Prince v. Stewart et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv05849
Filed: October 11, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 286 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/19/2013: For the reasons stated below, Prince's motion for a new trial [279-1] is denied. Mailed notice (cjg, )
October 2, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/2/2012: For the reasons stated below, the parties' motions filed in anticipation of trial [253, 254, 256] are denied. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 30, 2011 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/30/2011. Mailed notice (cjg, )
February 23, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/23/2011. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 8, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations 134 signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/8/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?