Trustees of the Chicago Plastering Institute Pension Trust et al v. RG Construction Services Inc.

Case Number: 1:2005cv05669
Filed: September 30, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Sidney I. Schenkier
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 9/30/09: (vkd, )
July 24, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 7/24/2009.(ef, )
June 16, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 6/16/09: (vkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Chicago Plastering Institute Pension Trust et al v. RG Construction Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?