Maxum Indemnity Company and Security Insurance Company of Hartford v. Eclipse Manufacturing Co. et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv04946
Filed: September 13, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 437 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/12/2013: Maxum Indemnity Company's and Security Insurance Company of Hartford's motions for summary judgment 405 and 410 with regard to the duty to indemnify are denied. Mailed notice(mad, )
October 31, 2013 428 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 10/31/2013: Motion of Maxum Indemnity Company for summary judgment 405 and motion of Security Insurance Company of Hartford for summary judgment 410 are denied. This case is set for status on November 12, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. as to the form of judgment.Mailed notice(mad, )
January 31, 2012 395 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/31/2012:Mailed notice(mad, )
June 13, 2011 367 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 6/13/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )
November 5, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/5/2008:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxum Indemnity Company and Security Insurance Company of Hartford v. Eclipse Manufacturing Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?