Demar v. Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Robert Demar
Defendant: Other Unknown Defendants, Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C., SDI Security, Inc. and Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2005cv05093
Filed: September 6, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2006 52 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Status hearing held. Counsel appeared and reported to the Court that the parties have reached a settlement and that counsel all know the terms of the settlement. Plaintiff's oral motion to dismiss pursuant to settlement is granted. The Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. All pending dates and motions are hereby stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mw, )
September 11, 2006 51 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Counsel for plaintiff advised this Court's Courtroom Deputy that the parties are close to settlement in this instant action. Plaintiff's request to continue status hearing is granted. Status hearing reset to 9/28/2006 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 09/12/06 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, )
June 21, 2006 50 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Motion by defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service to strike 47 Plaintiff's disclosure of expert witnesses is granted. Mailed notice (eav, )
June 9, 2006 49 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Status hearing set for 9/12/2006 at 9:00 a.m. In the event the parties believe a settlment conference with the Court would be useful, the parties are to follow Judge Der-Yeghiayan's settlement conference procedures as outlined on his homepage. Mailed notice (mw, )
June 7, 2006 48 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc.'s motion to strike plaintiff's disclosure of expert witnesses 47 is entered and continued. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 6/14/06. Defendants' expert disclosure and reports shall be served by 6/20/06. Status hearing set for 6/22/06 is stricken. Mailed notice (mjc, )
June 1, 2006 47 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. to strike Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Brady, Brigitte)
June 1, 2006 46 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Brigitte C Brady for presentment of before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/7/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Brady, Brigitte)
May 31, 2006 45 Featured Case 1st Set of Requests for Admission of Fact by Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Brady, Brigitte)
May 31, 2006 44 Featured Case NOTICE by Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. (Brady, Brigitte)
May 24, 2006 43 Featured Case DISCLOSURE of expert witness by Robert Demar ; Notice. (cdy, )
March 24, 2006 42 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service by Brigitte C Brady on behalf of all parties (Brady, Brigitte)
March 21, 2006 41 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Status hearing held and continued to 06/20/06 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's oral motion to dismiss defendant At You Service, Inc. is granted. Defendant At Your Service, Inc. is hereby dismissed as a named defendant without prejudice. Counsel for defendant At You Service, Inc is hereby withdrawn. Plaintiff's oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint to name individual defendants is granted. Plaintiff's expert disclosure and reports shall be served by 05/24/06. Defendants' expert disclosures and reports are to be served by 06/07/06. All discovery shall be noticed in time to be completed by 06/21/06. Dispositive motions are to be filed by 07/21/06. Responses to the dispositive motions, if any, are to be filed by 08/04/06. Replies, to the dispositive motions, if any, are to be filed by 08/01/06. Mailed notice (cdy, )
March 7, 2006 40 Featured Case ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, L.L.C.(Vlahakis, James)
March 1, 2006 39 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. agreed motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint 37 is granted. Mailed notice (mw, )
February 23, 2006 38 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by James Constantine Vlahakis for presentment of motion for extension of time 37 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 3/2/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Vlahakis, James)
February 23, 2006 37 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. for extension of time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time (Vlahakis, James)
February 21, 2006 36 Featured Case ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc.(Heil, Summer)
February 2, 2006 34 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : The Court's order dated 01/31/06 having been entered in error, the 01/31/06 order is hereby vacated. Case ordered reinstated. Status hearing set for 03/21/06 at 9:00 a.m. Case reopened. Mailed notice (cdy, )
February 1, 2006 35 Featured Case FIRST AMENDED complaint by Robert Demar against Other Unknown Defendants, Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C., SDI Security, Inc., Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. (cdy, )
January 31, 2006 33 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Status hearing called. No one having appeared on behalf of the plaintiff on the Court's notice status hearing, this matter is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, for want of prosecution pursuant to Local Rule 41.1. All pending dates and motions are hereby stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notices (gcy, )
January 18, 2006 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion. Signed by Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/18/2006.(cdy, )
January 18, 2006 31 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : For the reasons stated in the Court's memorandum opinion, defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., ChiSox Corporation and At Your Service LLC's motion to dismiss 26 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants Chicago White Six, Ltd., ChiSox Corporation and At Your Service LLC's alternative motion for a more definite statement is granted. Mailed notice (cdy, )
January 11, 2006 30 Featured Case REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Vlahakis, James)
January 11, 2006 29 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. defendants' motion to file instanter reply in support of their motion to dismiss 24 is granted. Mailed notice (mw, )
January 6, 2006 27 Featured Case NOTICE by Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. re MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. to file instanter Motion to Dismiss Dkt. No. 17 18 , notice of motion 25 , notice of correction, 19 , MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. to dismiss 26 (Vlahakis, James)
January 6, 2006 26 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. to dismiss (Vlahakis, James)
January 5, 2006 25 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by James Constantine Vlahakis for presentment of motion by defendant to file instanter 24 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/11/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Vlahakis, James)
January 5, 2006 24 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. to file instanter Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Brief)(Vlahakis, James)
December 15, 2005 23 Featured Case RESPONSE by plaintiff Robert Demar to defendants' motion to dismiss; Notice. (cdy, )
December 1, 2005 28 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Status hearing set for 1/31/2006 at 09:00 a.m. Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd. Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C.'s motion to dismiss is entered and continued. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 12/15/05. Defendants Chicago White Sox, The Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. reply in further support shall be filed by 12/22/05. Mailed notice (cdy, )
December 1, 2005 22 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of service of summons and complaint upon SDI Security, Inc., a corporation. (cdy, )
December 1, 2005 21 Featured Case NOTICE if filing by Robert Demar regarding affidavit of service. (cdy, )
November 9, 2005 20 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by James Constantine Vlahakis for presentment of motion by defendant to file instanter 18 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/1/2005 at 09:00 AM. (Vlahakis, James)
November 9, 2005 19 Featured Case NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. to dismiss 17 . (Document entered in error. Leave not given to file motion to dismiss. Motion for leave to file motion to dismiss 18 still pending. The following notation has been added to the text: Document entered in error. Counsel to refile motion to dismiss if/when leave is granted.) (cem, )
November 8, 2005 18 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. to file instanter Motion to Dismiss Dkt. No. 17 (Vlahakis, James)
November 8, 2005 17 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. to dismiss (Vlahakis, James) (Document entered in error. Counsel to refile motion to dismiss if/when leave is granted.) Modified on 11/9/2005 (cem, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2005 (cem, ).
November 4, 2005 16 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. by Brigitte C Brady (Brady, Brigitte)
November 4, 2005 15 Featured Case NOTICE of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. (Heil, Summer)
November 4, 2005 14 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc.(Heil, Summer)
October 12, 2005 13 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Status hearing held and continued to 12/1/2005 at 09:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdy, )
October 12, 2005 12 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. by Ramsey Lewis Mallory, Sr (Mallory, Ramsey)
October 12, 2005 11 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. by Summer Ellen Heil (Heil, Summer)
October 12, 2005 10 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. by Jeffrey H. Lipe (Lipe, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2005 9 Featured Case JOINT INITIAL STATUS Report by Robert Demar; Notice (cdy, ) Modified on 10/26/2005 (td, ).
September 22, 2005 8 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Status hearing date of 10/11/05 is reset for 10/12/2005 at 09:00 AM. Judicial staff mailed notice (jms, )
September 16, 2005 7 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan : Initial status hearing set for 10/11/2005 at 09:00 AM. At least four working days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall conduct a FRCP 26(f) conference and file a joint written Initial Status Report, not to exceed five pages in length, and file the Court's Joint Jurisdictional Status Report and deliver courtesy copies to this Court's chambers. The Court's standing orders on the Initial Status Report and Joint Jurisdictional Status Report maybe obtained from Judge Der-Yeghiayan's web page or from this Court?s Courtroom Deputy. Judicial staff mailed notice notice (jms, )
September 14, 2005 6 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C. by Diane E Webster, Chadwel David Kasdin, James Constantine Vlahakis, Robert Thomas Shannon. (lcw, )
September 6, 2005 5 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The, Chisox Corporation, At Your Service, Inc., At Your Service, L.L.C., SDI Security, Inc., Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. (lcw, )
September 6, 2005 3 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Demar by Matthew T. Martell. (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.) (lcw, ) Modified on 11/21/2008 (td, ).
September 6, 2005 2 Featured Case CIVIL Cover Sheet. (lcw, )
September 6, 2005 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT filed by Robert Demar; Jury Demand.(lcw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demar v. Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago White Sox, Ltd., The
Represented By: Robert Thomas Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisox Corporation
Represented By: Diane E Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: At Your Service, Inc.
Represented By: Diane E Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: At Your Service, L.L.C.
Represented By: Diane E Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDI Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Brigitte C Weyls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Demar
Represented By: Matthew T. Martell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?