Trading Technologies International Inc v. FuturePath Trading LLC

Case Number: 1:2005cv05164
Filed: September 9, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2011 213 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 2/8/11: Motion and status hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, and as summarized below, (1) plaintiff's motion to compel (05 C 4120: doc. # 377 ) is granted in part and denied in part; and (2) defendants' motion to compel (05 C 4120: doc. # 383 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 03/10/11 at 9:30 a.m. (For further details see text below). Mailed notice.(jj, )
January 18, 2011 205 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 1/18/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Part Two). Mailed notice.(jj, )
October 20, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion: The Court sets forth the procedure that the parties must follow in the event they wish to file discovery motions or motions related to discovery. Failure to follow this procedure will result in the motion beingstricken. (For further details see written opinion). Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 10/20/2010. Mailed notice.(jj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trading Technologies International Inc v. FuturePath Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?