Bloch et al vs. Edward Frischholz et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv05379
Filed: September 16, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: George W. Lindberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2011 261 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/5/2011.(tsa, )
May 12, 2011 257 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/12/2011:Therefore, the Court denies Defendantss Motion to Vacate the Order of March 21, 2011. Entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/12/2011. Mailed notice(tsa, )
March 21, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court Written Opinion entered by the Virginia M. Kendall on March 21, 2011:For the reasons stated, the Court grants Blochs Renewed Motion to Vacate and Reinstate Claims 238 . Mailed notice(tlp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloch et al vs. Edward Frischholz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?