Padilla et al v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv05462
Filed: October 6, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 683 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/30/2014. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
December 3, 2013 677 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 12/3/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
October 2, 2013 674 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/2/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
March 27, 2013 593 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/27/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
March 26, 2013 591 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/26/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 18, 2011 443 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/18/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 21, 2011 390 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 3/21/2011:(gcy, )
December 20, 2010 374 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 12/20/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 14, 2009 324 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 12/14/2009:(gcy, )
November 16, 2009 315 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/16/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
August 14, 2009 262 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/14/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla et al v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?