In re: Air Crash Near Athens, Greece Featured Case

Plaintiff: Leonidas Moussas and Charis Clerides
Defendant: The Boeing Company
In Re: "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005"
Case Number: 1:2006cv03439
Filed: June 19, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Referring Judge: Geraldine Soat Brown
Presiding Judge: George W. Lindberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2008 110 USCA RECEIVED on 1/30/08 the supplemental record 07-1707. (tlm)
January 30, 2008 109 TRANSMITTED to the U.S.C.A. for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal consisting of 8 volumes of pleadings and 4 volumes of transcripts 21 , 63 , 59 , 87 , motion to supplement USCA record #07-1707 (included in 07-3810 and 07-1737), 107 pursuant to order granting leave to supplement 108 . (tlm)
January 9, 2008 108 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg: The parties' joint motion to correct and/or supplement records on appeal 107 is granted. The Court orders that all original papers, exhibits, transcripts, pleadings, and other filings from the MDL 1773 Docket (N.D. Ill. No. 06-3439) be transmitted to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals and included in the Clerides, et al. (N.D. Ill. No. 07-4378; 7th Cir. No. 07-3810) and Sofocleous, et al (N.D. Ill. No. 06-4392; 7th Cir. No. 07-1737) records on appeal. Mailed notice (tlm)
January 8, 2008 107 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" to amend/correct and/or supplement records on appeal (Buck, Jonathan)
December 27, 2007 MAILED closing patent report to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks along with a certified copies of the orders of 12/21/07. (tlm)
December 5, 2007 106 LETTER from John R. Buck dated 12/04/07. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing). (tlm)
November 14, 2007 105 Featured Case ORDER OF CONDITIONAL Dismissal signed by Judge George W. Lindberg on 1/14/2007. Mailed notice (tlm)
October 22, 2007 104 STIPULATION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(A) and Proposed Order of Conditional Dismissal (Larson, Bates)
October 22, 2007 103 STIPULATION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil procedure 41(a) and Proposed Order of Conditional Dismissal (Larson, Bates)
October 22, 2007 102 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Defendant Boeing's Agreed Motion for Reassignment of Related Case 99 is granted. The Court finds that Civil Action No. 07-4378, entitled Charis Clerides and Soteroulla Hadjik Yriyakou, Personal Representatives of the Estate of Nicos Karakostas, deceased v. The Boeing Company, is related to the consolidated actions in MDL-1773 and reassigns Civil Action No. 07-4378 to this Court for the purposes of consolidation with MDL-1773.Mailed notice (slb, )
October 18, 2007 101 NOTICE by The Boeing Company Notice of Filing of the Declaration of Allison Kendrick in Support of Stipulated Forum Non Conveniens Dismissal (Larson, Bates)
October 18, 2007 100 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case 99 before Honorable George W. Lindberg on 10/24/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Larson, Bates)
October 18, 2007 99 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case Agreed Motion for Reassignment of Related Case by Defendant The Boeing Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E)(Larson, Bates)
April 26, 2007 98 USCA RECEIVED on 4/26/07 the long record regarding the Notice of Appeal (07-1707). (dj, )
April 13, 2007 96 DESIGNATION LETTER from The Boeing Company dated 4/10/2007 regarding appeal 07-1707(cdh, )
April 13, 2007 95 DESIGNATION by The Boeing Company. (dj, )
March 14, 2007 94 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Plaintiffs' motion for relief pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 and/or 60 92 is denied. Plaintiffs have not shown a manifest error of law or fact, or presented newly discovered evidence that would justify granting relief under Rule 59. See LB Credit Corp. v. Resolution Trust Corp., 49 F.3d 1263, 1267 (7th Cir. 1995). Nor have plaintiffs shown extraordinary circumstances that would justify granting relief under Rule 60(b). See Lowe v. McGraw-Hill Cos., 361 F.3d 335, 342 (7th Cir. 2004); Dickerson v. Board of Educ., 32 F.3d 1114, 1116 (7th Cir. 1994). Mailed notice (vkd, )
March 13, 2007 93 Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Appropriate Relief Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 and/or 60 from the Judgment Dismissing this Case Dated February 28, 2007 NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion to alter judgment, 92 before Honorable George W. Lindberg on 3/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
March 13, 2007 92 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" to alter judgment Motion for Appropriate Relief Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 and/or 60 from the Judgment Dismissing this Case Dated February 28, 2007 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Affidavit)(Clifford, Robert)
March 5, 2007 91 MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown :A judgment has been entered by the District Judge. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 28, 2007 90 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/28/2007:Mailed notice.
February 28, 2007 89 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Plaintiffs' motion to strike defendant's reply brief 83 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant's motion to dismiss on the grounds of forum non conveniens 28 is granted. The status hearing set for 3/7/07 is stricken. Civil case terminated.Mailed notice (slb, )
February 27, 2007 88 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Status hearing reset to 3/7/2007 at 12:15p.m. Ruling date on the pending motions reset to 3/7/2007 at 12:15p.m.Mailed notice (slb, )
February 26, 2007 87 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Michael T. Mason held on 11/21/06 (One Volume). (vkd, )
February 7, 2007 86 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Plaintiffs have filed a motion to strike defendant's forum non conveniens reply brief or, in the alternative, for leave to conduct additional discovery and/or file surreply brief 83 . The portion of the motion that requests leave to conduct additional discovery and file a surreply brief is denied. Ruling on the portion of the motion that seeks to strike defendant's reply brief is set for 3/7/07 at 9:30 a.m. No response is ordered. No court appearance is required on 2/14/07. Mailed notice (vkd, )
February 7, 2007 85 MINUTE entry Due to the unavailability of the court, the ruling date on the motion to dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens is reset to 3/7/2007 at 9:30a.m. No court appearance required on 2/28/2007 as the court will not be in session on 2/28/2007.Mailed notice (slb, )
February 6, 2007 84 Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Boeing Company's Forum Non Conveniens Reply Brief or in the Alternative for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery and/or File a Sur-Reply Brief NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of before Honorable George W. Lindberg on 2/14/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
February 6, 2007 83 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" to strike declaration(82 in 1:06-cv-03439), declaration(80 in 1:06-cv-03439), declaration(79 in 1:06-cv-03439), declaration, (77 in 1:06-cv-03439), declaration(81 in 1:06-cv-03439), reply(75 in 1:06-cv-03439), declaration, (78 in 1:06-cv-03439), declaration(76 in 1:06-cv-03439) Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Boeing Company's Forum Non Conveniens Reply Brief or in the Alternative for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery and/or File a Sur-Reply Brief Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439, 1:06-cv-00927, 1:06-cv-00994, 1:06-cv-03440, 1:06-cv-04392, 1:06-cv-05582, 1:06-cv-06757(Clifford, Robert)
January 31, 2007 82 DECLARATION of Dr. Stelios N. Koussoulis regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
January 31, 2007 81 DECLARATION of Mr. Alecos Markides regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
January 31, 2007 80 DECLARATION of Dionysios Kondylis regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
January 31, 2007 79 DECLARATION of Dimitris Emvalomenos regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
January 31, 2007 78 DECLARATION of Judge Dimitrios (Dimitrakis) Stylianides regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Supplementary Declaration of the Judge Dimitrios (Dimitrakis) Stylianides to Support the Petition of the Defendant Company Boeing for Dismissal ofthe Complaint for Reasons Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
January 31, 2007 77 DECLARATION of Richard Breuhaus regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Supplemental Declaration of Richard Breuhaus in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
January 31, 2007 76 DECLARATION of Allison Kendrick regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Larson, Bates)
January 31, 2007 75 REPLY by Defendant The Boeing Company to motion to dismiss 28 on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Cahill, William)
January 5, 2007 74 MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
January 2, 2007 73 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial Status Report by "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" (Clifford, Robert)
January 2, 2007 72 STATUS Report by The Boeing Company (Larson, Bates)
December 29, 2006 71 EXHIBIT by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" Exhibit 6 Part G regarding memorandum in opposition to motion,,, 70 (Clifford, Robert)
December 29, 2006 70 MEMORANDMUM by "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" in Opposition to motion to dismiss 28 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Boeing's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List & Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part A# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part B-1# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part B-2# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part C# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part D# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part E-1# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part E-2# 14 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part E-3# 15 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part F# 16 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part H# 17 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part I# 18 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part J-1# 19 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part J-2# 20 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part J-3# 21 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part J-4# 22 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part K)(Clifford, Robert)
December 15, 2006 69 MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : The referral of this matter having been assigned to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown, an initial status hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Brown on 01/05/07 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1812. The parties shall deliver a copy of an initial status report providing the information required by Judge Brown's Order Setting Initial Status Report to the Courtroom Deputy (Room 1808) three business days before the initial status hearing. See www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGE BROWN. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 15, 2006 68 Signed by Judge George W. Lindberg on 12/15/2006:Mailed notice(slb, )
December 15, 2006 67 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time 62 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' time for responding to defendant's motion to dismiss is extended to 12/29/06. Defendant's reply is due 1/31/07. The ruling date remains the same. No court appearance is required on 12/15/06. Mailed notice (slb, )
December 14, 2006 65 RESPONSE by The Boeing Company to MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" for extension of time Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Adequate Discovery Related to Forum Non Conveniens 60 Defendant The Boeing Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Larson, Bates)
December 14, 2006 64 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Defendant's response to plaintiffs' motion for extension of time 62 is due on 12/14/06 by 7:00 p.m. Hearing on the motion is reset to 12/15/06 at 4:00 p.m. Mailed notice (slb, )
December 14, 2006 63 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" for extension of time Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Adequate Discovery Related to Forum Non Conveniens 62 . Document number 62 is a duplicate entry of document number 60. (rbf, )
December 13, 2006 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown. (cem, )
December 13, 2006 66 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Geraldine Soat Brown for all further proceedings. In accordance with Internal Operating Procedure 14(B). Signed by Executive Committee on 12/13/2006. (rp, )
December 13, 2006 62 DUPLICATE ENTRY OF #60.(Clifford, Robert) Modified on 12/14/2006 (rbf, ).
December 13, 2006 61 Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion for extension of time, 60 before Honorable George W. Lindberg on 12/15/2006 at 08:30 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
December 13, 2006 60 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" for extension of time Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Adequate Discovery Related to Forum Non Conveniens (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 thru 7)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392,1:06-cv-05582(Clifford, Robert)
December 12, 2006 59 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge George W. Lindberg held on 11/21/06 (One Volume). (vkd, )
December 11, 2006 58 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : As stated in the attached order, plaintiffs' motion to compel testimony of Richard Breuhaus 50 and plaintiffs' motion for leave of Court to take 30(b)(6) testimony 56 are denied. No appearance is required on the noticed motion date of 12/13/06. (kef, )
December 8, 2006 57 Notice of Motion for Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to Take 30(b)(6) Testimony NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion for discovery, 56 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 12/13/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
December 8, 2006 56 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" for discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to Take 30(b)(6) Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 3 Exhibit Exhibits 6-12)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392,1:06-cv-05582(Clifford, Robert)
December 7, 2006 55 DECLARATION regarding response in opposition to motion 54 by The Boeing Company Declaration of Bruce Campbell in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Testimony of Richard Breuhaus (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D# 2 Exhibit E - K# 3 Exhibit L - P)(Larson, Bates)
December 7, 2006 54 RESPONSE by The Boeing Company in Opposition to MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" to compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Testimony of Richard Breuhaus 50 (Larson, Bates)
December 4, 2006 52 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Boeing's response brief, no more than 12 pages, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Testimony of Richard Breuhaus 50 to be filed by 5:00 p.m. on 12/7/06, with a courtesy copy to chambers, room 2206. No reply unless ordered by the Court. Ruling by mail. No appearance is required on the noticed motion date of 12/7/06. (kef, )
December 1, 2006 53 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge George W. Lindberg held on 11/8/06 (One Volume). (vkd, )
December 1, 2006 51 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Compel Testimony of Richard Breuhaus NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion to compel, 50 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 12/7/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
December 1, 2006 50 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" to compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Testimony of Richard Breuhaus (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392,1:06-cv-05582(Clifford, Robert)
November 27, 2006 49 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : As stated in the attached order, plaintiffs' motion to compel 43 is granted in part and denied in part. Boeing must supplement its responses to discovery before 12/8/06. (kef, )
November 21, 2006 48 MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : Motion hearing held on 11/21/2006. Plaintiffs' motion to compel 43 is taken under advisement and a ruling will be issued shortly. (kef, )
November 21, 2006 47 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Status hearing held on 11/21/2006 and continued to 3/7/2007 at 10:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, )
November 21, 2006 46 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Motion hearing held on 11/21/2006. Plaintiffs' motion for additional time to respond to Boeing's motion to dismiss is granted. The date for filing the response is extended to 12/18/2006. Reply due 1/19/2007. Ruling reset to 2/28/2007 at 10:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, )
November 20, 2006 45 RESPONSE by Defendant The Boeing Company to motion to compel,, 43 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Bruce Campbell in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel# 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - C to Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibits D - F to Declaration# 4 Exhibit Exhibits G and H to Declaration# 5 Exhibit Exhibits I - K to Declaration# 6 Exhibit Exhibits L - O to Declaration)(Buck, Jonathan)
November 17, 2006 44 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion to compel,, 43 before Honorable Michael T. Mason on 11/21/2006 at 09:30 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
November 17, 2006 43 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" to compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2# 6 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 3# 7 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 4# 8 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 5# 9 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 6# 10 Exhibit Exhibit D# 11 Exhibit Exhibit E# 12 Exhibit Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392,1:06-cv-05582(Clifford, Robert)
November 15, 2006 42 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg :The status hearing previously scheduled for 11/22/2006 is stricken. Status hearing reset to 11/21/2006 at 9:15a.m. Mailed notice (slb, )
November 9, 2006 41 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Status hearing held on 11/8/2006 and continued to 11/22/2006 at 9:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, )
November 8, 2006 40 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Status hearing held on 11/8/2006. Motion hearing held on 11/8/2006 on plaintiffs' motion for extension of time. Hearing continued to 11/22/2006 at 9:30a.m. on plaintiffs' motion for additional time to file response to defendant's motion to dismiss associated cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392,1:06-cv-05582 Mailed notice (slb, )
November 6, 2006 39 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Master Complaint filed by "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005"; JURY DEMAND.(Clifford, Robert)
November 6, 2006 38 Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief,,,,,, 37 before Honorable George W. Lindberg on 11/8/2006 at 10:00 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
November 6, 2006 37 MOTION by In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" for extension of time to file response/reply as to status hearing, set deadlines/hearings, set/reset hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, 23 Plaintiffs' Motion for Additional Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392,1:06-cv-05582(Clifford, Robert)
November 2, 2006 36 Master ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Boeing Company(Cahill, William)
November 1, 2006 35 DECLARATION of Alecos Markides regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Declaration of Alecos Markides in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
November 1, 2006 34 DECLARATION of Dr. Stelios N. Koussoulis regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Declaration of Dr. Stelios N. Koussoulis in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
November 1, 2006 33 DECLARATION of Judge Demetrios (Demetrakis) Stylianides regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Declaration of Judge Demetrios (Demetrakis) Stylianides in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
November 1, 2006 32 DECLARATION of Paul J. Ehlenbach regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Declaration of Paul J. Ehlenbach in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
November 1, 2006 31 DECLARATION of Allison Kendrick regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Declaration of Allison Kendrick in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Larson, Bates)
November 1, 2006 30 DECLARATION regarding motion to dismiss 28 by The Boeing Company Declaration of Richard Breuhaus in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2# 3 Exhibit A - Part 3# 4 Exhibit A - Part 4)(Larson, Bates)
November 1, 2006 29 MEMORANDUM by The Boeing Company in Support of motion to dismiss 28 On the grounds of Forum Non Conveniens (Cahill, William)
November 1, 2006 28 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392,1:06-cv-05582(Cahill, William)
October 20, 2006 27 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : This document relates to Clerides, et al. v. The Boeing Co., 06 C 4348. Plaintiffs' motion for enlargement of time to file responses to defendant Boeing's pending discovery requests 24 is granted in part. Defendant's emergency motion to compel plaintiffs to respond fully and completely to written discovery 26 is granted in part. Plaintiffs are granted an extension of time through 10/24/06. This is a final extension of time to fully respond to Boeing's pending discovery requests. The parties are reminded that this Court does not look favorably on motions to delay responding to discovery requests. Mailed notice (slb, )
October 19, 2006 26 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to compel Boeing's Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond Fully and Completely to Written Discovery and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of TIme (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C# 2 Exhibit D - G)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392(Larson, Bates)
October 18, 2006 25 Proposed Order granting Motion for Enlargement of Time by Charis Clerides to repond to Boeing's discovery (Martinez, Ricardo)
October 18, 2006 24 MOTION for extension of time to respond to Boeings pending discovery Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392(Martinez, Ricardo)
September 27, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Defendant's motion to dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds is due by 11/1/06. Plaintiffs' joint response is due 12/1/06. Defendant's reply is due 1/2/07. (vkd, )
September 27, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Master complaint due by 10/13/06. Defendant's motion to dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds is due 11/1/06.
September 27, 2006 23 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Status hearing held on 9/27/06 and continued to 11/8/06 at 10:00 a.m. Master complaint due by 10/13/06. All written discovery on the forum non conveniens issue shall be served by 10/4/06. Defendant's motion to dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds is due 11/1/06. Plaintiffs' joint response is due 12/1/06. Defendant's reply is due 1/2/07. Defendant is granted leave to file a supporting brief of up to 20 pages; plaintiffs are granted leave to file a joint response of up to 20 pages. Defendant's reply is limited to 10 pages. Ruling set for 2/7/07 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are reminded that discovery is limited to the forum non conveniens issue only. Discovery disputes relating to whether information falls within the scope of discovery should be raised before Magistrate Judge Mason; all other disputes, including disputes relating to the timing of discovery, must be raised before Judge Lindberg. Mailed notice (vkd, )
September 26, 2006 22 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant The Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ANSWER to amended complaint by The Boeing Company(Larson, Bates)
September 25, 2006 21 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 08/23/06; Before the Honorable George W. Lindberg. (One Volume). (vkd, )
September 21, 2006 20 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Leonidas Moussas against The Boeing Company (Verna, Michael)
September 18, 2006 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Leonidas Moussas for leave to file FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER RE: AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03439,1:06-cv-00927,1:06-cv-00994,1:06-cv-03440,1:06-cv-04392(Verna, Michael)
September 14, 2006 18 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Status hearing reset for 9/27/2006 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (slb, )
September 8, 2006 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" by Michael Patrick Verna (Verna, Michael)
September 8, 2006 16 NOTICE of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Boeing Company re answer to complaint 15 Local Rule 3.2 Disclosure Statement of The Boeing Company (Larson, Bates)
September 8, 2006 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant The Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages by The Boeing Company(Larson, Bates)
September 8, 2006 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Jonathan R Buck (Buck, Jonathan)
August 25, 2006 13 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Mason to resolve all discovery disputes and issues relating to forum non conveniens. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/06. (mb, )
August 24, 2006 12 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : The Court designates Robert A. Clifford, of the Clifford Law Offices, Chicago, Illinois, as Liaison Counsel for plaintiffs. A plaintiffs' steering committee, comprised of one attorney from each firm with filed cases, is appointed. Mailed notices (gcy, )
August 23, 2006 11 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Status hearing held on 8/23/2006 and continued to 9/27/2006 at 11:00a.m. Discovery is open for the limited purpose relating to forum non conveniens. Mailed notice (slb, )
August 18, 2006 10 INITIAL STATUS Report by plaintiff Leonidas Moussa. (gcy, )
August 9, 2006 9 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Status Report by "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005" (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Clifford, Robert)
August 9, 2006 8 Defendant The Boeing Company's Suggestion for Agenda at the August 23, 2006 Initial Status Hearing by The Boeing Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B# 2 Exhibit 1 & 2 to B# 3 Exhibit 3 & 4 to B)(Cahill, William)
August 2, 2006 7 ATTORNEY Appearance by John D Dillow. (rp, )
August 2, 2006 6 ATTORNEY Appearance by Bruce D Campbell. (rp, )
August 2, 2006 5 ATTORNEY Appearance by Allison Roseman Kendrick. (rp, )
July 18, 2006 4 MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : An initial status hearing is set for August 23, 2006 at 11:00 a.m. General procedures that will govern these actions are set forth in this order. Mailed notices (gcy, )
June 27, 2006 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates)
June 27, 2006 2 ATTORNEY Appearance (Cahill, William)
June 23, 2006 MAILED letter establishing MDL 1773 to MDL Panel. (dmkf, )
June 19, 2006 1 CONDITIONAL transfer order from MDL Panel establishing MDL 1773. (dmkf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Air Crash Near Athens, Greece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: "Air Crash New Athens, Greece on August 14, 2005"
Represented By: Michael Patrick Verna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Bates McIntyre Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonidas Moussas
Represented By: Michael Patrick Verna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charis Clerides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?