Oleksy v. General Electric Company et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv01245
Filed: March 8, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2016 774 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 12/12/2016. Mailed notice(lxs, )
September 29, 2015 717 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants GEs motion for summary judgment of non-infringement (Dkt. No. 605), denies Oleksys motion for summary judgment of infringement (Dkt. No. 601), and dismisses as moot the parties remaining motions. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/29/2015.Mailed notice(tsa, )
August 27, 2014 546 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM,OPINION AND ORDER: Court denies GEs motion seeking leave to file a motion for summary judgment of non-infringement. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/27/2014.Mailed notice(tsa, )
July 31, 2013 401 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, GEs motion to amend its final invalidity contentions is granted in part and denied in part. Oleksys motion to strike the amended prior use affirmative defense is denied. GEs obj ections to Magistrate Judge Ashmans August 8, 2011 Order are overruled. GEs motion to vacate the order is denied. GE is directed to produce all the materials Judge Ashman ordered it to produce within fourteen days of the entry of this order. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/31/2013.Mailed notice(tsa, )
June 26, 2013 382 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/26/2013.Mailed notice(tsa, )
October 3, 2011 203 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 10/3/2011:Mailed notice(tlp, )
August 8, 2011 185 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 8/8/2011:Mailed notice(tlp, )
May 23, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/23/2011: Mailed notice (gds, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oleksy v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?