Paine v. City of Chicago et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv03173
Filed: June 9, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Mark Filip
Referring Judge: Maria Valdez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2012 934 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/28/2012.Mailed notice(tsa, )
October 11, 2012 815 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/11/2012.Mailed notice(tsa, )
February 26, 2010 730 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/26/2010:Mailed notice(slb, )
February 25, 2010 713 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/25/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 23, 2010 695 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/23/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 22, 2010 693 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/22/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 18, 2010 689 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/18/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
November 7, 2008 419 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/7/2008. (gmr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paine v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?