Thakore et al v. Universal Machine Co. of Pottstown, Inc.

Case Number: 1:2005cv05262
Filed: September 14, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Referring Judge: Jeffrey Cole
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2011 274 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Universal Machine Co. of Pottstown, Inc. for judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed) (Borcia, James)
January 6, 2011 268 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Universal Machine Co. of Pottstown, Inc. for judgment Defendant's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Borcia, James)
December 2, 2010 254 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Universal Machine Co. of Pottstown, Inc. for judgment as Matter of Law at the Close of Plaintiff's Evidence (Borcia, James)
September 25, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion on Motions in Limine Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/25/2009. Mailed notice(cdh, )
September 24, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion On Motions in Limine Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/24/2009:(gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thakore et al v. Universal Machine Co. of Pottstown, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?