Catapult Communications Corp. v. Foster

Case Number: 1:2006cv06112
Filed: November 8, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2010 238 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion: For the reasons set forth in the Statement section of this order, "LEWIS FOSTER'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S OPINION AND ORDER MOTION TO COMPEL PAYMENT OF EXPERT WITNESS FEES" (Dkt. No. 210) is overruled, and the o rder (Dkt. Nos. 202, 203) of Magistrate Judge Ashman is affirmed. The parties are ordered to comply therewith, and are encouraged to discuss settlement. The case is set for a status report at 9:00 a.m. on November 2, 2010. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 10/8/2010: Mailed notice (am)
September 13, 2010 233 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 9/13/2010: Mailed notice (am)
July 30, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 7/30/2010.(tsa, )
February 19, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 2/19/2010.(mjc, )
August 25, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 8/25/2009.(mjc, )
May 27, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 5/27/2009.(tsa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catapult Communications Corp. v. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?