Callpod, Inc. v. GN Netcom, Inc. et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv04961
Filed: September 13, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2010 364 Opinion or Order of the Court Motion to stay 357 is granted in part and denied in part; WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/1/2010.(tsa, )
August 19, 2010 352 Opinion or Order of the Court Motion to dismiss 344 is granted in part and denied in part; WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/19/2010.(tsa, )
March 29, 2010 331 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/29/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
March 6, 2009 244 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/6/2009:Mailed notice(jms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callpod, Inc. v. GN Netcom, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?