EEOC v. Sidley Austin Brown. Featured Case

Plaintiff EEOC alleged that defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood violated the Age Discrimination in Employment Act (ADEA) by maintaining and implementing an age-based retirement policy and by downgrading or expelling a class of attorney employees age 40 years or older on account of their age in or about October 1999.

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP
Case Number: 1:2005cv00208
Filed: January 13, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to text entry,, 178 TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE ZAGELS REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE PROTECTIVE ORDER (Elmore, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to text entry,, 178 EEOC's Response to the Honorable Judge Zagel's Request for Clarification of the Protective Order (Hamilton, Deborah)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable James B. Zagel:The sealed/restricted documents in this case are eligible for unsealing pursuant to Local Rule 26.2e or for destruction. However, due to the ambiguous language in the protective orders, clarification of the protective orders as to whether or not these documents should be unsealed or destroyed is needed. The filing parties are directed to notify the court in writing by 6/4/2008 of their respective positions. The court will enter an appropriate order on or by 6/18/2008.Mailed notice (drw, )
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 4/10/2007; Before the Honorable James B. Zagel. (Document not scanned). (gmr, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 176 CONSENT DECREE Signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 10/4/2007.(vcf, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Enter Consent decree.Civil case terminated. mailed notice (vcf, )
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Motion for discovery 100 is stricken; Motion for order 103 is stricken; Motion for protective order 105 is stricken; Motion for protective order 107 is stricken; Motion to compel 115 is stricken; Motion for extension of time to complete discovery 160 is stricken. Motions administratively terminated: Mailed notice (drw, )
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Status hearing set for 9/26/2007 is stricken.Mailed notice (drw, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing set for 9/26/2007 at 11:30 AM.Mailed notice (drw, )
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Elizabeth S. Elmore (Elmore, Elizabeth)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Motion to amend/correct 166 is granted. Mailed notice (drw, )
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order regarding discovery. Signed on 5/9/2007:Mailed notice(drw, )
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Motion by Maile H. Solis for presentment of motion to amend/correct, 166 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 5/10/2007 at 10:15 AM. (Solis, Maile)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to amend/correct Protective Order Governing Subsequent Employment Information and Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Solis, Maile)
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order ruling on motions to compel [114, 138, 142] and motion to extend discovery 153 . Signed on 4/27/2007:Mailed notice(drw, )
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Motion to compel 114 is granted in part and denied in part. Motion to compel 138 is granted in part and denied in part. Motion to compel 142 is granted in part and denied in part. Motion for extension of time to complete discovery 153 is granted. Mailed notice (drw, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 169 AGREED Order Regarding Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege as to Certain Communications, signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 4/12/2007. Mailed notice (ar, ). Modified on 5/14/2007 (ar, ).
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 AGREED ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AS TO CERTAIN COMMUNICATIONS Signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 4/10/2007.(rp, )
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Enter agreed order regarding waiver of the attorney-client privilege as to certain communications. Mailed notice (rp, )
April 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED DOCUMENT - SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANUM by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in support of EEOC's Motion to compel client complaint information 143 , 152 (Document not scanned.) (RESTRICTED) (hp, )
April 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SEALED DOCUMENT - MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for extension of discovery schedule (Document not scanned.) (RESTRICTED) (hp, )
April 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of under seal filing by Defendant regarding its opposition 157 to the EEOC's motion for an extension of discovery schedule and Exhibits D, E, F and H thereto. (ar, )
April 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 OPPOSITION by Defendant to the EEOC's motion for an extension of discovery schedule and Exhibits D,E,F, and H thereto 153 . (Document not scanned). (RESTRICTED). (ar, ) Modified on 4/9/2007 (ar, ).
April 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLPin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for extension of time to complete discovery and other pre-trial deadlines 153 SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP'S OPPOSITION TO THE EEOC'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY SCHEDULE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through I)(Solis, Maile)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of under seal filing by Defendant regarding its opposition 156 to EEOC's motion to compel responses to EEOC's tenth set of interrogatories and Exhibit A thereo. (ar, ) Modified on 4/9/2007 (ar, ).
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 OPPOSITION by Defendant to EEOC's motion to oompel responses to EEOC's tenth set of interrogatories and Exhibit A thereto. (Document not scanned). (RESTRICTED). (ar, ) Modified on 4/9/2007 (ar, ).
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery, 153 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/10/2007 at 10:00 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for extension of time to complete discovery and other pre-trial deadlines (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, sampling of recently produced documents (under seal only)# 2 Exhibit B, EEOC's First Set of Document Production Requests (under seal only)# 3 Exhibit C, recently produced document referencing retirement policy and age# 4 Exhibit D, letter from Defendant's counsel to EEOC)(Mulaire, Justin)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in support of motion to compel, 114 (SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF EEOC's MOTION TO COMPEL CLIENT COMPLAINT INFORMATION) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Moates deposition transcript (under seal only))(Mulaire, Justin)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLPin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel interrogatory responses 138 DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO EEOC'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO EEOC'S TENTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Solis, Maile)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SEALED DOCUMENT - REPLY and Exhibits 1 and 2 by Defendant in support of motion to compel responses to interrogatories and document production requests 149 ; Notice of filing (Document not sealed.) (RESTRICTED) (hp, )
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to reply, 139 , memorandum in support of motion 125 TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION REQUESTS (Solis, Maile)
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Motion for order deeming matters admitted 60 is denied as moot.Mailed notice (drw, )
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 EXHIBIT A to Sidley Austin LLP's motion for entry of agreed order regarding waiver of the attorney-client privilege as to certain communications. (RESTRICTED).(gcy, )
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED ORDER NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Alan Bills for presentment of motion for order 145 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/10/2007 at 10:00 AM. (Bills, Matthew)
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for order AGREED ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AS TO CERTAIN COMMUNICATIONS (Bills, Matthew)
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 EXHIBIT A by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to EEOC's sur-reply in Support of EEOC's Motion to Compel Production of Client Complaint Information or to Preclude Reliance Thereon 141 (RESTRICTED)(rp, )
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Elkin, Laurie)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in Opposition to Defendant's motion to compel responses to interrogatories and document production requests. (RESTRICTED) (Document Not Scanned) (gej, )
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel Interrogatory Responses. (RESTRICTED) (Document Not Scanned) (gej, )
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion to compel, 138 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/10/2007 at 10:00 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 REPLY by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to memorandum in support of motion 125 (MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION REQUESTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (under seal)# 2 Exhibit B, Transcript of October 6, 2006 hearing)(Mulaire, Justin)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel interrogatory responses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Supplemental Amended Exhibit D (under seal only)# 2 Exhibit B, Sidley Responses to EEOC's 10th Set of Interrogatories (under seal only))(Mulaire, Justin)
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP re attorney appearance 136 of Michael S. Gulland (Gulland, Michael)
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Michael S Gulland (Gulland, Michael)
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP re attorney appearance 134 of Laura K. McNally (McNally, Laura)
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Laura K McNally (McNally, Laura)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP ; Notice of Filing (RESTRICTED) (eav, )
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to reply 129 SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP'S SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE TO EEOC'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF CLIENT COMPLAINT INFORMATION OR TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE THEREON (Murray, Lynn)
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Status hearing held on 3/9/2007. Status hearing set for 4/10/2007 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, )
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel :Status hearing held on 3/9/2007. Motion to compel 124 is granted in part and denied in part. Status hearing set for 4/10/2007 at 12:00 PM.Mailed notice(drw, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of filing by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP regarding Defendant's memorandum in support of motion to compel responses to interrogatories and document production requests 127 and Exhibits A,B,G,H,I,J, K and M 125 . (vkd, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP in support of its motion to compel responses to interrogatories and document production requests 124 with Exhibits A,B,G,H,I,J,K and M. (RESTRICTED). (Document not scanned). (ar, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Motion by Maile H. Solis for presentment of motion to compel 124 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/9/2007 at 12:00 PM. (Solis, Maile)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP in support of motion to compel 124 RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION REQUESTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through P)(Solis, Maile)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION REQUESTS (Solis, Maile)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 123 EXHIBITS C, G, H, K and M to Memorandum (A) on Comparators and (B) Opposing EEOC Motion Regarding Client Complaints by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP; Notice (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLPin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel production of client complaint information or to preclude reliance thereon 114 SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP'S MEMORANDUM (A) ON COMPARATORS AND (B) OPPOSING EEOC MOTION REGARDING CLIENT COMPLAINTS (Solis, Maile)
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PROTECTIVE Order governing subsequent employment information and documents Signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 1/25/2007.(mb, )
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Enter protective order governing subsequent employment information and documents.Mailed notice (mb, )
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 EXHIBITS 1-5 to Plaintiff EEOC's Motion to Compel Disclosure of Legal Advice Rendered to the Firm by a Former Partner by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (RESTRICTED)(mb, )
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 EXHIBITS 1-3 to Plaintiff EEOC's Motion to Compel Production of Client Complaint Information or to Preclude Reliance Thereon by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (RESTRICTED)(mb, )
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel disclosure of legal advice rendered to the firm by a former partner 115 , MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel production of client complaint information or to preclude reliance thereon 114 SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP'S REQUEST FOR A BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THE EEOC'S PENDING MOTIONS (Solis, Maile)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion to compel, 114 , motion to compel, 115 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 1/25/2007 at 10:15 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel disclosure of legal advice rendered to the firm by a former partner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal)# 2 Exhibit 2 (filed under seal)# 3 Exhibit 3 (filed under seal)# 4 Exhibit 4 (filed under seal)# 5 Exhibit 5 (filed under seal))(Mulaire, Justin)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel production of client complaint information or to preclude reliance thereon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal)# 2 Exhibit 2 (filed under seal)# 3 Exhibit 3 (filed under seal))(Mulaire, Justin)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SEALED DOCUMENT. (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 111 SEALED DOCUMENT. Exhibits A and D to Defendant's Opposition to EEOC's Motion for Protective Order; Notice (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Enforcement of Ruling Regarding Production of Certain Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Transcript of Proceedings)(Mulaire, Justin)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for protective order 105 (Solis, Maile)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion for protective order, 107 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/21/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for protective order governing subsequent employment information and documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, proposed Protective Order Governing Subsequent Employment Information and Documents# 2 Exhibit B, October 6, 2006 Transcript of Proceedings)(Mulaire, Justin)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SEALED DOCUMENT. Exhibit B to Defendant's Motion for Enforcement of Ruling Regarding Production of Certain Documents; Notice (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion for protective order, 105 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/21/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, filed under seal only# 2 Exhibit 2, Transcript of October 6, 2006 hearing# 3 Exhibit 3, filed under seal only# 4 Exhibit 4, filed under seal only# 5 Exhibit 5, filed under seal only)(Mulaire, Justin)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Peter Conway for presentment of motion for order 103 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/14/2006 at 12:00 PM. (Conway, Michael)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for order Defendant's Response to EEOC's Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order and Cross-Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order (Conway, Michael)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for discovery schedule 100 and Cross-Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order (Conway, Michael)
November 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion for discovery 100 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/14/2006 at 12:00 PM. (Mulaire, Justin)
November 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for discovery schedule (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, proposed scheduling order# 2 Exhibit B, chart)(Mulaire, Justin)
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing held on 10/6/2006. Motion to compel 89 is granted in part and denied in part for the reasons stated in open court. Status hearing set for 11/14/2006 at 12:00 PM. Mailed notice (drw, )
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing set for 10/6/2006 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice (drw, )
September 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLPin Support of MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS, AND SUPPLEMENTATION OF DEFICIENT DISCOVERY RESPONSES 89 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Murray, Lynn)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SEALED DOCUMENT. (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS, AND SUPPLEMENTATION OF DEFICIENT DISCOVERY RESPONSES 89 (Mulaire, Justin)
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Motion hearing held on 9/19/2006. MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS, AND SUPPLEMENTATION OF DEFICIENT DISCOVERY RESPONSES 89 response due by 9/25/2006. MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel deponent William White to answer questions regarding his conversations with Sidley Management and for completion of his deposition 86 is withdrawn without prejudice. Mailed notice (drw, )
September 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY by Equal Employment Opportunity Commissionin Support of MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel Deponent William White to Answer Questions Regarding his conversations with Sidley Management and for completion of his deposition 86 Notice of EEOC's Agreement to Dismiss as Moot and Without Prejudice EEOC's Motion to Compel Deponent William White to Answer Questions Regarding his Conversations with Sidley Management and for Completion of His Deposition (Hamilton, Deborah)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Motion by Lynn Hagman Murray for presentment of motion to compel 89 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 9/19/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Murray, Lynn)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP in Support of motion to compel 89 RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS, AND SUPPLEMENTATION OF DEFICIENT DISCOVERY RESPONSES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M)(Murray, Lynn)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS, AND SUPPLEMENTATION OF DEFICIENT DISCOVERY RESPONSES (Murray, Lynn)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel Deponent William White to Answer Questions Regarding his conversations with Sidley Management and for completion of his deposition 86 (Conway, Michael)
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Motion by Deborah Lois Hamilton for presentment of motion to compel, 86 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 9/19/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Hamilton, Deborah)
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel Deponent William White to Answer Questions Regarding his conversations with Sidley Management and for completion of his deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Hamilton, Deborah)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Matthew Alan Bills (Bills, Matthew)
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Motion hearing held on 7/13/2006. MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) deposition 77 is granted in part and denied in part. Status hearing set for 9/28/2006 at 10:00 AM. (drw, )
July 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 to Defendant Sidley Austin LLP's Response to Plaintiff EEOC's Motion to Compel a Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Deposition Regarding the reasons Sidley Partners Were Changed in Status From "Partner" to "Senior Counsel" or "Counsel". (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
July 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CERTIFICATE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP of Service (mb, )
July 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF EEOC'S MOTION TO COMPEL A FED. R. CIV. P. 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION REGARDING THE REASONS SIDLEY PARTNERS WERE CHANGED IN STATUS FROM "PARTNER" TO "SENIOR COUNSEL" OR "COUNSEL" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 5)(Solis, Maile)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SEALED DOCUMENT (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Motion by Deborah Lois Hamilton for presentment of motion to compel 77 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/13/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Hamilton, Deborah)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hamilton, Deborah)
June 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Enter Amended Protective Order. (For further detail see order.) Telephoned notice (hp, )
June 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED PROTECTIVE Order Signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 6/20/2006.Mailed notice(mb, )
June 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Motion hearing held on 6/20/2006 regarding motion to amend/correct 73 . MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to amend/correct protective order 73 is granted. Amended protective order to be submitted to the court for signature. Mailed notice (drw, )
June 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion to amend/correct 73 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/20/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
June 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to amend/correct Protective Order (agreed motion) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, proposed Amended Protective Order# 2 Exhibit B, original Protective Order)(Mulaire, Justin)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to disqualify counsel from representing one non-party witness 66 is denied as moot. Telephoned notice (drw, )
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to disqualify counsel from representing one non-party witness 66 (Conway, Michael)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : The Clerk of Court is directed to strike attachment 2 to document number 66 as erroneously filed. Mailed notice (mb, )
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 69 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Exhibit B (corrected) regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to disqualify counsel from representing one non-party witness 66 (Mulaire, Justin)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion to disqualify counsel 66 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/13/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in Support of motion to disqualify counsel 66 (Mulaire, Justin)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to disqualify counsel from representing one non-party witness (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B (stricken pursuant to minute order dated 6/5/06)# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Mulaire, Justin) Modified on 6/6/2006 (mb, ).
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission regarding memorandum in support of motion 61 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to document #61# 2 Exhibit D to document #61)(Mulaire, Justin)
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief 60 Sidley's Opposition to the EEOC's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Responses to Requests to Admit Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended and Supplemental Responses)(Solis, Maile)
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Michael Peter Conway (Conway, Michael)
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Mulaire for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 60 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/6/2006 at 10:15 AM. (Mulaire, Justin)
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in Support of motion for miscellaneous relief 60 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EEOC's requests to admit# 2 Exhibit Sidley's responses to EEOC's requests to admit)(Mulaire, Justin)
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for order deeming matters admitted, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 36 (Mulaire, Justin)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MANDATE received by the 7th Circuit; Case no 06-8002: The judgment of the District Court is affirmed, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (jmm, )
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 06-8002. (jmm, )
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Submitted 2/7/2006; Decided 2/17/2006 in USCA case no. 06-8002 (rmm, )
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Submitted 2/7/2006; Decided 2/17/2006 in USCA case no. 06-8002. (rmm, )
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER from United States Court of Appeals for the 7th Circuit dated 2/17/2006. (rmm, )
December 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 11/9/2005; Before the Honorable James B. Zagel (rmm, )
December 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER requested by court regarding certification for interlocutory appeal of the court's denial of defendant's motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 12/20/2005:Mailed notice(rmm, ) Modified on 2/17/2006 (vcf, ).
December 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Enter order of certification for interlocutory appeal of the denial of the motion for partial summary judgment. Mailed notice (rmm, )
December 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 12/20/2005:Mailed notice(drw, )
December 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : The motion for certification is granted. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is denied initially and on reconsideration. Defendant's motion for certification for interlocutory appeal is granted. Mailed notice (drw, )
November 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Amanda Helen McMurtrie (McMurtrie, Amanda)
November 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by John E. Bucheit (Bucheit, John)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE in opposition to Defendant's Renewed Request for Reconsideration or Certification for Interlocutory Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Hamilton, Deborah)
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission by Justin Mulaire (Mulaire, Justin)
October 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing held on 10/18/2005. MOTION by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to compel and for protective order 26 is granted in part and denied in part. Objections 2 thur 7 are overruled. Objection 1 is sustained. Hearing regarding objection 1 is set for 11/9/2005 at 11:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 11/9/2005 at 11:00 AM. (drw, )
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing held on 10/11/2005. Objections received taken under advisement. Status hearing set for 10/18/2005 at 10:00 AM. (drw, )
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SEALED DOCUMENT by defendant: Status report regarding individual objections and renewed request for reconsideration (RESTRICTED) (vmj, )
September 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE Order Signed by Judge James B. Zagel on 9/2/2005:(gcy, )
September 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Enter Protective Order. No notices required. (gcy, )
September 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing held on 9/1/2005. Status hearing set for 10/11/2005 at 10:00 AM. No notice, advised in open court (drw, )
September 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Maile H. Solis (Solis, Maile)
August 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Motion hearing held on 8/25/2005 regarding motion for leave to file. MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for leave to file Objections to EEOC's Submission is granted part and denied in part for the reasons stated in open court. Status hearing set for 9/1/2005 at 10:00 AM. No notice, advised in open court. (drw, )
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Maile H. Solis for presentment of motion for leave to file, 34 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/25/2005 at 10:15 AM. (Solis, Maile)
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for leave to file Objections to EEOC's Submission (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service# 2 Exhibit A - Sidley Austin Brown & Wood's Objections to EEOC's Submission Regarding Notification of Individuals)(Solis, Maile)
August 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUBMISSION regarding Notification of alleged class members and proposed protective order by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP. (gcy, )
August 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Submission regarding procedure for objecting to production of personnel files by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Exhibits); Notice. (jmp, )
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for leave to file 31 sur-reply is granted. Telephoned notice (drw, )
August 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for presentment of MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for leave to file sur-reply 31 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/11/2005 at 10:15 AM. (gma, )
August 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for leave to file sur-reply (Attachments: # 1 Sur-reply)(gma, )
August 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY by Plaintiff EEOC in support of EEOC's motion to compel production and for entry of a protective order. (gcy, )
July 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP in opposition to the EECO's motion to compel production (Exhibits). (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File). (gcy, )
July 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing held on 7/21/2005. Set deadlines/hearing as to motion to compel, motion for protective order 26 : Responses due by 7/28/2005 Replies due by 8/1/2005. Ruling on motion before Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/11/2005 at 12:00 PM. No notice (drw, )
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Deborah Lois Hamilton for presentment of MOTION by Plaintiff to compel and for entry of protective order 26 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/21/2005 at 10:15 AM. (gma, )
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff to compel and for entry of protective order (gma, )
June 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Gary Michael Elden, Gregory Campbell Jones, Lynn Hagman Murray of Change of Address. (gcy, )
June 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLPMOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for reconsideration 21 is withdrawn, in the alternative, for certification for interlocutory review is denied, both for the reasons stated in open court. No notice (drw, )
June 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for presentment of MOTION by Defendant for limited reconsideration or, in the alternative, certification for interlocutory review 21 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/16/2005 at 10:15 AM. (gma, )
June 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant for limited reconsideration or, in the alternative, certification for interlocutory review (gma, )
June 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel : Status hearing held on 6/9/2005. MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for partial summary judgment 15 is denied. Status hearing set for 7/21/2005 at 10:00 AM. Judicial staff mailed notice (drw, )
May 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP in support of motion for partial summary judgment. (gcy, )
May 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to plaintiff's Rule 56.1(b)(3)(B) statement of undisputed facts. (gcy, )
May 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LOCAL RULE 56.1 Statement of undisputed facts by plaintiff EEOC. (gcy, )
May 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF by EEOC in Opposition to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on claims for individual relief. (gcy, )
May 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff EEOC to defendant's Local Rule 56.1 statement of undisputed facts.(gcy, )
April 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for partial summary judgment on claims for individual relief. (gcy, )
April 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by defendant in Support of of its motion for partial summary judgment on claims for individual relief. (gcy, )
April 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LOCAL RULE 56.1 Statement of undisputed facts by defendant. (gcy, )
April 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel dated 4/21/05: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion for leave to file defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on claims for individual relief (7) and to file overlength brief (7) is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to file oversized response to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment. Plaintiff is to respond to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on or before 5/10/05. Defendant is to reply by 5/24/05. Ruling on defendant's motion for partial summary judgment is set for 6/9/05 at 10:15 a.m. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
April 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before Judge James B. Zagel dated 4/21/05: Motion hearing held. Parties motion for leave to file parties' joint report on compliance with Rules 16(B) and 26(F), and their proposals on case management (9) is granted. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by plaintiff, defendant for presentment of JOINT MOTION by Plaintiff, Defendant for leave to file parties' joint report on compliance with Rules 16(B) and 26(F) and their proposals on case management and a discovery plan 9 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/21/2005 at 10:15 AM. (gma, ) . Modified on 11/13/2006 (las, ).
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT MOTION by Plaintiff, Defendant for leave to file parties' joint report on compliance with Rules 16(B) and 26(F) and their proposals on case management and a discovery plan (gma, ) . Modified on 11/13/2006 (las, ).
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP for presentment of MOTION by Defendant for leave to file defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on claims for individual relief and to file overlength brief 7 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/21/2005 at 10:15 AM. (gma, ) . Modified on 11/13/2006 (las, ).
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant for leave to file defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on claims for individual relief and to file overlength brief (gma, ). Modified on 11/13/2006 (las, ).
March 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP, Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Robert S Span; Order entered granting leave by James B. Zagel. Filing fee $ 100 paid, receipt number 10420675 (gcy, )
March 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP, Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Paul Grossman; Order entered granting leave by James B. Zagel. Filing fee $ 100 paid, receipt number 10920675 (gcy, )
March 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP.(gcy, )
March 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP by Gregory Campbell Jones, Lynn Hagman Murray, Gary Michael Elden. (gcy, )
January 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP waiver sent on 1/13/2005, answer due 3/14/2005. (gcy, )
January 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Jury demand - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of John C. Hendrickson, Gregory M. Gochanour, Laurie S. Elkin, Deborah Lois Hamilton as attorney(s) for plaintiff (No summons(es) issued.) (Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (cem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EEOC v. Sidley Austin Brown.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Justin Mulaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP
Represented By: Robert S Span
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?