Ellis v. McKinney

Case Number: 1:2006cv01895
Filed: April 10, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/12/2012: For the reasons set forth below, the Court respectfully denies Plaintiff's requests for bill of costs and attorneys' fees 137 . However, court-appointed counsel may submit a request for reimbursement of expenses pursuant to Local Rule 83.40 and the Regulations Governing the Prepayment and Reimbursement of Expenses in Pro Bono Cases on or before 10/13/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
December 1, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/1/2011: This matter is before the Court on the Plaintiffs motions in limine [92, 93, 94, 95, 96, 97, 98, 122] and the Defendants motions in limine 101 . For the reasons discussed below and in open Court on November 28, 2011, the Plaintiffs motions are granted in part and denied in part and the Defendants motions are granted in part and denied in part. Mailed notice(tbk, )
March 24, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/24/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?