Roberts v. Sidley Austin Brown & Wood, LLP Featured Case

Plaintiff: Diane Roberts
Defendant: Sidley Austin Brown & Wood, LLP
Case Number: 1:2005cv05345
Filed: September 16, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2006 30 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Signed by Judge Ronald A. Guzman on 3/10/2006(vmj, )
December 28, 2005 26
MINUTE entry before Judge Sidney I. Schenkier : Settlement conference held. Settlement reached. The parties are to submit the appropriate dismissal papers to the district judge by 1/11/06. All matters relating to this referral having been resolved, the referral is hereby terminated. (mmm, )
December 19, 2005 25
MINUTE entry before Judge Sidney I. Schenkier : Status hearing set for 12/20/05 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 1700 for the purpose of setting a date for a settlement conference is stricken. Mailed notice (eav, )
December 13, 2005 24
MINUTE entry before Judge Sidney I. Schenkier : Settlement Conference is set for 12/28/2005 at 01:30 p.m., in chambers 1756. The settlement conference will be conducted in accordance with the Court's Standing Order on Instructions for Settlement Conference, which is enclosed and can also be accessed from the Court's Website at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGE/SCHENKIER/sispage.htm. The schedule for exchange of demand and offer set forth in the standing order is as follows: plaintiff's counsel shall serve on defense counsel a written settlement demand by 12/16/05. Defendant's counsel shall serve on plaintiff's counsel a written settlement offer by 12/21/05. The plaintiff's counsel shall deliver copies of thes letters to chambers by noon on 12/23/05. Parties with full and complete settlement authority must attend the conference. Mailed notice (eav, )
December 12, 2005 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to Magistrate Judge Sidney I. Schenkier pursuant to Local Rule 72.1to conduct settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge Charles P. Kocoras, Executive Committee on 12/12/05. (eav, )
December 9, 2005 21
MINUTE entry before Judge Ronald A. Guzman :Status hearing held on 12/9/2005. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Schenkier for settlement conference. Fact discovery cutoff 3/9/06. Expert discovery cutoff 6/7/06. Plaintiff's expert disclosures by 3/24/06 and defendant's expert disclosures by 4/25/06. Dispositive motions due by 6/22/06. Amendment of pleadings or joinder of parties by 1/23/06. Filing of response to motion to dismiss is extended to 12/30/05. Reply is due 1/13/06. Status hearing set for 3/10/2006 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (cjg, )
December 1, 2005 20
MINUTE entry before Judge Ronald A. Guzman : Status hearing held on 12/1/2005. Status hearing set for 12/9/2005 at 09:30 AM. All parties ordered to appear at the next status in person or by counsel. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 21, 2005 19
MINUTE entry before Judge Ronald A. Guzman : Response to Defendant's motion to dismiss15 to be filed on or before 12/12/2005. Reply due by 12/27/2005. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 18, 2005 18
MINUTE entry before Judge Ronald A. Guzman : Status hearing scheduled for 11/21/05 is reset for 12/1/2005 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed and telephoned notice (cjg, )
November 17, 2005 17
NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Joseph Boran for presentment of motion to dismiss15 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/1/2005 at 09:30 AM. (Boran, Christopher)
November 7, 2005 14
MINUTE entry before Judge Ronald A. Guzman : MOTION by Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood, LLP for extension of time11 to file motion to dismiss Count V of plaintiff's verified complaint 11 is granted to and including 11/17/05. Telephoned notice (cjg, )
November 1, 2005 13
Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Joseph Boran for presentment of motion for extension of time11 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/8/2005 at 09:30 AM. (Boran, Christopher)
October 14, 2005 9
ANSWER to Complaint by Sidley Austin Brown & Wood, LLP(Allen, Julie)
September 27, 2005 7
MINUTE entry before Judge Ronald A. Guzman : Minute order dated 9/23/05 is amended to reflect the correct status hearing date: Status hearing set for 11/21/2005 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 23, 2005 6
MINUTE entry before Judge Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 9/19/05 at 9:30 a.m. The court orders the parties to appear for an initial appearance and status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed (vmj, )
September 16, 2005 5
SUMMONS and one copy Issued as to Defendant Sidley Austin Brown & Wood, LLP (vmj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Sidley Austin Brown & Wood, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Roberts
Represented By: Paul O. Otubusin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidley Austin Brown & Wood, LLP
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Boran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?