Williams v. Jones

Case Number: 1:2006cv04540
Filed: October 12, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and OrderFor the foregoing reasons, the Warden's motion to dismiss 28 is granted, Williams's petition is dismissed, and the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/9/2014:Mailed notice(srn, )
September 8, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Warden's motion to dismiss 28 is granted and Williams's petition is dismissed. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/8/2014:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 8, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/8/2013: The petitioner's motion to reinstate his habeas corpus action [# 16 ] is granted. The clerk is directed to: (1) file the amended petition [# 17 ], and (2) substitute Randy Pfister for Eddie Jones as respondent. The respondent is ordered to answer the amended petition or otherwise plead within twenty-one days of the date of this order. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ao,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?