloti, Daniel)
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Defendants' response to plaintiffs' motion to compel 241 to be filed by 1/22/07, with a courtesy copy delivered directly to CHAMBERS, room 2206. No reply unless ordered by the Court. Ruling by mail. No appearance is required on the noticed motion date of 1/16/07. (kef, )
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of motion to compel 241 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 1/16/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Kindstrand, Rachel)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Errata C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Errata E# 6 Exhibit F)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief 239 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/12/2007 at 10:30 AM. (Kindstrand, Rachel)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to stay regarding memorandum in support of motion 227 Pursuant to Rule 56(f) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : When this Court requests a courtesy copy to be delivered to chambers, room 2206, we mean that a courtesy copy should be hand delivered DIRECTLY TO CHAMBERS, ROOM 2206, not depositied in the drop box in the lobby or on the 20th floor. This has been a continuing problem with defendants' courtesy copies and continuation of such practices may result in those pleadings being stricken. (kef, )
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason :Status hearing set for 2/28/2007 at 09:00 AM. (kef, )
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re Response 235 of Filing (Borcia, James)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 235 RESPONSE by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to Plaintiff's (Second) Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A&B)(Borcia, James)
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 RESPONSE by George S. May International Companyin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for judgment on the Pleadings 192 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
December 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.:Motion for Extension of Time to File Written Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 229 is granted.Telephoned/mailed notice (ewf, )
December 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 222 is due by 1/26/2007. Defendants' reply is due by 2/9/2007.Telephoned/mailed notice (ewf, )
December 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for summary judgment 222 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/29/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
December 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of motion for extension of time to file 229 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/29/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Kindstrand, Rachel)
December 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company for extension of time to file Written Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Kindstrand, Rachel)
December 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC for summary judgment 225 , MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC for summary judgment 224 (Incorrect Events Used) (gma, )
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM by Xcentric Vventures, LLC in support of motion for summary judgment, 225 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Borcia, James)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Defendants' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment STATEMENT by Xcentric Vventures, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Borcia, James)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Separate Statement of Facts by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC in support of Motion for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit)(Borcia, James) (Incorrect Event Used - Docket Text Edited by Clerk's Office) Modified on 12/26/2006 (gma, ).
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Memorandum of law by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC in support of Motion for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Borcia, James) (Incorrect Event Used - Docket Text Edited by Clerk's Office) Modified on 12/26/2006 (gma, ).
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC re notice of filing 221 , MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC for summary judgment 222 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Borcia, James)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Notice of Motion# 3 Certificate of Service)(Borcia, James)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC re other 220 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Borcia, James)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Defendants' Partial Objection to Magistrate Judge's December 14, 2006 Report and Recommendation by Xcentric Vventures, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Borcia, James)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.:Motion f 213 is stricken as a duplicate filing of Motion 215 . Motion for extension of time to complete discovery 217 is granted. Motion to Hold Defendants in Comtempt 215 is referred to Magistrate Judge Mason along with all other pretrial matters. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 217 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/22/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Kindstrand, Rachel)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company for extension of time to complete discovery (Kindstrand, Rachel)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 216 CORRECTED NOTICE of Motion by Bart Allen Lazar for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 215 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/22/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Lazar, Bart)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International CompanyAND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT (Corrected) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Lazar, Bart)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE of Motion by Bart Allen Lazar for presentment of motion for more definite statement, 213 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/22/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Lazar, Bart)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Companyfor more definite statement AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Lazar, Bart)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings 192 is due by 1/5/2007. Defendants' reply is due by 1/19/2007. Telephoned/mailed notice (ewf, )
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 211 RESPONSE by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to notice of filing 208 Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts Regaridng Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Borcia, James)
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Plaintiffs' motion to supplement record related to contempt sanction 129 , defendants' motion to strike plaintiffs' motion to supplement record related to contempt sanction 143 and plaintiffs' motion in limine to exclude certain exhibits and witnesses proffered by defendants 198 are denied as moot. (kef, )
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is hereby submitted to Judge Norgle recommending that the District Court grant in part and deny in part plaintiffs' request for sanctions 88 . Specific written objections to this Report and Recommendation may be served and filed within 10 business days from the date that this order is served. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a). Failure to file objections with the District Court within the specified time will result in a waiver of the rights to appeal all findings, factual and legal, made by this Court in the report and recommendation. Lorentzen v. Anderson Pest Control, 64 F.3d 327, 330 (7th Cir. 1995). See attached order. (kef, )
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re reply 206 , Response, 207 of Filing (Borcia, James)
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to Rule 56 statement, 194 Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts Regarding Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Borcia, James)
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 206 REPLY by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to motion for partial summary judgment 175 in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Borcia, James)
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : As stated in the attached order, defendants' motion to compel 183 is granted in part and denied in part. (kef, )
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Evidentiary hearing held on 12/12/2006. The matter is taken under advisement and a Report and Recommendation will be issued shortly. (kef, )
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Plaintiffs' motion in limine 198 is taken under advisement. The Court will rule on objections to evidence and witnesses during the hearing. (kef, )
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re Response 201 of Filing (Borcia, James)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 201 RESPONSE by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to motion in limine 198 to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Borcia, James)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Defendants are to file a response to plaintiff's motion in limine 198 and deliver a courtesy copy to chambers by 5:00 PM on 12/6/06. On previous occasions, defendants have failed to deliver courtesy copies of their pleadings in a timely manner. Therefore, defendants are warned that if they fail to deliver a courtesy copy of their response brief to chambers, Room 2206, by 5:00 PM on 12/6/06, the brief may be stricken. (kef, )
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE of Motion by Bart Allen Lazar for presentment of motion in limine 198 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 12/12/2006 at 09:30 AM. (Lazar, Bart)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company in limine to Exclude Certain Exhibits and Witnesses Proffered by Defendants (Lazar, Bart)
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re reply to response to motion 196 of Filing (Borcia, James)
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 196 REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel re: First Set of Discovery Requests (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Borcia, James)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RESPONSE by George S. May International Company in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson for partial summary judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law 175 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Memorandum Opinions))(Kindstrand, Rachel)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 194 RULE 56 Response to Defendants' Statement and GSMIC's Statement of Additional Facts Pursuant to Rule 56.1(b) Statement by George S. May International Company regarding motion for partial summary judgment 175 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Israel Kushnir# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for judgment 192 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/15/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for judgment on the Pleadings (Borcia, James)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Defendants' reply in support of their motion to compel 183 , limited to 5 pages or less, to be filed by 12/1/06, with a courtesy copy to chambers, room 2206. (kef, )
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 190 RESPONSE In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Re: First Set of Discovery Requests (Lazar, Bart)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Plaintiffs' oral request for an extension to 11/20/06 in which to file its response to defendants' motion to compel 183 is granted. (kef, )
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED DOCUMENT. Exhibit A-C to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Monetary Sanctions Regarding Plaintiff's Failure to Admit by Excentric Ventures, LLC and Ed Magedson.(RESTRICTED) (mb, )
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re reply to response to motion 186 (Borcia, James)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPLY To Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Monetary Sanctions Regarding Plaintiff's Failure to Admit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Borcia, James)
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Plaintiffs' response, 10 pages or less, to defendants' motion to compel 183 to be filed by 11/17/06, with a courtesy copy to chambers, room 2206. No reply unless ordered by the Court. No appearance is required on the noticed motion date of 11/28/06. (kef, )
November 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to compel 183 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 11/28/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Borcia, James)
November 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to compel re: First Set of Discovery Requests (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Borcia, James)
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Motion hearing held on 11/3/2006 regarding motion for partial summary judgment 175 and motion for sanctions 176 . Reply to response to motion for sanctions is due on or before 11/13/2006. Response to motion for partial summary judgment is due by 11/27/2006. Defendant's reply is due by 12/11/2006. Status hearing set for 2/8/2007 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED FAILURE TO ADMIT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Lazar, Bart)
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 180 SEALED DOCUMENT. Exhibit 3 to Defendants' Motion for Monetary Sanctions re: Plaintiff's Failure to Admit (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Amended NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for partial summary judgment 175 , motion for sanctions 176 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/3/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment 175 and motion for sanctions re: plaintiff's failure to admit 176 being outside the scope of the current referral, noticed motion date of 11/2/06 before Judge Mason is stricken. Defendants are advised to file an amended notice of motion for presentment to Judge Norgle. Defendants should not refile the motions themselves as they are still pending. (kef, )
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for partial summary judgment 175 , motion for sanctions 176 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 11/2/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Borcia, James)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson for sanctions re: Plaintiff's Failure to Admit (Borcia, James)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson for partial summary judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Borcia, James)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson re statement 173 of Filing (Borcia, James)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STATEMENT of Uncontested Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Borcia, James)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Motion hearing held on 10/18/06. Defendants' emergency motion to exclude/limit testimony of Ronald Bero or, alternatively, emergency motion to continue 10/19/06 hearing 168 is granted in part and denied in part as stated in open court. Evidentiary hearing set for 10/19/06 is stricken and reset to 12/12/06 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs are to provide a customer list and related information as discussed in open court to the Court and defendants by 10/22/06. Plaintiffs' revised expert report, exhibit list and witness list due 11/8/06. Defendants revised exhibit list and witness list due 11/22/06. Plaintiffs rebuttal, if any, by 12/1/06. (kef, )
October 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RESPONSE by George S. May International Company to MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson to continue EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXCLUDE/LIMIT TESTIMONY OF RONALD BERO OR, ALTERNATIVELY, EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE OCTOBER 19, 2006 HEARING 168 on Contempt Damages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lazar, Bart)
October 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 170 RESPONSE to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Ron Bero and Continue the Hearing on Contempt Damages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lazar, Bart)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to continue, 168 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 10/18/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Borcia, James)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson to continue EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXCLUDE/LIMIT TESTIMONY OF RONALD BERO OR, ALTERNATIVELY, EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE OCTOBER 19, 2006 HEARING (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Borcia, James)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : As stated in the attached order, defendants' motion to permit telephonic appearances by witnesses at the 10/19/06 hearing 163 is denied. (kef, )
October 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE by George S. May International Company in Opposition to Defendants'to Permit Telephonic Appearances by Witnesses at 10/19/06 Hearing MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for leave to appear as by Witnesses 163 (Attachments: # 1)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Plaintiff to file a response to defendants' motion to permit telephonic appearances by witnesses at the 10/19/06 hearing 163 by 10/4/06. Plaintiff must deliver a courtesy copy of the response, limited to 5 pages or less, to chambers, Room 2206, by 5:00 PM on 10/4/06. No appearance necessary on the noticed motion date of 10/3/06. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (tlp)
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for leave to appear, 163 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 10/3/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Borcia, James)
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Defendants'to Permit Telephonic Appearances by Witnesses at 10/19/06 Hearing MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for leave to appear as by Witnesses Defendants'to Permit Telephonic Appearances by Witnesses at 10/19/06 Hearing (Borcia, James)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Agreed motion for extension of fact discovery 157 is granted. Mailed notice (tlp, )
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Status and motion hearing held on 9/20/06. Agreed motion for extension of fact discovery is granted. Fact discovery closes on 1/11/07. Parties are to disclose experts and exchange expert reports by 2/12/07. Expert discovery closes on 3/14/07. Evidentiary hearing on contempt sanctions set for 10/19/06 at 9:30 AM. Parties are to provide the Court will all exhibits and a joint witness list by 10/12/06. The parties are reminded that the hearing is limited to the following issues: (1) the damages plaintiff suffered as a result of the postings that Judge Norgle found violated the TRO in his September 13, 2005 Order and (2) what other sanctions, if any, are appropriate for defendants' violation of the TRO. The Court will not permit the parties to raise issues that have already been ruled on, such as, whether the contempt finding was appropriate. Nor will the parties be permitted to raise issues outside the scope of the referral, such as, new violations of the TRO. Mailed notice (tlp, )
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/19/2006 at 9:30 AM. (tlp, )
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of motion for extension of time 157 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 9/20/2006 at 09:30 AM. (Kindstrand, Rachel)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company for extension of time to complete discovery (Agreed) (Attachments: # 1)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 160 AGREED PROTECTIVE Order Signed by Judge Michael T. Mason on 9/14/2006.(mb, )
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Enter agreed protective order. Mailed notice (mb, )
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Status hearing on plaintiff's motion for contempt sanctions 88 set for 9/20/06 at 9:30 AM in courtroom 2214. The Court will set an evidentiary hearing on plaintiff's motion at the upcoming status. The parties must be prepared to discuss available dates for the hearing and any witnesses they intend to call. Mailed notice (tlp, )
August 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Motion to quash 151 is withdrawn by agreement of the parties. Mailed notice (tlp, )
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE by Rachel M Kindstrand of Change of Address (Kindstrand, Rachel)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendants' Motion for Relief from Order Denying Defendants' motion to dismiss 82 was and is granted. See Notification of Docket Entry 89 . (mb, )
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to quash 151 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 8/15/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Borcia, James)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to quash Subpoena to creative Business Investment Concepts, Inc. (Borcia, James)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Motion hearing held. 146 MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC to quash Motion to Quash Subpoena 146 is granted. Leave is granted to renew the subpoena once the protective order has been entered. Mailed notice. (tlp, )
August 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE by Bart Allen Lazar of Change of Address (Lazar, Bart)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 147 RE- NOTICE of Motion by David O Yuen for presentment of motion to quash 146 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 8/9/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Yuen, David)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC to quash Motion to Quash Subpoena (Yuen, David)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Defendants' motion to strike plaintiff's motion to "supplement" record related to contempt sanctions 143 is taken under advisement. The parties are not to file any further motions, briefs or any other pleadings associated with plaintiff's motion for contempt sanctions unless directed to do so by the Court. No appearance is necessary on the noticed motion date of 08/09/06. Mailed notice (jlj, )
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Corrected Amended NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief,, 143 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 8/9/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Borcia, James)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to strike MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to supplement Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Supplement Record Related to Contempt Sanction 129 (Borcia, James)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Amended NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to supplement 129 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 8/15/2006 at 09:00 AM is hereby stricken, due to be entered in error. Counsel will submit the corrected notice of motion. Mailed/Telephoned notice (jlj, )
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Amended NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to supplement 129 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 8/15/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Borcia, James)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to quash 139 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/28/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to quash Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Borcia, James)
July 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendants' Motion for clarification on Magistrate Judge Referral 132 is granted. Mailed notice (mb, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's Motion to "Supplement" Record Related to Contempt Sanctions 135 was misdirected, and must be refiled before Magistrate Judge Mason. This motion 135 is stricken from the court's docket. Mailed notice (mb, )
July 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE to Motion to Strike Supplemental Filing Related to Contempt Sanction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Lazar, Bart)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to strike 135 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/28/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to strike Plaintiff's Motion to "Supplement" Record Related to Contempt Sanction (Borcia, James)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion by plaintiff to clarify 132 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/28/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to clarify Magistrate Judge Referral (Borcia, James)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Plaintiff's motion to supplement record related to contempt sanctions 129 is taken under advisement. No appearance necessary on the noticed motion date of July 19, 2006. Mailed notice (mb, )
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 131 DECLARATION of Israel Kushnir regarding motion to supplement 129 by George S. May International Company In Support of Contempt Sanction (Lazar, Bart)
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Motion by Bart Allen Lazar for presentment of motion to supplement 129 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 7/19/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Lazar, Bart)
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to supplement Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Supplement Record Related to Contempt Sanction (Lazar, Bart)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Status hearing set for 6/27/06 is stricken. Parties are to provide courtesy copies of all pleadings related to plaintiffs' motion for contempt sanctions to chambers, room 2206, by 6/28/06. (kef, )
June 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report to Magistrate Mason by George S. May International Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
June 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : This matter having been referred to Magistrate Judge Mason, an initial status hearing is set for 6/27/06 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 2214. The parties shall deliver courtesy copy of an initial status report providing the information required by this Court's Order Setting Initial Status Report to chambers, room 2206, by 6/22/06. Mailed notice (smm, )
May 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 126 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Mason to conduct necessary proceedings and enter Order/Report and Recommendation on all nondispositive pretrial motions through filing of pretrial materials including final pretrial order, with the exceptions or additions of plaintiff's motion for contempt sanctions 88 . Signed by Executive Committee on 5/31/06. (mb, )
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 124 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/24/2006.(mjc, )
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Enter agreed order. Mailed notice (mjc, )
May 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendants' Motion for reconsideration 85 is denied as moot. Defenedants' Amended Motion for Reconsideration 90 is denied for the reasons explained below. Mailed notice (mb, )
May 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Status hearing held on 5/18/2006. Counsel to file an agreed discovery schedule or plan. Ruling on fully briefed motions will be mailed. Status hearing continued to 9/20/2006 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Status hearing set for 5/18/2006 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ewf, )
February 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to answer to complaint 116 to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses(Verified Response) (Attachments: # 1)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
February 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Correction regarding answer to complaint 115 (ntf, )
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson (Borcia, James)
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson(Borcia, James)
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DUPLICATE filing- ANSWER (Borcia, James) (ntf, ).
January 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson re response in opposition to motion 113 (Borcia, James)
January 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE Defendants' Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt Sanctions (Borcia, James)
January 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Correction regarding document 110 . The following error was found in document no. 110. The incorrect document (PDF file) was linked to the entry. Corrective action taken by the Clerk. The correct document (PDF file) has been linked to the entry. (rmm, )
January 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Plaintiff's Motion to enforce and for sanctions 60 is denied. Mailed notice (rmm, )
January 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION and Order Signed by Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/18/2006:Mailed notice(rmm, )
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Xcentric Ventures's Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Ed Magedson's Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 59 are denied. Mailed notice (rmm, ) Modified on 1/24/2006 (rmm, ).
December 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendants' Motion for All Oral Argument on Pending Motions 106 is denied. However, Defendants are granted leave to supplement any previous submission by 3 additional pages. Any such supplements shall be filed on or before January 27,2006. Mailed notice (rmm, ) Modified on 12/30/2005 (rmm, ).
December 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for hearing, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 106 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/20/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
December 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for hearing re MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC to dismiss 82 , notice of motion 37 , MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to enforce 60 , MOTION by Defendant Ed Magedson to dismiss 59 , MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for reconsideration 85 90 , MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for reconsideration 85 for All Oral Argument on Pending Motions (Borcia, James)
December 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson re reply 104 of Filing (Borcia, James)
December 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPLY by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson to Response 103 re: Evidentiary Objections to Kushnir Declaration Supporting Contempt "Remedy" (Borcia, James)
November 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to objections 96 (George S. May's Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to the Kushnir Declaration Supporting Contempt Remedy) (Kindstrand, Rachel)
November 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, Ed Magedson (Borcia, James)
November 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY In Support of Defendants' Amended Motion For Reconsideration (Borcia, James)
November 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REPLY by Plaintiff George S. May International Company Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Contempt Sanction (Lazar, Bart)
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE by George S. May International Company in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for reconsideration 85 90 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC (Borcia, James)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JURY Demand by Xcentric Vventures, LLC (Borcia, James)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Exhibits (Borcia, James)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt Sanctions (Borcia, James)
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Status hearing held on 11/2/2005 No notice (ewf, )
October 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendant's Amended Motion for Reconsideration 90 . Briefing schedule set. See below. Mailed notice (rmm, )
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for reconsideration 85 90 (Borcia, James)
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for reconsideration 85 (Borcia, James)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Motion for relief from order denying defendants' motion to dismiss 83 is granted. Motion for reconsideration of order requiring appearance 86 is granted. Motion hearing held on 10/24/2005. Amended motion to reconsider is due 10/25/2005. Memorandum regarding appropriate sanction is due is due within 14 days. Reply memorandum is due 7 days thereafter. Mailed notice (ewf, )
October 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 92 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Rip-Off Report.com, BadBusinessBureau.com, Ed Magedson, ABC Companies by Maria Crimi Speth; Order entered granting leave by Charles R. Norgle Sr.. Filing fee $50 paid, receipt number 10423765 (rmm, )
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM by George S. May International Company in Support of Contempt Sanction (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Israel Kushnir In Support of Contempt Sanction)(Kindstrand, Rachel)
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for reconsideration 85 , motion for reconsideration 86 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 10/21/2005 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for reconsideration of Order Requiring Appearance or inthe Alternative Request to Appear Telephonically (Borcia, James)
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION by Defendants Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for reconsideration (Borcia, James)
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 83 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 10/21/2005 at 10:30 AM. (Borcia, James)
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC for relief from order denying defendants; motion to dismiss (Borcia, James) Modified on 10/14/2005 (jmp,).
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Vventures, LLC to dismiss (Borcia, James)
September 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendants' motion for leave to file supplement to Defendants' response to George S. May International Company's motion to enforce court's June 9, 2005 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions under FRCP 37(b) 72 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages 74 is granted. Status and motion hearing held on 9/28/2005. Status hearing continued to 11/2/2005 at 09:30 AM. Ed Magedson shall personally appear on 11/2/2005. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY by Defendants in support of motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; Notice.(gcy, )
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Motion by plaintiff for an Order defendants in contempt for violating the temporary restraining order 15 is granted. Mailed notices (gcy, )
September 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY by Plaintiff George S. May International Company in support of its motion to enforce court's June 9, 2005 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for santions under FRCP 37(b); Notice (gcy, )
September 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Defendant Xcentric Venture's Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 36 is denied as moot. Mailed notices (gcy, )
September 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of filing Table of Authorities by George S. May International Company. (gcy, )
September 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Motion by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for presentment of motion for leave to file supplement to defendants' responses to George S. May international company's motion to enforce court's June 9,2005 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions under FRCP 37(b)), 72 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/28/2005 at 09:30 AM. (vcf, )
September 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION by Xcentric Vventures, LLC, Ed Magedson for leave to file (Attachments: # 1 supplement to defendants' response to George S. May international company's motion to enforce court's June 9,2005 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions under FRCP 37(b)(vcf, )
September 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RECEIVED RESPONSE by Plaintiff George S. May International Company in opposition to defendants Ed Magedson and Xcentric Ventures, LLC's motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. (gcy, )
September 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company for leave to file instanter a brief in excess of fifteen (15) pages. (gcy, )
September 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX in support of George S. May International Company's response in opposition to defendants Ed Magedson and Xcentric Ventures, LLC's motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. (gcy, )
August 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AGREED ORDER for an extension of the Briefing Schedule on plaintiff George S. May International Company's motion to enforce court's June 9, 2005 Order plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions under FRCP 37(b). Signed by Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/31/2005:(gcy, )
August 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Enter Agreed Order for extension of the briefing schedule on plaintiff George S. May International Company's motion to enforce court's June 9, 2005 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and for sanctions under FRCP 37(b). Mailed notices (gcy, )
August 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Status hearing held on 8/30/2005. Status hearing continued to 9/28/2005 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE by defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC nd Ed Magedson to George S. May International Company's motion to enforce court's 6/9/05 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions under FRCP 37(b); Notice. (vmj, )
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AGREED ORDER for an extension of the briefing schedule on defendants' motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/24/2005:(gcy, )
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Enter agreed order for an extension of the briefing schedule on defendants' motions to dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until 9/2/05 to file its response. Defendants shall have until 9/16/05 to file any reply. Mailed notices (gcy, )
August 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Briefing schedule set for Edward Magedson's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction: Plaintiff shall file its response on or before August 26, 2005, and defendant shall file their reply on or before September 2, 2005. The parties may wish to address two recent decisions dealing with personal jurisdiction and internet web sites. See Jennings V. AC Hydraulic A/S, 383F.3d 546 (7th Cir. 2004); Bombliss v. Cornelsen. 824 N.E. 2d 1175 (Ill. App. Ct. 2005). Mailed notices (gcy, )
August 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Plaintiffs' motion to enforce 60 is taken under advisement. Response is due by 8/26/2005 Reply is due by 9/2/2005. Status hearing is set for 9/28/2005 at 09:30 AM. No notice, advised in open court (jms, )
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of MOTION by Defendant Ed Magedson to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 59 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/19/2005 at 10:30 AM. (gma, )
August 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to enforce court's June 9, 2005 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions under FRCP 37(b) 60 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/12/2005 at 10:30 AM. (gma, )
August 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to enforce court's June 9, 2005 order granting plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions under FRCP 37(b) (gma, )
August 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION by Defendant Ed Magedson to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; Notice (Exhibits). (gcy, )
July 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ed Magedson by James Kenneth Borcia. (gcy, )
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE by George S. May International Company of filing alias summons and return of service. (gcy, )
July 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ed Magedson. (gcy, )
July 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Plaintiff's motion for substitute service of summons and complaint on defendant Ed Magedson and for extension of time for service of summons and complaint is granted. Mailed notices (gcy, )
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Bart Allen Lazar for presentment of MOTION by Plaintiff for substitute service of summons and complaint on defendant Ed Magedson and for extension of time for service of summons and complaint 53 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/1/2005 at 10:30 AM. (gma, )
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION by Plaintiff for substitute service of summons and complaint on defendant Ed Magedson and for extension of time for service of summons and complaint (gma, )
June 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Motion to quash 31 is denied. Motion to compel 40 is granted. Defendants to comply within 28 days. Motion hearing held on 6/9/2005 regarding motion to compel 40 , motion to quash 31 . Status hearing set for 8/30/2005 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Status hearing held on 5/31/2005 Oral argument on pending discovery motions set for 6/9/2005 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ewf, )
April 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SECOND DECLARATION of Rachel M. Kindstrand in support of plaintif's motion to compel. (gcy, )
April 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY brief by Plaintiff in support of its motion to compel 40 answers to its first set of interrogatories and requests to produce documents and things. (gcy, )
April 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AGREED ORDER for Modified Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 4/8/2005. (gcy, )
April 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for a second extension of time for Service of Summons and Complaint 44 is granted. Defendants shall have until 4/6/05 to file their response to plaintiff's motion to compel 40 and plaintiff to reply by 4/22/05. (Enter Agreed Order for Modified Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Mailed notice (gcy, )
April 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedsonto to Plaintiff George S. May International Company's motion to compel answers to its first set of interrogatories 40 . (gcy, )
April 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company for a second extension of time for service of summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) 44 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 4/8/2005 at 10:30 AM. (gma, )
April 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company for a second extension of time for service of summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) (gma, )
March 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Set deadlines/hearing as to motion to compel 40 : Responses due by 4/1/2005 Replies due by 4/15/2005. Status hearing set for 5/31/2005 at 09:30 AM. The briefing schedule previously set on defendant's motion to dismiss is stricken. (ewf, )
March 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DECLARATION of Rachel M. Kindstrand in Support of plaintiff's motion to compel 40 ; Notice. (lcw, Lakisha)
March 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel M Kindstrand for presentment of MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to compel answers to its first set of interrogatories and requests to produce documents and things 40 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/11/2005 at 10:30 AM. (gma, )
March 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company to compel answers to its first set of interrogatories and requests to produce documents and things (gma, )
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Motion hearing held on 2/18/2005 regarding motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 36 , Set deadlines/hearing as to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 36 : Responses due by 3/18/2005 Replies due by 4/8/2005. (ewf, )
February 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George S. May International Company as to Peter G. Busnack "Big-Foot", answer due 2/8/2005; Notice. (gcy, ) Modified on 1/27/2006 (ym, ).
February 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by James Kenneth Borcia for presentment of motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 36 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/18/2005 at 10:30 AM. (rbf, )
February 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION by Defendant Xcentric Ventures, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; Exhibits. (rbf, ) Modified on 1/17/2006 (ym, ).
February 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Motion hearing held on 2/1/2005 regarding motion to quash 31 , Set deadlines/hearing as to motion to quash 31 : Replies due by 2/4/2005. Status hearing set for 3/22/2005 at 09:30 AM. (Motion presented in open court on 1/28/05.) (ewf, )
January 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ed Magedson. (cem, )
January 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE by George S. May International Company to motion by defendants to quash subpoena 31 . (mjc, )
January 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by defendants for presentment of MOTION to quash 31 supboena before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/28/2005 at 10:30 AM. (lcw, Lakisha)
January 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION by defendants to quash subpoena (lcw, Lakisha)
January 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles R. Norgle Sr.: Motion for extension of time to for service of summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) 28 is granted for a period of ninety days. (gcy, )
January 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 12/3/04 Before Honorable Charles R. Norgle. (gma)
January 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by George S. May International Company for presentment of its MOTION for extension of time for service of summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civl Procedure 4(m) 28 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/14/2005 at 10:30 AM. (ar, )
January 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff George S. May International Company for extension of time for service of summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of civil procedure 4(m). (ar, )
December 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER of 12/20/04 by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr : The court's Order of 9/24/04 granted both May's motion for a temporary restraining order [2-1], and May's order to show cause as to why a preliminary injunction should not be entered [2-2]. The clerk shall correct the docket to reflect this entry. No notice (gcy)
December 14, 2004 Opinion or Order ALIAS SUMMONS issued one original and one copy as to Xcentric Ventures. (gcy)
December 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER of 12/3/04 by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr : Status hearing held and continued to 1/31/05 at 9:30 a.m. Motion for expedited limited discovery [7-1] is granted in part. Responses to expedited discovery are due on or before 1/7/05. Ruling on all other pending fully briefed motions to be mailed. Mailed notice (gcy)
November 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY by George S. May International Comany in support of its motion for an order finding defendants in contempt for violating the termporary restraining order (Attachments); Notice. (gcy)
November 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER of 11/18/04 by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr : (Entered Agreed Order for an Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File its Reply in Support of its Motion for an Order Finding Defendants in Contempt for Violating the Temporary Restraining Order. Telephoned notice (gcy)
November 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE by defendants to motion for an order finding defendants in contempt for violating the temporary restraining order [15-1] (Attachments); Notice. (gcy)
November 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SECOND DECLARATION of Rachel M. Kindstrand (Attachments). (gcy)
November 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM of law by George S May Intl Co in support of its motion for preliminary injunction (Attachments); Notice. (gcy)
October 29, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER of 10/29/04 by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr : Defendants' response to plaintiff's motion for an order finding defendants in contempt for violating the temporary restraining order [15-1] is due on or before 11/12/04. Plaintiff's reply is due on or before 11/19/04. Status hearing date reset to 9:30 a.m. on 12/03/04. Mailed notice (ar)
October 28, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Rachel M. Kindstrand and Ronald L. Lipinski; Notice. (gcy)
October 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by defendants to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction; Notice. (gcy)
October 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED notice of motion by plaintiff regarding its motion for an order finding defendants in contempt for violating the temporary restraining order [15-1] (ar)
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 16 THIRD DECLARATION of Charles Black in support of motion for an order finding defendants in contempt for violating the temporary restraining order (Attachments). (gcy)
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by plaintiff for an order finding defendants in contempt for violating the temporary restraining order (Attachments); Notice. (gcy)
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER of 10/8/04 by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr : Motion for leave to file instanter a brief in excess of fifteen (15) pages is granted [6-1]. Defendant is given 14 days to file a supplemental response. Plaintiff is given 14 days to file its reply. The temporary restrainingorder is extended until further order of court. Status hearing set for 11/5/04 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gcy)
October 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of its motion for a preliminary injunction (Attachments). (gcy)
October 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Charles E. Black in support of motion for preliminary injunction (Attachments). (gcy)
October 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Rachel M. Kindstrand (Attachments). (gcy)
October 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by plaintiff for limited, expedited discovery. (gcy)
October 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file instanter a brief in excess of fifteen (15) pages ; Notice. (gcy)
October 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by defendant of motion for leave to file its response to motion for Temporary restraining order and order to show cause regarding preliminary injunction in excess of fifteen pages. (gcy)
October 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE by defendant to motion for a temporary restraining order and order to show cause regarding preliminary injunction. (gcy)
October 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE by defendants to motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] and order to show cause regarding preliminary injunction [2-2] (Attachments); Notice. (gcy)
October 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Xcentric Ventures and Ed. Magedson by James Kenneth Borcia, David O Yuen; Notice. (gcy) Modified on 10/05/2004
September 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER of 9/24/04 by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr : Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order is granted [2-1]. Status hearing set for 10/8/04 at 9:30 a.m. (Entered Order). Mailed notice (gcy)
September 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION by plaintiff for temporary restraining order and order to show cause as to why a preliminary injunction should not be entered (proposed) (Attachments); Notice (gcy)
September 16, 2004 Opinion or Order SUMMONS issued as to defendant Xcentric Ventures. (jmp)
September 16, 2004 Opinion or Order ALIAS SUMMONS issued one original and one copy as to defendant Xcentric Ventures. (jmp)
September 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Attachments) - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of Rachel Kindstrand, Bart Allen Lazar as attorney(s) for plaintiff (No summons(es) issued.) (Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (lw)
September 15, 2004 Opinion or Order RECEIPT regarding payment of filing fee paid; on 9/15/04 in the amount of $150.00, receipt #10631730. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George S May Intl, et al v. Xcentric Ventures, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George S. May International Company
Represented By: Ronald L. Lipinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Vventures, LLC
Represented By: David O Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rip-Off Report.com
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BadBusinessBureau.com
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Magedson
Represented By: David O Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?