e360 Insight, LLC et al v. Spamhaus Project, The Featured Case

Plaintiff: e360 Insight, LLC and David Linhardt
Defendant: Spamhaus Project, The
Case Number: 1:2006cv03958
Filed: July 21, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 256 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/30/2010: We deny Spamhaus' motion (Doc 247 ) to alter or amend our order of 6/11/2010. (For further details see minute order.)Mailed notice(sct, )
June 11, 2010 242 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/11/2010.Mailed notice(sct, )
October 8, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/8/2009.Mailed notice(sct, )
July 21, 2006 1
NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (06 CH 12259) filed by Spamhaus Project, The (Exhibits) (mb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: e360 Insight, LLC et al v. Spamhaus Project, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: e360 Insight, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Linhardt
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spamhaus Project, The
Represented By: Matthew M. Neumeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?