Suppressed v. Suppressed

Case Number: 1:2006cv06131
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2017 412 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/17/2017:Mailed notice(slb, )
July 31, 2014 309 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 7/31/2014:Mailed notice(air, )
June 30, 2014 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The United States of America through the relator Bernard Lisitza has moved to strike objections from defendant Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. ("Par") to certain requests to admit and to compel proper responses. We hereby grant in part, and deny in part, plaintiffs' motion 291 . Par is to provide amended properly framed answers on or before July 14, 2014. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 6/30/2014. Mailed notice (np, )
March 12, 2014 286 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 3/12/2014. Mailed notice(tlp, )
January 21, 2014 275 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 1/21/2014. Mailed notice(tlp, )
March 7, 2013 187 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 3/7/2013:Mailed notice(air, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suppressed v. Suppressed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?