Chicago United Industries, Ltd. et al v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv05011
Filed: August 30, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2011 359 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/20/2011: Before the Court is Defendants bill of costs 341 seeking $60,356.82 in costs associated with copying, court reporting and transcripts, subpoena fees, and expert witness f ees. For the reasons stated below, the Court awards $35,731.82 in costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and 28 U.S.C. § 1920 and $12,800.00 in expert witness fees under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(4)(C) for a total award of $48,531.82. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
September 10, 2010 340 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/10/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
January 15, 2010 318 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/15/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago United Industries, Ltd. et al v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?