Aldridge v. Forest River, Inc. et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00352
Filed: January 20, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2010 279 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/12/2010:Mailed notice(mpj). Modified on 4/12/2010 (gcy, ).
December 10, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Forest River, Inc. to appoint custodian, MOTION by Defendant Forest River, Inc. for judgment as a Matter of Law (Howser, Richard)
November 16, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Forest River, Inc., Specific Cruise Systems, Inc., Cross Claimants Forest River, Inc., Specific Cruise Systems, Inc., Cross Defendants Specific Cruise Systems, Inc., Forest River, Inc. for judgment (summary) (Knight, Byron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?