Sommerfield v. City of Chicago et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv03132
Filed: June 7, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Mark Filip
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 760 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/25/2017:Before the Court is a Motion for Additional Attorneys Fees [ECF No. 746] filed by Joseph Longo, counsel for Plaintiff Detlef Somerfield. Because the Court sees no reason to increase Longos fees beyond what it has awarded him, the Motion is denied.Mailed notice(wp, )
January 10, 2013 731 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/10/2013:Mailed notice(wp, )
October 31, 2012 712 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/31/2012:Mailed notice(wp, )
August 31, 2012 703 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/31/2012:Mailed notice(jms, )
March 1, 2012 633 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for judgment on Claims Disposed of at Summary Judgment and Set Schedule Regarding the Parties' Costs Submissions (Botana, James)
June 10, 2011 593 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 6/10/2011. Motions in Limine are resolved as follows: Defendants motions 513 , 514 , 517 , and 518 are granted;accordingly, Plaintiff is barred from referencing any alleged discovery or litigation misconduct; any City Counsel resolutions congratulating Lawrence Knasiak on his retirement; or those facts that are only relevantto Plaintiffs dismissed § 1981 or § 1983 claims, his dismissed Title VII discrimination claim, o r thedismissed portion of Plaintiffs Title VII retaliation claim. Plaintiff is also barred from referencing the EEOCcharges, investigation, or determinations. See Lewis v. City of Chi., 563 F. Supp. 2d 905, 919 (N.D. Ill.2008). Defendants motion [515 ] is granted in part: Plaintiff is barred from referencing the specific examplesof Lawrence Knasiaks other bad acts set forth in Defendants motion. Defendants motion 516 isdenied. Plaintiffs motion 521 is granted in part and denied in part as fo llows: subpart 9 is granted as to the specificterms discussed in the motion; therefore, Defendant shall not refer to the litigation lottery, get rich quicksystem, or legal welfare. Subpart 6 is granted: Defendant shall not refer to any war medals tha t were givento Plaintiff by his relatives, nor shall Defendant reference whether any of Plaintiffs relatives were membersof the Nazi party or German military. Subpart 11 is granted: Defendant shall not reference whether and how Plaintiff practices th e Jewish faith. Subpart 13 is granted to the extent that Defendant is not to reference anyfee agreements Plaintiff may have with his counsel. Subpart 22 is granted reciprocally: witnesses will bebarred from the courtroom, except that Plaintiff and La wrence Knasiak will be permitted to remain. Subparts1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, 10, 12, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, and 21 are denied. Plaintiffs motion 522 is granted inpart and denied in part: granted as to affirmative defense #1 and denied as to #7. Thus, Plaintiff mayreference actions and events that occurred more than 300 days prior to the EEOC charge consistent withNatl R.R. Passenger vs. Morgan, 536 US 101, 113 (2002). Plaintiffs motions 523 , 524 , and 530 aredenied.(lcw, )
September 20, 2010 494 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/20/2010.(mjc, )
March 3, 2010 467 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/3/2010.(mjc, )
May 8, 2009 321 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/8/2009.Mailed notice(cdh, )
November 3, 2008 285 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/3/2008. Mailed notice(cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sommerfield v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?