Allstate Insurance Company et al v. St. Anthony's Spine & Joint Institue, P.C. et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv07010
Filed: December 19, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2012 364 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/29/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 20, 2011 283 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/20/2011: The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiffs' motion in limine 268 to exclude certain statements at trial related to statements in Dr. Freeman's expert reports. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 17, 2010 229 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/17/2010: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 222 is granted. Plaintiff is to file its amended complaint by 8/24/10. [For further details see minute order.]Mailed notice(kef, )
March 9, 2010 213 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 03/09/2010: Mailed notice (mw, )
February 10, 2010 209 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/10/2010:Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. St. Anthony's Spine & Joint Institue, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?